This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 12/28/2021 at 08:16:36 (UTC).

Britt vs C & W Diving Services Inc

Case Summary

On 09/29/2021 Britt filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against C W Diving Services Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Keri Katz. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Keri Katz

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Britt, Grace

Defendant

C & W Diving Services Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lovretovich, Joseph M

5855 Topanga Canyon Blvd 300

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Defendant Attorney

Adelman, Alison K.

4370 La Jolla Village Drive 990

San Diego, CA 92121

 

Court Documents

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Britt, Grace. Refers to: C & W Diving Services Inc

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Britt, Grace. Refers to: C & W Diving Services Inc

Complaint

Complaint filed by Britt, Grace. Refers to: C & W Diving Services Inc

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Britt, Grace. Refers to: C & W Diving Services Inc

Proof of Service by Mail (Proof of Service - General)

Proof of Service by Mail filed by C & W Diving Services Inc.

Answer (First Papers)

Answer filed by C & W Diving Services Inc.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-74; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by C & W Diving Services Inc. Filed By: C & W Diving Services Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail filed by C & W Diving Services Inc. Filed By: C & W Diving Services Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Britt, Grace. Refers to: C & W Diving Services Inc Filed By: Britt, Grace (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/10/2022 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-74 Keri Katz.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Britt, Grace. Refers to: C & W Diving Services Inc Filed By: Britt, Grace (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Britt, Grace. Refers to: C & W Diving Services Inc Filed By: Britt, Grace (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Britt, Grace. Refers to: C & W Diving Services Inc Filed By: Britt, Grace (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Katz, Keri.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Adelman, Alison K.