This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/27/2019 at 08:28:40 (UTC).

CACH LLC vs. Jeffers

Case Summary

On 03/29/2012 CACH LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Jeffers. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, East County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************L-EC

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CACH LLC

Defendant

Jeffers, George S

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Vos, Ryan E

Attorney at MANDARICH LAW GROUP LLP

420 N Wabash Ave Ste 203

Chicago, IL 60611

 

Court Documents

Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied

Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed by CACH LLC.

Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000

Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by CACH LLC. Refers to: Jeffers, George

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by CACH LLC. Refers to: Jeffers, George

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Collections SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Collections SD

Case initiation form printed.

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by CACH LLC. Refers to: Jeffers, George

Statement of Venue

Statement of Venue filed by CACH LLC. Refers to: Jeffers, George

Request for Dismissal of Does

Request for Dismissal of Does filed by CACH LLC.

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default filed by CACH LLC. Refers to: Jeffers, George

Judgment by Default by Clerk

Judgment by Default by Clerk filed by CACH LLC. Refers to: Jeffers, George

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by CACH LLC. Refers to: Jeffers, George

writ

Writ of Execution issued.

Abstract of Judgment

Abstract of Judgment issued.

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by CACH LLC.

Notice to Filing Party SD

Correspondence (Check # 925037) submitted by CACH LLC rejected on 03/29/2014.

Writ of Execution issued. - 03/29/2014

Writ of Execution issued.

Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied

Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed by CACH LLC. Refers to: Jeffers, George

Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number

Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by CACH LLC.

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed by CACH LLC. Filed By: CACH LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by CACH LLC. Filed By: CACH LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed by CACH LLC. Refers to: Jeffers, George Filed By: CACH LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Correspondence (Check # 925037) submitted by CACH LLC rejected on 03/29/2014. Filed By: CACH LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by CACH LLC. Filed By: CACH LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2013
  • Writ Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Abstract of Judgment issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2013
  • ****ABSTRACT RECIEVED****

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 09/24/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal of Does filed by CACH LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by CACH LLC. Refers to: Jeffers, George Filed By: CACH LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Venue filed by CACH LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by CACH LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2012
  • Case assigned to Department E-21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2012
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by CACH LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by CACH LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.