This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/22/2018 at 18:59:41 (UTC).

Bon-Vivant Homeowners Association vs. Floraine Mae Espiritu

Case Summary

On 01/28/2015 Bon-Vivant Homeowners Association filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Floraine Mae Espiritu. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bon-Vivant Homeowners Association

Church Avenue

Chula Vista, CA 91910

Defendant

Espiritu, Floraine Mae

 

Court Documents

SC100 Plaintiff Claim and Order to Defendant SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2015
  • Small Claims Court Trial scheduled for 05/20/2015 at 09:15:00 AM at Central in C-22 was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2015
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court dismissed without prejudice as to Bon-Vivant Homeowners Association.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2015
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court dismissed without prejudice as to Espiritu, Floraine Mae .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2015
  • Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Bon-Vivant Homeowners Association. Refers to: Espiritu, Floraine Filed By: Bon-Vivant Homeowners Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2015
  • Proof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Substitute filed by Bon-Vivant Homeowners Association. Refers to: Espiritu, Floraine Filed By: Bon-Vivant Homeowners Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2015
  • Small Claims Court Trial scheduled for 05/20/2015 at 09:15:00 AM at Central in C-22 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2015
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Bon-Vivant Homeowners Association. Refers to: Espiritu, Floraine Filed By: Bon-Vivant Homeowners Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BON VIVANT HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION is a litigant