This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/24/2018 at 15:37:21 (UTC).

Bon-Vivant Homeowners Association vs. Stephanie Kaye Baker Jones

Case Summary

On 07/17/2017 Bon-Vivant Homeowners Association filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Stephanie Kaye Baker Jones. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BON-VIVANT HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

272 Church Avenue 4

Chula Vista, CA 91910

Defendant

BAKER JONES, STEPHANIE KAYE

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Bon-Vivant Homeowners Association. Refers to: Baker Jones, Stephanie

Proof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Personal

Proof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Personal filed by Bon-Vivant Homeowners Association. Refers to: Baker Jones, Stephanie

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Bon-Vivant Homeowners Association. Refers to: Baker Jones, Stephanie

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2017
  • Small Claims Court Trial scheduled for 11/06/2017 at 08:00:00 AM at Central in C-22 was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court dismissed without prejudice as to Bon-Vivant Homeowners Association.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court dismissed without prejudice as to Baker Jones, Stephanie Kaye .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Bon-Vivant Homeowners Association. Refers to: Baker Jones, Stephanie Filed By: Bon-Vivant Homeowners Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Personal filed by Bon-Vivant Homeowners Association. Refers to: Baker Jones, Stephanie Filed By: Bon-Vivant Homeowners Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • Small Claims Court Trial scheduled for 11/06/2017 at 08:00:00 AM at Central in C-22 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • Case assigned to Department C-22.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Bon-Vivant Homeowners Association. Refers to: Baker Jones, Stephanie Filed By: Bon-Vivant Homeowners Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BON VIVANT HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION is a litigant