This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/19/2021 at 07:34:30 (UTC).

Borrego Water District vs All Persons Who Claim a Right to Extract Groundwater in the Borrego Valley Groundwater Subbasin No. 7.024-01 Whether Based on Appropriation Overlying Right or Other Basis of Right and/or Who Claim a Right to Use

Case Summary

On 01/30/2020 Borrego Water District filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against All Persons Who Claim a Right to Extract Groundwater in the Borrego Valley Groundwater Subbasin No 7 024-01 Whether Based on Appropriation Overlying Right or Other Basis of Right and/or Who Claim a Right to Use. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory W Pollack. The case status is Other - Transferred.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Gregory W Pollack

 

Party Details

Defendants

Kent R Smith trustee of the Smith Kent R Revocable Living Trust

Monica Real Estate Holdings LP

Gabriel Wisdom trustee of the Wisdom Gabriel B&Weis-Wisdom Diana Family 2008 Trust

Maiter, Michael

David and Juli Bauer co-trustees of the D&J Bauer Family Trust

Sanchez, Maria E

DE ANZA DESERT COUNTRY CLUB

RTA Borrego LLC

Lance Lundberg trustee of the Lundberg Family Trust

Bailey, Darlis A

CWC Casa del Zorro LLC

JM Roadrunner LLC

Munson, Patricia

Savittieri, John

Seley Ranches LP

Sanchez, Jose G

Brian Siefker trustee of the Brian Siefker Trust

Doljanin, John

Munson, Doug

ASCHE, TRACY

36 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Foley, Sarah Christopher

Attorney at BEST BEST & KRIEGER LLP

655 W Broadway 15Th Flr

San Diego, CA 92101

Anderson, Steven Michael

Attorney at BEST BEST & KRIEGER LLP

655 W Broadway 15Th Flr

San Diego, CA 92101

Gilpin, James

Attorney at BEST BEST & KREIGER LLP

655 W Broadway 15Th Floor

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

Transmittal and Receipt of Transferred Case

Transmittal and Receipt of Transferred Case filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

Notice - Other

Notice - Other (AND PROOF OF SERVICE OF JUNE 9, 2020 MINUTE ORDER) filed by Borrego Water District.

Order - Other

Order - Other (order for reassingment of case to Orange County Superior Court Judge Melissa R. McCormick) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD

[Another document for ROA# 14]

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 02/10/2020 08:15:00 AM.

Notice of Lodgment

Notice of Lodgment (pursuant to section 836 of the code of civil procedure) filed by BORREGO WATER DISTRICT.

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents filed by Borrego Water District.

Complaint

Complaint filed by Borrego Water District. Refers to: All Persons Who Claim a Right to Extract Groundwater in the Borrego Valley Groundwater Subbasin No. 7.024-01 Whether Based on Appropriation Overlying Right or Other Basis of Right and/or Who Claim a Right to Use; AGRI Empire; Rick and Joan Anson co-trustees of the Anson Family Trust 08-18-08; Anza Borrego Desert State Park; ASCHE, ALAN; ASCHE, TRACY; Bailey, Gary; Bailey, Darlis; David and Juli Bauer co-trustees of the D&J Bauer Family Trust 11-18-04; Bauer, William; Borrego Air Ranch Mutual Water & Improvement Co; Borrego Nazareth LLC; Borrego Unified School District; Roland J Jensen trustee of the Jensen Family Trust 8-5-83; Raymond A Carpenter and Susan R Carpenter co-trustees of the Carpenter Family Trust 12-11-07; James Sommerville trustee of the Sommerville Trust 11-22-83; Roy Brisbois trustee of the Conzelman Family Trust A 11-22-83; Steven Mohler trustee of the Conzelman Family Trust C 11-22-83; Scott M Crumrine and Stacey L Crumrine co-trustees of the Crumrine Family Trust 04-19-06; CWC Casa del Zorro LLC; DE ANZA DESERT COUNTRY CLUB; Doljanin, John; Genus LP; Hogan, John; Hogan, Silvia; JM Roadrunner LLC; Kitchen, Edward; Lance Lundberg trustee of the Lundberg Family Trust 10-01-98; Maiter, Michael; Savittieri, John; Navarro, Manuel; Navarro, Araceli; Monica Real Estate Holdings LP; Munson, Doug; Munson, Patricia; PECOFF, RONALD; The Roadrunner Club at Borrego LP; RTA Borrego LLC; Sanchez, Jose; Sanchez, Maria; Seley Ranches LP; Shenandoah Growers Inc; Siefker, Max; Brian Siefker trustee of the Brian Siefker Trust 12-18-01; Kent R Smith trustee of the Smith Kent R Revocable Living Trust 01-04-90; The Springs RV and Golf Resort LP; T2 Borrego LLC; T2 Farms LLC; T2 Holdings LLC; Trojan Citrus LLC; Vanasdlen, Joel; Ward, Michael; Weerasekera, Gamini; Gabriel Wisdom trustee of the Wisdom Gabriel B&Weis-Wisdom Diana Family 2008 Trust 08-01-08; William D Wright and Edna J Wright co-trustees of the Wright Family Living Trust 06-19-89

