This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/25/2021 at 05:16:45 (UTC).

Bundies vs LEGOLAND CALIFORNIA LLC

Case Summary

On 06/16/2020 Bundies filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LEGOLAND CALIFORNIA LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Earl H. Maas, III. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************O-NC

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Earl H. Maas, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bundies, Brian

Defendants

Legoland California LLC

Legoland California Resort LLC; ESA : Legoland California LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Lewis, Rosemarie S

626 Wilshire Boulevard 975

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

REPLY AND NOTICE OF NON OPPOSITION

Reply filed by Legoland California Resort LLC.

REPLY AND NOTICE OF NON OPPOSITION

Reply filed by Legoland California Resort LLC.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action (**Not Entered**) filed by Bundies, Brian.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Bundies, Brian. Refers to: Legoland California Resort LLC

DEFENDANTS REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS NON OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE ALL CLAIMS FOR PUNITIVE DAMAGES IN PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

Reply filed by Legoland California Resort LLC.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Demurrer / Motion to Strike heard 10/30/2020 01:30:00 PM.

Amended Complaint

Amended Complaint filed by Bundies, Brian. Refers to: Legoland California Resort LLC

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Bundies, Brian.

NOTICE OF RULING

Notice of Ruling filed by Legoland California Resort LLC.

NOTICE OF RULING

[Another document for ROA# 17]

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

Answer

Answer filed by Legoland California Resort LLC.

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO JUDICIAL COUNCIL FORM INTERROGATORIES SET ONE

Motion - Other (3/12/2021) filed by Legoland California Resort LLC.

PROPOSED ORDER COMPELLING RESPONSES WITHOUT OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANT LEGOLAND CALIFORNIA LLCS FORM INTERROGATORIES SET ONE

Proposed Order (3/12/2021) submitted by Legoland California Resort LLC received but not filed on 02/08/2021.

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS SET ONE

Motion - Other (3/12/2021) filed by Legoland California Resort LLC.

PROPOSED ORDER COMPELLING RESPONSES WITHOUT OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANT LEGOLAND CALIFORNIA LLCS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS SET ONE

Proposed Order (3/12/2021) submitted by Legoland California Resort LLC received but not filed on 02/08/2021.

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE ALL CLAIMS FOR PUNITIVE DAMAGES IN PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES DECLARATION OF ROSEMARIE S LEWIS ESQ AND PROPOSED ORDER THEREON

Motion to Strike (10/30/2020) filed by Legoland California Resort LLC.

PROPOSED ORDER RE MOTION TO STRIKE ALL CLAIMS FOR PUNITIVE DAMAGES IN PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

Proposed Order submitted by Legoland California Resort LLC received but not filed on 07/31/2020.

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Bundies, Brian. Refers to: Legoland California Resort LLC Filed By: Bundies, Brian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Legoland California Resort LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Bundies, Brian .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/26/2021 at 10:00:00 AM at North County in N-28 Earl H. Maas was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketMotion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 03/12/2021 at 01:30:00 PM at North County in N-28 Earl H. Maas was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketMotion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 03/12/2021 at 01:30:00 PM at North County in N-28 Earl H. Maas was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action (**Not Entered**) filed by Bundies, Brian. Filed By: Bundies, Brian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply filed by Legoland California Resort LLC. Filed By: Legoland California Resort LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply filed by Legoland California Resort LLC. Filed By: Legoland California Resort LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketMotion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 03/12/2021 at 01:30:00 PM at North County in N-28 Earl H. Maas.

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketDemurrer / Motion to Strike scheduled for 10/30/2020 at 01:30:00 PM at North County in N-28 Earl H. Maas.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Strike (10/30/2020) filed by Legoland California Resort LLC. Filed By: Legoland California Resort LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order submitted by Legoland California Resort LLC received but not filed on 07/31/2020. Filed By: Legoland California Resort LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/26/2021 at 10:00:00 AM at North County in N-28 Earl H. Maas.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Bundies, Brian. Refers to: Legoland California Resort LLC Filed By: Bundies, Brian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Bundies, Brian. Refers to: Legoland California Resort LLC Filed By: Bundies, Brian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Bundies, Brian. Refers to: Legoland California Resort LLC Filed By: Bundies, Brian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Maas, Earl.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LEGOLAND CALIFORNIA RESORT is a litigant

Latest cases where Legoland California LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEWIS ROSEMARIE SUAZO