This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/26/2021 at 12:02:03 (UTC).

Brooks vs Ryan

Case Summary

On 09/08/2020 Brooks filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Ryan. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Jacqueline M. Stern and Robert P Dahlquist. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************A-NC

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judges

Jacqueline M. Stern

Robert P Dahlquist

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brooks, Lori

Defendants

Ean Holdings LLC; DBA : Enterprise Rent-A-Car

Ryan, Kyle E

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Martin, Justin M

Attorney at PROCOPIO CORY HARGREAVES & SAVITCH LLP

Union Bank Of California Building, 525 B St #2200

San Diego, CA 92101

Neal, Todd

Attorney at PROCOPIO CORY HARGREAVES & SAVITCH LLP

525 B Street 2200

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorney

Pigott, Ginger

Attorney at GREENBERG TRAURIG LLP

1840 E Century Park 1900

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Brooks, Lori. Refers to: Ryan, Kyle; Ean Holdings LLC

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Brooks, Lori. Refers to: Ryan, Kyle; Ean Holdings LLC

Complaint

Complaint filed by Brooks, Lori. Refers to: Ryan, Kyle; Ean Holdings LLC

Answer (First Papers)

Answer filed by Ean Holdings LLC.

Answer (First Papers)

Answer filed by Ryan, Kyle E.

Proof of Service of Summons - Kyle E. Ryan

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Brooks, Lori; Brooks, Lori. Refers to: Ryan, Kyle

Proof of Service of Summons - EAN Holdings, LLC

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Brooks, Lori. Refers to: Ean Holdings LLC

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from Judge Freeland, Cynthia A. to Robert Dahlquist effective 11/13/2020

Peremptory Challenge

Peremptory Challenge filed by Ryan, Kyle E; Ean Holdings LLC.

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (Requests)

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due filed by Ryan, Kyle E; Ean Holdings LLC.

Request for Dismissal (Judgment/Dismissal)

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Brooks, Lori.

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/09/2021 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-29 Robert P Dahlquist was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Ean Holdings LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Ryan, Kyle E .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Brooks, Lori .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Brooks, Lori. Filed By: Brooks, Lori (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation - Other - Fee Due filed by Ryan, Kyle E; Ean Holdings LLC. Filed By: Ryan, Kyle E (Defendant); Ean Holdings LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference reassigned to Dahlquist, Robert for 07/09/2021 at 09:00:00 AM in N-29 at North County.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase reassigned from Judge Freeland, Cynthia A. to Robert Dahlquist effective 11/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference reassigned to Freeland, Cynthia for 07/09/2021 at 09:00:00 AM in N-27 at North County.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2020
  • DocketCase reassigned from Stern,Jacqueline to Freeland,Cynthia effective 11/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Ean Holdings LLC. Filed By: Ean Holdings LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Brooks, Lori. Refers to: Ean Holdings LLC Filed By: Brooks, Lori (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Brooks, Lori; Brooks, Lori. Refers to: Ryan, Kyle Filed By: Brooks, Lori (Plaintiff); Brooks, Lori (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/09/2021 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-27 Jacqueline M. Stern.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Brooks, Lori. Refers to: Ryan, Kyle; Ean Holdings LLC Filed By: Brooks, Lori (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Brooks, Lori. Refers to: Ryan, Kyle; Ean Holdings LLC Filed By: Brooks, Lori (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Brooks, Lori. Refers to: Ryan, Kyle; Ean Holdings LLC Filed By: Brooks, Lori (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Stern, Jacqueline.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EAN Holdings, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Martin, Justin M

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Neal, Todd