This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/07/2018 at 07:21:07 (UTC).

Brown vs. San Diego Fun Rentals Inc

Case Summary

On 03/25/2014 Brown filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against San Diego Fun Rentals Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT P DAHLQUIST. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************L-NC

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERT P DAHLQUIST

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brown, Deborah

Defendants and Cross Defendants

San Diego Fun Rentals Inc

Shiloh Church of God in Christ Oceanside

SAN DIEGO PREMIER PARTY RENTALS

PREMIER PARTY & TENT RENTALS

PREMIER PARTY RENTALS

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

Shiloh Church of God in Christ Oceanside

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FEERICK, THOMAS F

Attorney at FEERICK & ASSOCIATES

107 Encinitas Boulevard

Encinitas, CA 92024

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

BECKER, ROBERT

340 S Lemon 4867

Tunkhannock, PA 18657

BROCKMAN, ROBERT W JR

340 S Lemon 4867

Tunkhannock, PA 18657

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

BROCKMAN, ROBERT W JR

340 S Lemon 4867

Tunkhannock, PA 18657

 

Court Documents

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Brown, Deborah. Refers to: San Diego Fun Rentals Inc; Shiloh Church of God in Christ Oceanside

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/12/2014 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-29 Robert P Dahlquist.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service (X-Complaint) filed by Shiloh Church of God in Christ Oceanside.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail filed by Shiloh Church of God in Christ Oceanside.

Order - Other

Order - Other (1/28/15 - ORDER RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER ENTERING DEFAULT JUDGMENT ON THE CROSS-COMPLAINT AGAINST SAN DIEGO FUN RENTALS (GRANTED) filed by Shiloh Church of God in Christ Oceanside. Refers to: San Diego Fun Rentals Inc

Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number

Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Brown, Deborah.

Notice to Filing Party SD

Request - Other (TO CONTINUE TRIAL REJECTED) submitted by Shiloh Church of God in Christ Oceanside rejected on 05/12/2015.

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail (CONFORMED COPY OF ORDER) filed by Shiloh Church of God in Christ Oceanside; Shiloh Church of God in Christ Oceanside.

Amendment to Complaint/Cross-Complaint naming Doe

Amendment to Complaint/Cross-Complaint naming Doe (ROE 11) filed by Shiloh Church of God in Christ Oceanside. Refers to: SAN DIEGO PREMIER PARTY RENTALS

Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number

Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Brown, Deborah.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Brown, Deborah. Refers to: SAN DIEGO PREMIER PARTY RENTALS

Amendment to Complaint

Amendment to Complaint (ROE 13) filed by Shiloh Church of God in Christ Oceanside. Refers to: Premier Party & Tent Rentals

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Civil Jury Trial was rescheduled to 02/08/2016 at 08:30:00 AM in N-29 before Robert P Dahlquist at North County.

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail (STIPULATION) filed by Shiloh Church of God in Christ Oceanside. Refers to: San Diego Fun Rentals Inc; Brown, Deborah

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) heard 01/29/2016 10:00:00 AM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial heard 02/08/2016 08:30:00 AM.

51 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2016
  • Ex Parte scheduled for 02/23/2016 at 08:30:00 AM at North County in N-29 Robert P Dahlquist was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2016
  • Ex Parte scheduled for 02/23/2016 at 08:30:00 AM at North County in N-29 Robert P Dahlquist.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Dismissal SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial heard 02/08/2016 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • Court ordered entire action dismissed without prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) heard 01/29/2016 10:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service by Mail (STIPULATION) filed by Shiloh Church of God in Christ Oceanside. Refers to: San Diego Fun Rentals Inc; Brown, Deborah Filed By: Shiloh Church of God in Christ Oceanside (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2015
  • Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 01/29/2016 at 10:00:00 AM at North County in N-29 Robert P Dahlquist.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • The Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) was rescheduled to 01/29/2016 at 10:00:00 AM in N-29 before Robert P Dahlquist at North County.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2015
  • Civil Jury Trial scheduled for 02/08/2016 at 08:30:00 AM at North County in N-29 Robert P Dahlquist.

    Read MoreRead Less
80 More Docket Entries
  • 04/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons (ON X-COMPLAINT) filed by Shiloh Church of God in Christ Oceanside. Refers to: San Diego Fun Rentals Inc Filed By: Shiloh Church of God in Christ Oceanside (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Cross-Complaint filed by Shiloh Church of God in Christ Oceanside. Refers to: San Diego Fun Rentals Inc; SAN DIEGO PREMIER PARTY RENTALS; Premier Party Rentals; Premier Party & Tent Rentals Filed By: Shiloh Church of God in Christ Oceanside (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed by Shiloh Church of God in Christ Oceanside. Refers to: Brown, Deborah Filed By: Shiloh Church of God in Christ Oceanside (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/12/2014 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-29 Robert P Dahlquist.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2014
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Dahlquist, Robert.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2014
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Brown, Deborah. Refers to: San Diego Fun Rentals Inc; Shiloh Church of God in Christ Oceanside Filed By: Brown, Deborah (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Brown, Deborah. Refers to: San Diego Fun Rentals Inc; Shiloh Church of God in Christ Oceanside Filed By: Brown, Deborah (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by Brown, Deborah. Refers to: San Diego Fun Rentals Inc; Shiloh Church of God in Christ Oceanside; SAN DIEGO PREMIER PARTY RENTALS Filed By: Brown, Deborah (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.