This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/19/2019 at 07:12:11 (UTC).

Busch vs. United Parcel Service of America Inc

Case Summary

On 01/22/2019 Busch filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against United Parcel Service of America Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert P Dahlquist and Jacqueline M. Stern. The case status is Other - Transferred.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************T-NC

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Courthouse:

    North County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judges

Robert P Dahlquist

Jacqueline M. Stern

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Busch, Dennis

Defendants

Nicolau, Rodrigo J

BJT Investments Inc

United Parcel Service of America Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Terence, Mix J

2052 Avenue Of The Trees

Carlsbad, CA 92008

Defendant Attorney

Hirschberg, Mark L

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF ERIC G ANDERSON

1851 E First Street 750

Santa Ana, CA 92705

 

Court Documents

Answer

Answer filed by BJT Investments Inc; Nicolau, Rodrigo J.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit (and Demand) filed by BJT Investments Inc; Nicolau, Rodrigo J.

Notice Of Defendant United Parcel Service Of America Inc., Filing Of Notice Of Removal Of Action To Federal Court

Notice of Removal to Federal Court filed by United Parcel Service of America Inc.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by United Parcel Service of America Inc.

Peremptory Challenge

Peremptory Challenge filed by Busch, Dennis.

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from Judge Dahlquist, Robert P to Jacqueline Stern effective 01/29/2019

Complaint

Complaint filed by Busch, Dennis. Refers to: United Parcel Service of America Inc; BJT Investments Inc; Nicolau, Rodrigo

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Busch, Dennis. Refers to: United Parcel Service of America Inc; BJT Investments Inc; Nicolau, Rodrigo

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Busch, Dennis. Refers to: United Parcel Service of America Inc; BJT Investments Inc; Nicolau, Rodrigo

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/28/2019 at 09:30:00 AM at North County in N-29 Robert P Dahlquist.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Case initiation form printed.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2019
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/28/2019 at 09:30:00 AM at North County in N-27 Jacqueline M. Stern was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service filed by United Parcel Service of America Inc. Filed By: United Parcel Service of America Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Removal to Federal Court filed by United Parcel Service of America Inc. Filed By: United Parcel Service of America Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Jury Fee Deposit (and Demand) filed by BJT Investments Inc; Nicolau, Rodrigo J. Filed By: BJT Investments Inc (Defendant); Nicolau, Rodrigo J (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed by BJT Investments Inc; Nicolau, Rodrigo J. Filed By: BJT Investments Inc (Defendant); Nicolau, Rodrigo J (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • Civil Case Management Conference reassigned to Stern, Jacqueline for 06/28/2019 at 09:30:00 AM in N-27 at North County.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Case reassigned from Judge Dahlquist, Robert P to Jacqueline Stern effective 01/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Peremptory Challenge filed by Busch, Dennis. Filed By: Busch, Dennis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/28/2019 at 09:30:00 AM at North County in N-29 Robert P Dahlquist.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Dahlquist, Robert.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Busch, Dennis. Refers to: United Parcel Service of America Inc; BJT Investments Inc; Nicolau, Rodrigo Filed By: Busch, Dennis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Busch, Dennis. Refers to: United Parcel Service of America Inc; BJT Investments Inc; Nicolau, Rodrigo Filed By: Busch, Dennis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by Busch, Dennis. Refers to: United Parcel Service of America Inc; BJT Investments Inc; Nicolau, Rodrigo Filed By: Busch, Dennis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNITED PARCEL SERVICES OF AMERICA INC. LEGAL DEPARTMENT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MIX TERENCE J.