This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 01/13/2023 at 09:56:03 (UTC).

Bullock vs Southern California Discount Tire Co Inc

Case Summary

On 06/29/2022 Bullock filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Southern California Discount Tire Co Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is John S. Meyer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

John S. Meyer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bullock, Harvey

Defendants

COOPER, SAM

Halle Properties LLC

Southern California Discount Tire Co Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sedrish, Laura F

Defendant Attorney

Kohn, Andrew N

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by Bullock, Harvey. Refers to: Southern California Discount Tire Co Inc; Halle Properties LLC; COOPER, SAM

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Bullock, Harvey. Refers to: Southern California Discount Tire Co Inc; Halle Properties LLC; COOPER, SAM

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Bullock, Harvey. Refers to: Southern California Discount Tire Co Inc; Halle Properties LLC; COOPER, SAM

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Bullock, Harvey.

Proof of Service by Personal Service

Proof of Service filed by Bullock, Harvey.

Proof of Service by Personal Service

Proof of Service filed by Bullock, Harvey.

Proof of Service by Personal Service

Proof of Service filed by Bullock, Harvey.

Defendant Southern California Discount Tire Co., Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint

Answer filed by Southern California Discount Tire Co Inc.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Bullock, Harvey.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Southern California Discount Tire Co Inc.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Southern California Discount Tire Co Inc.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 12/16/2022 09:30:00 AM.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2023
  • HearingLocation: C-64; Event Type: Civil Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2023
  • HearingLocation: C-64; Event Type: Trial Readiness Conference (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketComplaint dismissed without prejudice as to Halle Properties LLC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketComplaint dismissed without prejudice as to COOPER, SAM .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 12/16/2022 09:30:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 10/06/2023 at 08:30AM before Judge John S. Meyer.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial scheduled for 10/20/2023 at 09:00AM before Judge John S. Meyer.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Southern California Discount Tire Co Inc.; Filed By: Southern California Discount Tire Co Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Southern California Discount Tire Co Inc.; Filed By: Southern California Discount Tire Co Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Bullock, Harvey.; Filed By: Bullock, Harvey (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Bullock, Harvey.; Filed By: Bullock, Harvey (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Bullock, Harvey.; Filed By: Bullock, Harvey (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Bullock, Harvey.; Filed By: Bullock, Harvey (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/16/2022 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-64 John S. Meyer.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Meyer, John.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Bullock, Harvey. Refers to: Southern California Discount Tire Co Inc; Halle Properties LLC; COOPER, SAM; Filed By: Bullock, Harvey (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Bullock, Harvey. Refers to: Southern California Discount Tire Co Inc; Halle Properties LLC; COOPER, SAM; Filed By: Bullock, Harvey (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Bullock, Harvey. Refers to: Southern California Discount Tire Co Inc; Halle Properties LLC; COOPER, SAM; Filed By: Bullock, Harvey (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less