This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/12/2018 at 06:17:52 (UTC).

Budd E Rubin vs Allan J Flader

Case Summary

On 07/02/2015 Budd E Rubin filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Allan J Flader. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EDDIE C STURGEON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

EDDIE C STURGEON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Budd E Rubin as trustee of the Ruin Trust Dated September 27 1989

Rubin, Budd E

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Allan J Flader as trustee of the Allan J Flader Revocable Trust Dated May 27 1998

Dodd PE, Jerry

Flader, Allan J

RSM2 Contractors Inc

The Sanderling Association

SPEEDWAY CONSTRUCTORS INC

DODD PE, JERRY ; AKA : DODD, JERRY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MESSER, RICHARD J; Nys, Mark H

600 West Broadway

San Diego, CA 92101

NYS, MARK H

Attorney at KLINEDINST PC

501 W Broadway

San Diego, CA 92101

MESSER, RICHARD J

Attorney at KLINEDINST PC

501 W Broadway 600

San Diego, CA 92101

HUELSKAMP, ROSE M

Attorney at DUCKOR SPRADLING METZGER & WYNNE

101 W Broadway 1700

San Diego, CA 92101

METZGER, SCOTT L

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

KONOSKE, GREGORY P

Attorney at KONOSKE AKIYAMA & BRUST LLP

16880 W Bernardo Drive 250

San Diego, CA 92127

POPENEY, ROGER L

Attorney at HARTSUYKER STRATMAN & WILLIAMS ABREGO

P O Box 258829

Oklahoma City, OK 73125

PESTOTNIK, TIMOTHY R

Attorney at PESTOTNIK LLP

501 W Broadway

San Diego, CA 92101

PRINTZ, MATTHEW H

Attorney at MURCHISON & CUMMING LLP

750 B Street 2550

San Diego, CA 92101-8114

ROGASKI, MICHAEL E

Attorney at GRECO TRAFICANTE SCHULZ & BRICK

One America Plaza, 600 W Broadway

San Diego, CA 92101

SCHULZ, PETER JON

LIEBER, MEGAN K

Attorney at COLLINS COLLINS MUIR STEWART LLP

1100 El Centro St

South Pasadena, CA 91030

 

Court Documents

RE Ex Parte Shortening Time and Specially Setting Dodds Discovery Motions Before the Date Currently Set for Trial

Proposed Order (RE Ex Parte Shortening Time and Specially Setting Dodds Discovery Motions Before the Date Currently Set for Trial) submitted by Dodd PE, Jerry received but not filed on 03/13/2017.

Proof of Service Re: Opp to Deft. Dodd's MTC Deft Flader's Resp. to Form Interrogatories, Special Interrogatories, and Request for Production; to Deem Admitted Requests for Admissions; and Req. for Monetary Sanctions

Proof of Service filed by Flader, Allan J; Allan J Flader as trustee of the Allan J Flader Revocable Trust Dated May 27 1998.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 08/25/2015 08:30:00 AM.

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Rubin, Budd E; Budd E Rubin as trustee of the Ruin Trust Dated September 27 1989. Refers to: Flader, Allan; Allan J Flader as trustee of the Allan J Flader Revocable Trust Dated May 27 1998; The Sanderling Association; Dodd, Jerry; RSM2 Contractors Inc

Attachment - Other

Attachment - Other (SUPPLEMENTAL EX PARTE APPLICATION (SECOND) TO EXTEND TIME TO SERVE COMPLAINT) filed by Budd E Rubin as trustee of the Ruin Trust Dated September 27 1989.

Answer

Answer (with Proof of Service) filed by Dodd PE, Jerry.

Notice of Motion for Summary JudgmenT

Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication filed by Dodd PE, Jerry.

Appendix of Evidence in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment

Attachment - Other (Appendix of Evidence in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment) filed by Dodd PE, Jerry.

Declaration of Megan Lieber

Declaration - Other (Declaration of Megan Lieber) filed by Dodd PE, Jerry.

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail (Served Answer, Cross-Complaint, and Summons on Cross-Complaint to Attorney Megan K. Lieber) filed by Allan J Flader as trustee of the Allan J Flader Revocable Trust Dated May 27 1998; Flader, Allan J.

