This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 07/21/2020 at 02:27:30 (UTC).

BURTCHER vs BURGER KING

Case Summary

On 11/27/2018 BURTCHER filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BURGER KING. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT P DAHLQUIST. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************O-NC

  • Filing Date:

    11/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERT P DAHLQUIST

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BURTCHER, MARIA

Defendants

BURGER KING CORPORATION

PUJA RESTAURANT GROUP INC; DBA : BURGER KING

Roes 1 thriugh 25

Leal, Maribel

Betty F. Thompson, Trustee of the Thompson Family Trust

Rodriguez, Paul

Rodriguez, Israel

Armando's Mexican Food

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MARCUS, GERALD L

24025 Park Sorrento #430

Calabasas, CA 91302

Consolo, T. Vincent

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF GERALD L MARCUS

Defendant Attorney

Norris, Suzanne T

 

Court Documents

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Civil Jury Trial rescheduled to 02/19/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in N-29 before Robert P Dahlquist at North County.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) rescheduled to 01/29/2021 at 10:00:00 AM in N-29 before Robert P Dahlquist at North County.

Notice of Unavailability of counsel

Notice - Other (NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL) filed by PUJA RESTAURANT GROUP INC.

Notice of Unavailability of counsel

Notice - Other (NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL) filed by PUJA RESTAURANT GROUP INC.

Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed by Burtcher, Maria. Refers to: Armando's Mexican Food; Rodriguez, Israel; Leal, Maribel; Rodriguez, Paul

First Amended Complaint

Amended Complaint (**1ST AMENDED**) filed by Burtcher, Maria. Refers to: PUJA RESTAURANT GROUP INC; Leal, Maribel; Rodriguez, Paul; Rodriguez, Israel; Betty F. Thompson, Trustee of the Thompson Family Trust; Armando's Mexican Food

First Amended Summons

Original Summons filed by Burtcher, Maria. Refers to: PUJA RESTAURANT GROUP INC; Leal, Maribel; Rodriguez, Paul; Rodriguez, Israel; Betty F. Thompson, Trustee of the Thompson Family Trust; Armando's Mexican Food

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Burtcher, Maria. Refers to: Rodriguez, Paul

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Burtcher, Maria. Refers to: Betty F. Thompson, Trustee of the Thompson Family Trust

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Burtcher, Maria. Refers to: Leal, Maribel

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Burtcher, Maria. Refers to: Armando's Mexican Food

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Burtcher, Maria. Refers to: Rodriguez, Israel

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 08/09/2019 09:30:00 AM. (As Amended)

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Notice - Other

Notice - Other (OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL) filed by BURGER KING CORPORATION; PUJA RESTAURANT GROUP INC.

DEFENDANTS, ISRAEL RODRIGUEZ, MARIBEL LEAL, PAUL RODRIGUEZ, and ARMANDOS MEXICAN FOOD ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Answer filed by Armando's Mexican Food; Rodriguez, Israel; Leal, Maribel; Rodriguez, Paul.

Stipulation - Other

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due filed by Burtcher, Maria; PUJA RESTAURANT GROUP INC.

Proposed Order granting FAC

Proposed Order filed by Burtcher, Maria.

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2021
  • HearingLocation: N-29; Event Type: Civil Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • HearingLocation: N-29; Event Type: Trial Readiness Conference (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice - Other (NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL) filed by PUJA RESTAURANT GROUP INC. Filed By: PUJA RESTAURANT GROUP INC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice - Other (NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL) filed by PUJA RESTAURANT GROUP INC. Filed By: PUJA RESTAURANT GROUP INC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketAmended Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Armando's Mexican Food.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketAmended Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Leal, Maribel .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketAmended Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Rodriguez, Israel .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketAmended Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Rodriguez, Paul .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed by Burtcher, Maria. Refers to: Armando's Mexican Food; Rodriguez, Israel; Leal, Maribel; Rodriguez, Paul Filed By: Burtcher, Maria (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial rescheduled to 02/19/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in N-29 before Robert P Dahlquist at North County.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 12/29/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference reassigned to Dahlquist, Robert for 05/03/2019 at 09:30:00 AM in N-29 at North County.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase reassigned from Frazier,Ronald to Dahlquist,Robert effective 12/29/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint/Cross-Complaint naming Doe (DOE 1) filed by Burtcher, Maria. Refers to: AMIN, JAGDISH; DYSON, CYNTHIS; TUFFORD, FAYETTA; BURGER KING; BURGER KING CORPORATION; BURGER KING CORP LF JETLINK; PUJA RESTAURANT GROUP INC; JETLINK INTERNATIONAL CAPITAL INVESTMENT LLC; DYSON FAMILY TRUST; TUFFORD FAYETTA M TRUST Filed By: Burtcher, Maria (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/03/2019 at 09:30:00 AM at North County in N-29 Ronald F. Frazier.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Burtcher, Maria. Refers to: BURGER KING; BURGER KING CORPORATION; BURGER KING CORP LF JETLINK; PUJA RESTAURANT GROUP INC; JETLINK INTERNATIONAL CAPITAL INVESTMENT LLC; DYSON, CYNTHIS; DYSON FAMILY TRUST; TUFFORD, FAYETTA; TUFFORD FAYETTA M TRUST; AMIN, JAGDISH Filed By: Burtcher, Maria (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Burtcher, Maria. Refers to: BURGER KING; BURGER KING CORPORATION; BURGER KING CORP LF JETLINK; PUJA RESTAURANT GROUP INC; JETLINK INTERNATIONAL CAPITAL INVESTMENT LLC; DYSON, CYNTHIS; DYSON FAMILY TRUST; TUFFORD, FAYETTA; TUFFORD FAYETTA M TRUST Filed By: Burtcher, Maria (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Burtcher, Maria. Refers to: BURGER KING; BURGER KING CORPORATION; BURGER KING CORP LF JETLINK; PUJA RESTAURANT GROUP INC; JETLINK INTERNATIONAL CAPITAL INVESTMENT LLC; DYSON, CYNTHIS; DYSON FAMILY TRUST; TUFFORD, FAYETTA; TUFFORD FAYETTA M TRUST Filed By: Burtcher, Maria (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Frazier, Ronald.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CHRISTOPHER THOMPSON TRUSTEE OF THE THOMPSON FAMILY TRUST DATED DECEMBER 5, 1992 is a litigant

Latest cases where BURGER KING CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NORRIS, SUZANNE T