This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/24/2020 at 09:22:27 (UTC).

Bouzan vs Phone Ware Inc

Case Summary

On 05/26/2020 Bouzan filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against Phone Ware Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Katherine Bacal. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Katherine Bacal

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bouzan, Lynette

Defendant

Phone Ware Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Smaili, Jihad M

Defendant Attorney

Cato, Christopher B.

 

Court Documents

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Bouzan, Lynette. Refers to: Phone Ware Inc

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Bouzan, Lynette. Refers to: Phone Ware Inc

Complaint

Complaint filed by Bouzan, Lynette. Refers to: Phone Ware Inc

Proof of Service

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Bouzan, Lynette. Refers to: Phone Ware Inc

Answer

Answer filed by Phone Ware Inc.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2020
  • HearingLocation: C-69; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Phone Ware Inc. Filed By: Phone Ware Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Bouzan, Lynette. Refers to: Phone Ware Inc Filed By: Bouzan, Lynette (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/06/2020 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-69 Katherine Bacal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Bouzan, Lynette. Refers to: Phone Ware Inc Filed By: Bouzan, Lynette (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Bouzan, Lynette. Refers to: Phone Ware Inc Filed By: Bouzan, Lynette (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Bouzan, Lynette. Refers to: Phone Ware Inc Filed By: Bouzan, Lynette (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Bacal, Katherine.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Phone Ware Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CATO CHRISTOPHER B.