This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 01/19/2022 at 08:11:18 (UTC).

Bradley vs The Hartford Insurance Co

Case Summary

On 10/21/2021 Bradley filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against The Hartford Insurance Co. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is John S. Meyer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

John S. Meyer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bradley III, Gail Nadine

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendants

Castillo, Gustavo

Harry, Danielle

Mancini, Willis

The Hartford Insurance Co

Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company; ESA : The Hartford Insurance Co

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Magee, Melissa

895 Dove St 3Rd Floor

Newport Beach, CA 92660

 

Court Documents

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents filed by Bradley, Gail Nadine III.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 11/17/2021 08:30:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing on Demurrer of Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company to Complaint of Gail Nadine Bradley III

Notice of Hearing filed by Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company.

Demurrer of Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company to Complaint of Gail Nadine Bradley III; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Melissa R. Magee Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure Section 430.41

Demurrer filed by Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company.

Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike Portions of Complaint of Gail Nadine Bradley III by Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Melissa R. Magee

Motion to Strike filed by Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company.

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents (Rating on Auto Policy, Due to Irregular Rating) filed by Bradley, Gail Nadine III.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 12/02/2021 09:00:00 AM.

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents (Rating on Auto Policy, Due to Irregular Rating) filed by Bradley, Gail Nadine III.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 12/07/2021 09:00:00 AM.

Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations

Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by Bradley, Gail Nadine III.

Application and Order Correcting Court Record

Application and Order Correcting Court Record filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

Order on Court Fee Waiver

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Granted) filed by Bradley, Gail Nadine III.

Order on Court Fee Waiver

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Additional - Granted in Part) filed by Bradley, Gail Nadine III.

Complaint

Complaint filed by Bradley, Gail Nadine III. Refers to: The Hartford Insurance Co; Castillo, Gustavo; Harry, Danielle; Mancini, Willis

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Bradley, Gail Nadine III. Refers to: The Hartford Insurance Co; Castillo, Gustavo; Harry, Danielle; Mancini, Willis

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 5]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 5]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-64; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-64; Event Type: Demurrer / Motion to Strike

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-64; Event Type: Demurrer / Motion to Strike

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOpposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by Bradley, Gail Nadine III. Filed By: Bradley, Gail Nadine III (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 12/07/2021 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents (Rating on Auto Policy, Due to Irregular Rating) filed by Bradley, Gail Nadine III. Filed By: Bradley, Gail Nadine III (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketEx Parte scheduled for 12/07/2021 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-64 John S. Meyer.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 12/02/2021 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents (Rating on Auto Policy, Due to Irregular Rating) filed by Bradley, Gail Nadine III. Filed By: Bradley, Gail Nadine III (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketEx Parte scheduled for 12/02/2021 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-64 John S. Meyer.

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/06/2022 at 09:45:00 AM at Central in C-64 John S. Meyer.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons submitted by Bradley, Gail Nadine III rejected on 10/22/2021. Filed By: Bradley, Gail Nadine III (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Granted) filed by Bradley, Gail Nadine III. Filed By: Bradley, Gail Nadine III (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Additional - Granted in Part) filed by Bradley, Gail Nadine III. Filed By: Bradley, Gail Nadine III (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Bradley, Gail Nadine III. Refers to: Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company; Castillo, Gustavo; Harry, Danielle; Mancini, Willis Filed By: Bradley, Gail Nadine III (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Bradley, Gail Nadine III. Refers to: Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company; Castillo, Gustavo; Harry, Danielle; Mancini, Willis Filed By: Bradley, Gail Nadine III (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Meyer, John.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees filed by Bradley, Gail Nadine III. Filed By: Bradley, Gail Nadine III (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketRequest to Waive Additional Court Fees filed by Bradley, Gail Nadine III. Filed By: Bradley, Gail Nadine III (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST is a litigant