This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/10/2021 at 12:20:52 (UTC).

California Numismatic Funding Inc vs Smith

Case Summary

On 09/17/2020 California Numismatic Funding Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Smith. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert P Dahlquist. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************C-NC

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    North County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Robert P Dahlquist

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

California Numismatic Funding Inc

Defendants

Smith, Jan Franklin

Kathryn C Smith and Judee Weinberg, Trustees of the Survivor's Trust Under the Smith Family Trust of May 23, 1983

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Cotten, Cary L

Attorney at HAGAR & COTTEN

Defendant Attorneys

Vicknair, Summer

Attorney at TESTA & ASSOCIATES LLP

Padway, Laurence F.

 

Court Documents

Answer

Answer filed by Kathryn C Smith and Judee Weinberg, Trustees of the Survivor's Trust Under the Smith Family Trust of May 23, 1983.

Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number

Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Smith, Jan Franklin. Refers to: Smith, Jan

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Kathryn C Smith and Judee Weinberg, Trustees of the Survivor's Trust Under the Smith Family Trust of May 23, 1983.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Kathryn C Smith and Judee Weinberg, Trustees of the Survivor's Trust Under the Smith Family Trust of May 23, 1983.

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process filed by Smith, Jan Franklin.

Answer

Answer filed by Smith, Jan Franklin.

Complaint in Interpleader

Complaint in Interpleader filed by California Numismatic Funding Inc. Refers to: Smith, Jan; Kathryn C Smith and Judee Weinberg, Trustees of the Survivor's Trust Under the Smith Family Trust of May 23, 1983

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by California Numismatic Funding Inc. Refers to: Smith, Jan; Kathryn C Smith and Judee Weinberg, Trustees of the Survivor's Trust Under the Smith Family Trust of May 23, 1983

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by California Numismatic Funding Inc. Refers to: Smith, Jan; Kathryn C Smith and Judee Weinberg, Trustees of the Survivor's Trust Under the Smith Family Trust of May 23, 1983

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by California Numismatic Funding Inc. Refers to: Smith, Jan; Kathryn C Smith and Judee Weinberg, Trustees of the Survivor's Trust Under the Smith Family Trust of May 23, 1983

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2021
  • HearingLocation: N-29; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint in Interpleader

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Kathryn C Smith and Judee Weinberg, Trustees of the Survivor's Trust Under the Smith Family Trust of May 23, 1983. Filed By: Kathryn C Smith and Judee Weinberg, Trustees of the Survivor's Trust Under the Smith Family Trust of May 23, 1983 (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Kathryn C Smith and Judee Weinberg, Trustees of the Survivor's Trust Under the Smith Family Trust of May 23, 1983. Filed By: Kathryn C Smith and Judee Weinberg, Trustees of the Survivor's Trust Under the Smith Family Trust of May 23, 1983 (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Smith, Jan Franklin. Refers to: Smith, Jan Filed By: Smith, Jan Franklin (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Kathryn C Smith and Judee Weinberg, Trustees of the Survivor's Trust Under the Smith Family Trust of May 23, 1983. Filed By: Kathryn C Smith and Judee Weinberg, Trustees of the Survivor's Trust Under the Smith Family Trust of May 23, 1983 (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Smith, Jan Franklin. Filed By: Smith, Jan Franklin (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process filed by Smith, Jan Franklin. Filed By: Smith, Jan Franklin (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by California Numismatic Funding Inc. Refers to: Smith, Jan; Kathryn C Smith and Judee Weinberg, Trustees of the Survivor's Trust Under the Smith Family Trust of May 23, 1983 Filed By: California Numismatic Funding Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/26/2021 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-29 Robert P Dahlquist.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint in Interpleader filed by California Numismatic Funding Inc. Refers to: Smith, Jan; Kathryn C Smith and Judee Weinberg, Trustees of the Survivor's Trust Under the Smith Family Trust of May 23, 1983 Filed By: California Numismatic Funding Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by California Numismatic Funding Inc. Refers to: Smith, Jan; Kathryn C Smith and Judee Weinberg, Trustees of the Survivor's Trust Under the Smith Family Trust of May 23, 1983 Filed By: California Numismatic Funding Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by California Numismatic Funding Inc. Refers to: Smith, Jan; Kathryn C Smith and Judee Weinberg, Trustees of the Survivor's Trust Under the Smith Family Trust of May 23, 1983 Filed By: California Numismatic Funding Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Dahlquist, Robert.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PADWAY, LAURENCE F.