This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/28/2018 at 14:19:32 (UTC).

Brown vs. Pinto

Case Summary

On 04/02/2013 Brown filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Pinto. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT P DAHLQUIST. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************A-NC

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERT P DAHLQUIST

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brown, Michael

Defendants

Pinto, Juan

SMC Grease Specialist Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Benji, Daniel

Attorney at CARPENTER ZUCKERMAN & ROWLEY LLP

8827 W Olympic Blvd

Beverly Hills, CA 90211

MAZZA, STEVEN L

Attorney at CARPENTER ZUCKERMAN & ROWLEY LLP

8827 W Olympic Blvd

Beverly Hills, CA 90211

Defendant Attorney

WINET, RANDALL L

Attorney at WINET PATRICK GAYER CREIGHTON & HANES

1215 W Vista Way

Vista, CA 92083-6227

 

Court Documents

Complaint filed by Brown, Michael.

Complaint filed by Brown, Michael. Refers to: Pinto, Juan; SMC Grease Specialist Inc

Original Summons filed by Brown, Michael.

Original Summons filed by Brown, Michael. Refers to: Pinto, Juan; SMC Grease Specialist Inc

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Brown, Michael.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Brown, Michael. Refers to: Pinto, Juan; SMC Grease Specialist Inc

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/15/2013 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-29 Robert P Dahlquist.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Notice of Case Assignment SD generated.

Statement of Damages

Statement of Damages filed by Brown, Michael. Refers to: Pinto, Juan

Notice to Filing Party SD

[Another document for ROA# 10]

Request for Entry of Default

The default filed by Brown, Michael was denied. Refers to: Pinto, Juan

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Brown, Michael. Refers to: Pinto, Juan

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default filed by Brown, Michael. Refers to: Pinto, Juan

Statement of Damages

Statement of Damages filed by Brown, Michael. Refers to: SMC Grease Specialist Inc

Notice to Filing Party SD

[Another document for ROA# 15]

Request for Entry of Default

The default filed by Brown, Michael was denied. Refers to: SMC Grease Specialist Inc

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 11/15/2013 09:00:00 AM.

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default filed by Brown, Michael. Refers to: SMC Grease Specialist Inc

Notice to Filing Party SD

The default filed by was denied. Refers to: SMC Grease Specialist Inc

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default filed by Brown, Michael. Refers to: SMC Grease Specialist Inc

54 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Brown, Michael. Refers to: Pinto, Juan; SMC Grease Specialist Inc Filed By: Brown, Michael (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Brown, Michael .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to SMC Grease Specialist Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Pinto, Juan .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • Civil Jury Trial scheduled for 10/23/2015 at 08:30:00 AM at North County in N-29 Robert P Dahlquist was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Unconditional Settlement filed by Brown, Michael. Refers to: Pinto, Juan; SMC Grease Specialist Inc Filed By: Brown, Michael (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation - Other (STIPULATION REGARDING EXCLUSION OF EVIDENCE AT TRIAL N LIEU OF MOTIONS IN LIMINE) filed by SMC Grease Specialist Inc. Filed By: SMC Grease Specialist Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Opposition to Motion in Limine filed by SMC Grease Specialist Inc. Filed By: SMC Grease Specialist Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion in Limine (Number 6) filed by Brown, Michael. Filed By: Brown, Michael (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
69 More Docket Entries
  • 06/19/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • [Another document for ROA# 10]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Damages filed by Brown, Michael. Refers to: Pinto, Juan Filed By: Brown, Michael (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/15/2013 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-29 Robert P Dahlquist.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2013
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Dahlquist, Robert.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2013
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Brown, Michael. Refers to: Pinto, Juan; SMC Grease Specialist Inc Filed By: Brown, Michael (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Brown, Michael. Refers to: Pinto, Juan; SMC Grease Specialist Inc Filed By: Brown, Michael (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by Brown, Michael. Refers to: Pinto, Juan; SMC Grease Specialist Inc Filed By: Brown, Michael (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SMC GREASE SPECIALIST INC. A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WINET RANDALL LAWRENCE