This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/31/2021 at 02:15:56 (UTC).

California Capital Insurance Company vs Sartoretto

Case Summary

On 05/26/2021 California Capital Insurance Company filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Sartoretto. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kenneth J Medel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kenneth J Medel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

California Capital Insurance Company

Defendants

Sartoretto, Roberta Rovaris

De Oliveira, Joackim L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAMS, JASON P

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by California Capital Insurance Company. Refers to: De Oliveira, Joackim

Complaint

[A document for ROA# 1]

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by California Capital Insurance Company. Refers to: Sartoretto, Roberta; De Oliveira, Joackim

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by California Capital Insurance Company. Refers to: Sartoretto, Roberta; De Oliveira, Joackim

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-66; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by California Capital Insurance Company. Refers to: De Oliveira, Joackim Filed By: California Capital Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/04/2022 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-66 Kenneth J Medel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[A document for ROA# 1]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketComplaint filed by California Capital Insurance Company. Refers to: Sartoretto, Roberta; De Oliveira, Joackim Filed By: California Capital Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by California Capital Insurance Company. Refers to: Sartoretto, Roberta; De Oliveira, Joackim Filed By: California Capital Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by California Capital Insurance Company. Refers to: Sartoretto, Roberta; De Oliveira, Joackim Filed By: California Capital Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Medel, Kenneth.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALIFORNIA CAPITAL INSURANCE COMAPY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WILLIAMS, JASON P