This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/15/2019 at 12:37:56 (UTC).

Braden vs Pacific Union Financial LLC

Case Summary

On 11/08/2018 Braden filed an Other lawsuit against Pacific Union Financial LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RONALD L. STYN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

RONALD L. STYN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRADEN, CASEY

Defendant

PACIFIC UNION FINANCIAL LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HOLMES, LAUREL N

41707 W Winchester Road 201

Temecula, CA 92590

SEMNAR, BABAK BOB

41707 W Winchester Road 201

Temecula, CA 92590

HARTMAN, JARED MICHAEL

41707 W Winchester Road 201

Temecula, CA 92590

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Braden, Casey.

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Braden, Casey.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Braden, Casey.

Complaint

[A document for ROA# 1]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 4]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 4]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

[Another document for ROA# 5]

Complaint

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2019
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/19/2019 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-74 Ronald L. Styn was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Braden, Casey .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Pacific Union Financial LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Braden, Casey. Filed By: Braden, Casey (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Braden, Casey. Filed By: Braden, Casey (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Braden, Casey. Filed By: Braden, Casey (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • E-filing transaction partially accepted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • [Another document for ROA# 5]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/19/2019 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-74 Ronald L. Styn.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Styn, Ronald.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by Braden, Casey. Refers to: Pacific Union Financial LLC Filed By: Braden, Casey (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PACIFIC UNION FINANCIAL LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOLMES, LAUREL N.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SEMNAR, BABAK BOB

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hartman, Jared M