Opposition to Deft Dodd's MTC Deft Flader's Resp to Form Interrogatories, Special Interrogatories, and Req. for Production; to Deem Admitted Req. for Admissions; and Req. for Monetary Sanctions

Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by Flader, Allan J; Allan J Flader as trustee of the Allan J Flader Revocable Trust Dated May 27 1998.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Flader, Allan J; Allan J Flader as trustee of the Allan J Flader Revocable Trust Dated May 27 1998.

Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by The Sanderling Association.

Decl of Megan K. Hawkins in support of Opposition to Deft Dodd's Suppl MTC Further Resp to Special Interrogatories and Req for Monetary Sanctions

Declaration - Other (Decl of Megan K. Hawkins) filed by Flader, Allan J; Allan J Flader as trustee of the Allan J Flader Revocable Trust Dated May 27 1998.

of Peter S Curry in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment

Declaration - Other (of Peter S Curry in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment) filed by Dodd PE, Jerry.

Separate Statement

Statement - Other (Separate Statement) filed by Dodd PE, Jerry.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by The Sanderling Association.

Decl of Gregory P. Konoske in support of Opposition to Deft Dodd's Suppl MTC Further Resp to Special Interrogatories and Req for Monetary Sanctions

Declaration - Other (Decl of Gregory P. Konoske) filed by Flader, Allan J; Allan J Flader as trustee of the Allan J Flader Revocable Trust Dated May 27 1998.

139 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2018
  • Settlement Conference (Civil) scheduled for 04/13/2018 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in 904 Kevin A. Enright was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Association of Attorney (& Proof of Service) filed by Speedway Constructors Inc. Filed By: Speedway Constructors Inc (Cross - Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • Ex Parte scheduled for 04/17/2018 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-67 Eddie C Sturgeon.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed by Speedway Constructors Inc. Filed By: Speedway Constructors Inc (Cross - Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Dodd PE, Jerry. Refers to: Speedway Constructors Inc Filed By: Dodd PE, Jerry (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons (Cross Complaint) filed by Dodd PE, Jerry. Refers to: Speedway Constructors Inc Filed By: Dodd PE, Jerry (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Cross-Complaint filed by Dodd PE, Jerry. Refers to: Speedway Constructors Inc Filed By: Dodd PE, Jerry (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 01/18/2018 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) continued pursuant to party's motion to 06/08/2018 at 10:15AM before Judge Eddie C Sturgeon.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • Civil Jury Trial continued pursuant to party's motion to 06/22/2018 at 08:30AM before Judge Eddie C Sturgeon.

    Read MoreRead Less
187 More Docket Entries
  • 08/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 08/25/2015 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents (EX PARTE APPLICATION TO EXTEND TIME TO SERVE COMPLAINT) filed by Budd E Rubin as trustee of the Ruin Trust Dated September 27 1989. Filed By: Budd E Rubin as trustee of the Ruin Trust Dated September 27 1989 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2015
  • Ex Parte scheduled for 08/25/2015 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-67 Eddie C Sturgeon.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/26/2016 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-67 Eddie C Sturgeon.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2015
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Sturgeon, Eddie.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Rubin, Budd E; Budd E Rubin as trustee of the Ruin Trust Dated September 27 1989. Refers to: Flader, Allan; Allan J Flader as trustee of the Allan J Flader Revocable Trust Dated May 27 1998; The Sanderling Association; Dodd, Jerry; RSM2 Contractors Inc Filed By: Rubin, Budd E (Plaintiff); Budd E Rubin as trustee of the Ruin Trust Dated September 27 1989 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Rubin, Budd E; Budd E Rubin as trustee of the Ruin Trust Dated September 27 1989. Refers to: Flader, Allan; Allan J Flader as trustee of the Allan J Flader Revocable Trust Dated May 27 1998; The Sanderling Association; Dodd, Jerry; RSM2 Contractors Inc Filed By: Rubin, Budd E (Plaintiff); Budd E Rubin as trustee of the Ruin Trust Dated September 27 1989 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by Rubin, Budd E; Budd E Rubin as trustee of the Ruin Trust Dated September 27 1989. Refers to: Flader, Allan; Allan J Flader as trustee of the Allan J Flader Revocable Trust Dated May 27 1998; The Sanderling Association; Dodd PE, Jerry; RSM2 Contractors Inc; Speedway Constructors Inc Filed By: Rubin, Budd E (Plaintiff); Budd E Rubin as trustee of the Ruin Trust Dated September 27 1989 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.