This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 10/19/2019 at 01:15:57 (UTC).

Bostick vs Grossmont Union High School District

Case Summary

On 06/06/2019 Bostick filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against Grossmont Union High School District. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kenneth J Medel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kenneth J Medel

 

Party Details

Petitioners

California School Employees Association and its Grossmont High Chapter 443; AKA : CSEA

Bostick, Maribeth

Respondents

Grossmont Union High School District

Board of Trustees of Grossmont Union High School District

Glover, Superintendent Timothy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Kahn, Andrew J

Leenson, Alex S

Respondent Attorneys

Estrada, Amy W

Bresee, Mark R

 

Court Documents

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Summons

Original Summons filed by Bostick, Maribeth; California School Employees Association and its Grossmont High Chapter 443. Refers to: Grossmont Union High School District; Board of Trustees of Grossmont Union High School District; Glover, Superintendent Timothy

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Bostick, Maribeth; California School Employees Association and its Grossmont High Chapter 443. Refers to: Grossmont Union High School District; Board of Trustees of Grossmont Union High School District; Glover, Superintendent Timothy

Verified Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Other Appropriate Relief

Petition for Writ of Mandate filed by Bostick, Maribeth; California School Employees Association and its Grossmont High Chapter 443. Refers to: Grossmont Union High School District; Board of Trustees of Grossmont Union High School District; Glover, Superintendent Timothy

Proof of Service of Summons-Superintendent Timothy Glover

Proof of Service filed by California School Employees Association and its Grossmont High Chapter 443; California School Employees Association and its Grossmont High Chapter 443; Bostick, Maribeth; Bostick, Maribeth.

Proof of Service of Summons-Board of Trustees Grossmont Union High School District

Proof of Service filed by California School Employees Association and its Grossmont High Chapter 443; California School Employees Association and its Grossmont High Chapter 443; Bostick, Maribeth; Bostick, Maribeth.

Proof of Service of Summons-Grossmont Union High School District

Proof of Service filed by California School Employees Association and its Grossmont High Chapter 443; Bostick, Maribeth.

Answer

Answer filed by Board of Trustees of Grossmont Union High School District; Grossmont Union High School District; Glover, Superintendent Timothy.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Board of Trustees of Grossmont Union High School District; Grossmont Union High School District; Glover, Superintendent Timothy. Filed By: Board of Trustees of Grossmont Union High School District (Respondent); Grossmont Union High School District (Respondent); Glover, Superintendent Timothy (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by California School Employees Association and its Grossmont High Chapter 443; California School Employees Association and its Grossmont High Chapter 443; Bostick, Maribeth; Bostick, Maribeth. Filed By: California School Employees Association and its Grossmont High Chapter 443 (Petitioner); California School Employees Association and its Grossmont High Chapter 443 (Petitioner); Bostick, Maribeth (Petitioner); Bostick, Maribeth (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by California School Employees Association and its Grossmont High Chapter 443; California School Employees Association and its Grossmont High Chapter 443; Bostick, Maribeth; Bostick, Maribeth. Filed By: California School Employees Association and its Grossmont High Chapter 443 (Petitioner); California School Employees Association and its Grossmont High Chapter 443 (Petitioner); Bostick, Maribeth (Petitioner); Bostick, Maribeth (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by California School Employees Association and its Grossmont High Chapter 443; Bostick, Maribeth. Filed By: California School Employees Association and its Grossmont High Chapter 443 (Petitioner); Bostick, Maribeth (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Medel, Kenneth.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Bostick, Maribeth; California School Employees Association and its Grossmont High Chapter 443. Refers to: Grossmont Union High School District; Board of Trustees of Grossmont Union High School District; Glover, Superintendent Timothy Filed By: Bostick, Maribeth (Petitioner); California School Employees Association and its Grossmont High Chapter 443 (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Bostick, Maribeth; California School Employees Association and its Grossmont High Chapter 443. Refers to: Grossmont Union High School District; Board of Trustees of Grossmont Union High School District; Glover, Superintendent Timothy Filed By: Bostick, Maribeth (Petitioner); California School Employees Association and its Grossmont High Chapter 443 (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Bostick, Maribeth; California School Employees Association and its Grossmont High Chapter 443. Refers to: Grossmont Union High School District; Board of Trustees of Grossmont Union High School District; Glover, Superintendent Timothy Filed By: Bostick, Maribeth (Petitioner); California School Employees Association and its Grossmont High Chapter 443 (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Writ of Mandate filed by Bostick, Maribeth; California School Employees Association and its Grossmont High Chapter 443. Refers to: Grossmont Union High School District; Board of Trustees of Grossmont Union High School District; Glover, Superintendent Timothy Filed By: Bostick, Maribeth (Petitioner); California School Employees Association and its Grossmont High Chapter 443 (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less