This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 01/19/2022 at 08:15:40 (UTC).

California Fair Plan Association vs United States Department of Agriculture

Case Summary

On 10/21/2021 California Fair Plan Association filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against United States Department of Agriculture. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory W Pollack. The case status is Other - Transferred.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Gregory W Pollack

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

California Fair Plan Association

Defendants

California Department of Forestry and Fire Protection

Cleveland National Forest

United States Department of Agriculture

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Walsh, Mark A

Attorney at WATKINS & LETOFSKY LLP

2900 S Harbor Blvd Suite 240

Santa Ana, CA 92704

Defendant Attorneys

Vanden Heuvel, Tim J

Attorney at ATTORNEY GENERAL S OFFICE

600 W Broadway Unit 1800

San Diego, CA 92101

Church, Rebecca

 

Court Documents

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by California Fair Plan Association. Refers to: United States Department of Agriculture; Cleveland National Forest; California Department of Forestry and Fire Protection

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by California Fair Plan Association. Refers to: United States Department of Agriculture; Cleveland National Forest; California Department of Forestry and Fire Protection

Complaint

Complaint filed by California Fair Plan Association. Refers to: United States Department of Agriculture; Cleveland National Forest; California Department of Forestry and Fire Protection

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by California Fair Plan Association. Refers to: Cleveland National Forest

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by California Fair Plan Association. Refers to: United States Department of Agriculture

Notice to Filing Party SD

Notice of Removal to Federal Court submitted by United States Department of Agriculture; Cleveland National Forest rejected on 12/27/2021.

Proof of Service (Proof of Service - General)

Proof of Service filed by United States Department of Agriculture.

Notice of Removal to Federal Court (Stays)

Notice of Removal to Federal Court filed by United States Department of Agriculture.

of Demurring or Moving Party in Support of Automatic Extension

Declaration of Meet and Confer filed by California Department of Forestry and Fire Protection.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by California Fair Plan Association. Refers to: California Department of Forestry and Fire Protection

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court submitted by United States Department of Agriculture; Cleveland National Forest rejected on 12/27/2021. Filed By: United States Department of Agriculture (Defendant); Cleveland National Forest (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/25/2022 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-71 Gregory W Pollack was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court filed by United States Department of Agriculture. Filed By: United States Department of Agriculture (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by United States Department of Agriculture. Filed By: United States Department of Agriculture (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Meet and Confer filed by California Department of Forestry and Fire Protection. Filed By: California Department of Forestry and Fire Protection (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by California Fair Plan Association. Refers to: California Department of Forestry and Fire Protection Filed By: California Fair Plan Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by California Fair Plan Association. Refers to: United States Department of Agriculture Filed By: California Fair Plan Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by California Fair Plan Association. Refers to: Cleveland National Forest Filed By: California Fair Plan Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/25/2022 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-71 Gregory W Pollack.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by California Fair Plan Association. Refers to: United States Department of Agriculture; Cleveland National Forest; California Department of Forestry and Fire Protection Filed By: California Fair Plan Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by California Fair Plan Association. Refers to: United States Department of Agriculture; Cleveland National Forest; California Department of Forestry and Fire Protection Filed By: California Fair Plan Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by California Fair Plan Association. Refers to: United States Department of Agriculture; Cleveland National Forest; California Department of Forestry and Fire Protection Filed By: California Fair Plan Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Pollack, Gregory.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALIFORNIA FAIR PLAN is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WALSH MARK A