This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/26/2022 at 08:04:13 (UTC).

Bond vs Stanford Hotels Corporation

Case Summary

On 02/25/2022 Bond filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against Stanford Hotels Corporation. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kenneth J Medel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kenneth J Medel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bond, Aimee

Defendants

San Diego Hotel Company LLC

Stanford Hotels Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Park, Sang

Attorney at PARK APC

Sag-Aftra, 5670 Wilshire Blvd #1800

Los Angeles, CA 90036

Defendant Attorney

Kaufman, Thomas R

Attorney at SHEPPARD MULLIN RICHTER & HAMPTON LLP

1901 Avenue Of The Stars Suite 1600

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Original Summons (Warrants/Issuance Returns)

Original Summons filed by Bond, Aimee. Refers to: Stanford Hotels Corporation; San Diego Hotel Company LLC

Civil Case Cover Sheet (Cover Sheets)

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Bond, Aimee. Refers to: Stanford Hotels Corporation; San Diego Hotel Company LLC

Complaint (Case Initiation)

Complaint filed by Bond, Aimee. Refers to: Stanford Hotels Corporation; San Diego Hotel Company LLC

Proof of Personal Service - Petition (Proof of Service - Case Initiating Document)

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Bond, Aimee. Refers to: San Diego Hotel Company LLC

Proof of Personal Service - Petition (Proof of Service - Case Initiating Document)

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Bond, Aimee. Refers to: Stanford Hotels Corporation

Motion - Other (Motions)

Motion to Compel Discovery filed by Stanford Hotels Corporation; San Diego Hotel Company LLC.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-66; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-66; Event Type: Discovery Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Compel Discovery filed by Stanford Hotels Corporation; San Diego Hotel Company LLC.; Filed By: Stanford Hotels Corporation (Defendant); San Diego Hotel Company LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketDiscovery Hearing scheduled for 08/26/2022 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-66 Kenneth J Medel.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Bond, Aimee. Refers to: Stanford Hotels Corporation; Filed By: Bond, Aimee (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Bond, Aimee. Refers to: San Diego Hotel Company LLC; Filed By: Bond, Aimee (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/14/2022 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-66 Kenneth J Medel.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Medel, Kenneth.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Bond, Aimee. Refers to: Stanford Hotels Corporation; San Diego Hotel Company LLC; Filed By: Bond, Aimee (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Bond, Aimee. Refers to: Stanford Hotels Corporation; San Diego Hotel Company LLC; Filed By: Bond, Aimee (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Bond, Aimee. Refers to: Stanford Hotels Corporation; San Diego Hotel Company LLC; Filed By: Bond, Aimee (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STANFORD HOTELS CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KAUFMAN THOMAS ROY