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by BORREGO WATER DISTRICT.

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by BORREGO WATER DISTRICT.

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

[Another document for ROA# 8]

Complaint

[Another document for ROA# 8]

Civil Case Cover Sheet

[Another document for ROA# 8]

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice - Other (AND PROOF OF SERVICE OF JUNE 9, 2020 MINUTE ORDER) filed by Borrego Water District. Filed By: Borrego Water District (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTransmittal and Receipt of Transferred Case filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/10/2020 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-71 Gregory W Pollack was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketReciprocal Case Transferred to Orange County Superior Court, to be heard by Judge Melissa R McCormick as to Order for Reassignment of Case, signed by Judge Alksne on 03/09/2020.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder - Other (order for reassingment of case to Orange County Superior Court Judge Melissa R. McCormick) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 14]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 02/10/2020 08:15:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/10/2020 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-71 Gregory W Pollack.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 8]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 8]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 8]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-filing transaction partially accepted.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Borrego Water District. Refers to: All Persons Who Claim a Right to Extract Groundwater in the Borrego Valley Groundwater Subbasin No. 7.024-01 Whether Based on Appropriation Overlying Right or Other Basis of Right and/or Who Claim a Right to Use; AGRI Empire; Rick and Joan Anson co-trustees of the Anson Family Trust 08-18-08; Anza Borrego Desert State Park; ASCHE, ALAN; ASCHE, TRACY; Bailey, Gary; Bailey, Darlis; David and Juli Bauer co-trustees of the D&J Bauer Family Trust 11-18-04; Bauer, William; Borrego Air Ranch Mutual Water & Improvement Co; Borrego Nazareth LLC; Borrego Unified School District; Roland J Jensen trustee of the Jensen Family Trust 8-5-83; Raymond A Carpenter and Susan R Carpenter co-trustees of the Carpenter Family Trust 12-11-07; James Sommerville trustee of the Sommerville Trust 11-22-83; Roy Brisbois trustee of the Conzelman Family Trust A 11-22-83; Steven Mohler trustee of the Conzelman Family Trust C 11-22-83; Scott M Crumrine and Stacey L Crumrine co-trustees of the Crumrine Family Trust 04-19-06; CWC Casa del Zorro LLC; DE ANZA DESERT COUNTRY CLUB; Doljanin, John; Genus LP; Hogan, John; Hogan, Silvia; JM Roadrunner LLC; Kitchen, Edward; Lance Lundberg trustee of the Lundberg Family Trust 10-01-98; Maiter, Michael; Savittieri, John; Navarro, Manuel; Navarro, Araceli; Monica Real Estate Holdings LP; Munson, Doug; Munson, Patricia; PECOFF, RONALD; The Roadrunner Club at Borrego LP; RTA Borrego LLC; Sanchez, Jose; Sanchez, Maria; Seley Ranches LP; Shenandoah Growers Inc; Siefker, Max; Brian Siefker trustee of the Brian Siefker Trust 12-18-01; Kent R Smith trustee of the Smith Kent R Revocable Living Trust 01-04-90; The Springs RV and Golf Resort LP; T2 Borrego LLC; T2 Farms LLC; T2 Holdings LLC; Trojan Citrus LLC; Vanasdlen, Joel; Ward, Michael; Weerasekera, Gamini; Gabriel Wisdom trustee of the Wisdom Gabriel B&Weis-Wisdom Diana Family 2008 Trust 08-01-08; William D Wright and Edna J Wright co-trustees of the Wright Family Living Trust 06-19-89 Filed By: Borrego Water District (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by BORREGO WATER DISTRICT. Filed By: BORREGO WATER DISTRICT (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by BORREGO WATER DISTRICT. Filed By: BORREGO WATER DISTRICT (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Pollack, Gregory.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less