This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 09/12/2021 at 07:12:33 (UTC).

California Capital Insurance Company vs Harris

Case Summary

On 07/14/2021 California Capital Insurance Company filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Harris. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is John S. Meyer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

John S. Meyer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

California Capital Insurance Company

Defendants

Harris, Andrew S

Lopez, Angel D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAMS, JASON P

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by California Capital Insurance Company. Refers to: Harris, Andrew; Lopez, Angel

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by California Capital Insurance Company. Refers to: Harris, Andrew; Lopez, Angel

Complaint

Complaint filed by California Capital Insurance Company. Refers to: Harris, Andrew; Lopez, Angel

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by California Capital Insurance Company. Refers to: Lopez, Angel

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-64; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by California Capital Insurance Company. Refers to: Lopez, Angel Filed By: California Capital Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/04/2022 at 09:45:00 AM at Central in C-64 John S. Meyer.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by California Capital Insurance Company. Refers to: Harris, Andrew; Lopez, Angel Filed By: California Capital Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by California Capital Insurance Company. Refers to: Harris, Andrew; Lopez, Angel Filed By: California Capital Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by California Capital Insurance Company. Refers to: Harris, Andrew; Lopez, Angel Filed By: California Capital Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Meyer, John.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALIFORNIA CAPITAL INSURANCE COMAPY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WILLIAMS, JASON P