This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 12/24/2018 at 19:59:58 (UTC).

BORDER BUSINESS PARK INC vs WASSERMAN COMDEN & CASSELMAN LLP

Case Summary

On 01/13/2016 BORDER BUSINESS PARK INC filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against WASSERMAN COMDEN CASSELMAN LLP. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD E. L. STRAUSS. The case status is Other - Stayed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2016

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

RICHARD E. L. STRAUSS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Appellants

OTAY TRUCK PARKING LP

AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL ENTERPRISES INC

NATIONAL ENTERPRISES INC

OTAY ACQUISITIONS LP

OMC PROPERTIES LLC

BORDER BUSINESS PARK INC

UNIT 5 LP

OTAY MESA PROPERTY LP

SAN DIEGO INVESTMENTS 1 LLC

UNIT 7 LP

RKR DLFY LP

OTAY CONCRETE PARKING LLC

RANCHO VISTA DEL MAR

Defendants and Respondents

CASSELMAN LAW GROUP APC

THORSNES BARTOLOTTA & MCGUIRE

WASSERMAN COMDEN & CASSELMAN LLP

16 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorney

JACOBS, BRADLEY L

501 W Broadway

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

BARTOLOTTA, VINCENT J JR

Attorney at THORSNES BARTOLOTTA MCGUIRE

2550 Fifth Ave 11Th Fl

San Diego, CA 92103

CASSELMAN, DAVID B

SHEDLOSKY, JOY L

At&T Building, 101 W Broadway #1700

San Diego, CA 92101

HOMZE, JOY L

GREBING, CHARLES R.

600 W Broadway Suite 1200

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

Opposition to Ex Parte Application

Opposition - Other (Opposition to Ex Parte Application) filed by American International enterprises inc; BORDER BUSINESS PARK INC; National Enterprises Inc; OMC Properties LLC; OTAY ACQUISITIONS LP; OTAY CONCRETE PARKING LLC; Otay Mesa Property LP; Otay Truck Parking LP; Rancho Vista Del Mar; RKR DLFY LP;OTHERS.

Defendants' Sur-Reply re Plaintiffs' Second Notice and Demand for Disqualification of Justice Howard B. Wiener

Reply filed by CASSELMAN LAW GROUP APC.

Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Lauren Ramseyer #14004) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

Amended Notice of Entry of Order

Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by CASSELMAN LAW GROUP APC.

Response to Ex Parte Application for Reassignment of Neutral Arbitrator

Objections filed by CASSELMAN LAW GROUP APC; CASSELMAN LAW GROUP APC; Wasserman Comden & Casselman LLP.

Notice of Entry of Order

Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by American International enterprises inc; BORDER BUSINESS PARK INC; National Enterprises Inc; OMC Properties LLC; OTAY ACQUISITIONS LP; OTAY CONCRETE PARKING LLC; Otay Mesa Property LP; Otay Truck Parking LP; Rancho Vista Del Mar; RKR DLFY LP;OTHERS.

Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application for Reassignment of Arb.

Declaration - Other (Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application for Reassignment of Arb.) filed by American International enterprises inc; BORDER BUSINESS PARK INC; National Enterprises Inc; OMC Properties LLC; OTAY ACQUISITIONS LP; OTAY CONCRETE PARKING LLC; Otay Mesa Property LP; Otay Truck Parking LP; Rancho Vista Del Mar; RKR DLFY LP;OTHERS.

Abandonment of Appeal

Abandonment of Appeal filed by American International enterprises inc; BORDER BUSINESS PARK INC; National Enterprises Inc; OMC Properties LLC; OTAY ACQUISITIONS LP; OTAY CONCRETE PARKING LLC; Otay Mesa Property LP; Otay Truck Parking LP; Rancho Vista Del Mar; RKR DLFY LP;OTHERS. Refers to: CASSELMAN LAW GROUP APC; Casselman Law Group APC; Thorsnes Bartolotta; Thorsnes Bartolotta; THORSNES BARTOLOTTA & MCGUIRE; Wasserman Comden & Casselman LLP; Wasserman, Comden & Casselman

Notice of Filing SD

[Another document for ROA# 129]

Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Lauren Ramseyer #14004) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney filed by CASSELMAN LAW GROUP APC.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by National Enterprises Inc.

Order

Order (Court of Appeal order) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other (Vincent Bartolotta (supplemental)) filed by THORSNES BARTOLOTTA & MCGUIRE.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service (Proof Of Service) filed by THORSNES BARTOLOTTA & MCGUIRE.

Order

Order (Court of Appeal order) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by American International enterprises inc; BORDER BUSINESS PARK INC; National Enterprises Inc; OMC Properties LLC; OTAY ACQUISITIONS LP; OTAY CONCRETE PARKING LLC; Otay Mesa Property LP; Otay Truck Parking LP; Rancho Vista Del Mar; RKR DLFY LP;OTHERS.

Peremptory Challenge

Peremptory Challenge filed by CASSELMAN LAW GROUP APC; THORSNES BARTOLOTTA & MCGUIRE; Wasserman Comden & Casselman LLP.

96 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2017
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to UNIT 7 LP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to UNIT 5 LP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to SAN DIEGO INVESTMENTS 1 LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Rancho Vista Del Mar.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to RKR DLFY LP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Otay Truck Parking LP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Otay Mesa Property LP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to OTAY CONCRETE PARKING LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to OTAY ACQUISITIONS LP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to OMC Properties LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
127 More Docket Entries
  • 01/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Response (Response to Objection to Notice of Related Case) filed by CASSELMAN LAW GROUP APC; THORSNES BARTOLOTTA & MCGUIRE; Wasserman Comden & Casselman LLP. Filed By: CASSELMAN LAW GROUP APC (Defendant); THORSNES BARTOLOTTA & MCGUIRE (Defendant); Wasserman Comden & Casselman LLP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service filed by American International enterprises inc; BORDER BUSINESS PARK INC; National Enterprises Inc; OMC Properties LLC; OTAY ACQUISITIONS LP; OTAY CONCRETE PARKING LLC; Otay Mesa Property LP; Otay Truck Parking LP; Rancho Vista Del Mar; RKR DLFY LP;OTHERS. Filed By: American International enterprises inc (Plaintiff); BORDER BUSINESS PARK INC (Plaintiff); National Enterprises Inc (Plaintiff); OMC Properties LLC (Plaintiff); OTAY ACQUISITIONS LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Objections filed by American International enterprises inc; BORDER BUSINESS PARK INC; National Enterprises Inc; OMC Properties LLC; OTAY ACQUISITIONS LP; OTAY CONCRETE PARKING LLC; Otay Mesa Property LP; Otay Truck Parking LP; Rancho Vista Del Mar; RKR DLFY LP;OTHERS. Filed By: American International enterprises inc (Plaintiff); BORDER BUSINESS PARK INC (Plaintiff); National Enterprises Inc (Plaintiff); OMC Properties LLC (Plaintiff); OTAY ACQUISITIONS LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/01/2016 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-70 Randa Trapp.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Trapp, Randa.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by BORDER BUSINESS PARK INC; National Enterprises Inc; OMC Properties LLC; OTAY ACQUISITIONS LP; OTAY CONCRETE PARKING LLC; Otay Mesa Property LP; Otay Truck Parking LP; UNIT 5 LP; UNIT 7 LP; RKR DLFY LP;OTHERS. Refers to: Wasserman Comden & Casselman LLP; CASSELMAN LAW GROUP APC; THORSNES BARTOLOTTA & MCGUIRE Filed By: BORDER BUSINESS PARK INC (Plaintiff); National Enterprises Inc (Plaintiff); OMC Properties LLC (Plaintiff); OTAY ACQUISITIONS LP (Plaintiff); OTAY CONCRETE PARKING LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by BORDER BUSINESS PARK INC; National Enterprises Inc; OMC Properties LLC; OTAY ACQUISITIONS LP; OTAY CONCRETE PARKING LLC; Otay Mesa Property LP; Otay Truck Parking LP; UNIT 5 LP; UNIT 7 LP; RKR DLFY LP;OTHERS. Refers to: Wasserman Comden & Casselman LLP; CASSELMAN LAW GROUP APC; THORSNES BARTOLOTTA & MCGUIRE Filed By: BORDER BUSINESS PARK INC (Plaintiff); National Enterprises Inc (Plaintiff); OMC Properties LLC (Plaintiff); OTAY ACQUISITIONS LP (Plaintiff); OTAY CONCRETE PARKING LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by BORDER BUSINESS PARK INC; National Enterprises Inc; OMC Properties LLC; OTAY ACQUISITIONS LP; OTAY CONCRETE PARKING LLC; Otay Mesa Property LP; Otay Truck Parking LP; UNIT 5 LP; UNIT 7 LP; RKR DLFY LP;OTHERS. Refers to: Wasserman Comden & Casselman LLP; CASSELMAN LAW GROUP APC; THORSNES BARTOLOTTA & MCGUIRE Filed By: BORDER BUSINESS PARK INC (Plaintiff); National Enterprises Inc (Plaintiff); OMC Properties LLC (Plaintiff); OTAY ACQUISITIONS LP (Plaintiff); OTAY CONCRETE PARKING LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.