This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 02/15/2020 at 04:56:34 (UTC).

Boesgaard vs. Trendy Department Store

Case Summary

On 01/15/2016 Boesgaard filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Trendy Department Store. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JACQUELINE M. STERN, JOAN M. LEWIS and Ronald F. Frazier. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judges

JACQUELINE M. STERN

JOAN M. LEWIS

Ronald F. Frazier

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BOESGAARD, JOHN

BOESGAARD, MAUREEN

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

TAE HONG AND JONG AE KIM REVOCABLE LIVING TRUST; DBA : TRENDY DEPARTMENT STORE

TRENDY DEPARTMENT STORE

KIM, JONG AE

KIM, TAE HONG

BROOKS FAMILY TRUST

RG INVESTMENT REAL ESTATE SERVICES, INC.

KIM TAE HONG AND JOENG AE REVOCABLE LIVING TRUST

GOLDMAN, DEAN

VON'S VISTA CENTER; AKA : VISTA CAM

AUTOZONE PARTS INC

2010 1 CRE CA - RETAIL, LLC

SCHWARTZ, LAWRENCE D

ALBERTSONS LLC

WELLS FARGO BANK NA

THE VONS COMPANIES INC

MAGRET BOBERTZ AS TRUSTEE OF THE CHARLES R BOBERTZ & MARGRET BOBERTZ TRUST

ALPHA SKY INVESTMENT LLC

TAVLARIDIS FAMILY TRUST

10 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PRAGER, RICHARD D

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF CHARLES S ROSEMAN & ASSOCIATE

1761 Hotel Circle South 250

San Diego, CA 92108

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

GARCHIE, PETER L

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

701 B Street 1900

San Diego, CA 92101

Sinatra, Suzana I

BROWNING, WILLIAM K

Attorney at BROWNING HOCKER

501 W Broadway 540

San Diego, CA 92101

SHAPIRO, DAVID B

633 W 5Th St #4000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

MASON, SUSAN L

Attorney at DEVANEY PATE MORRIS & CAMERON LLP

1495 Pacific Highway 375

San Diego, CA 92101

BUDICA, STEPHEN E

Attorney at BASSETT DISCOE MCMAINS & KARGOZAR

1551 N Tustin Avenue 900

Santa Ana, CA 92705

GLOS, CHRISTOPHER

Attorney at KUTAK ROCK LLP

5 Park Plaza 1500

Irvine, CA 92614

ROWELL, STEPHEN Q

11555 Dublin Canyon Rd

Pleasanton, CA 94588

DEPASQUALE, NANCY J

Attorney at MURCHISON & CUMMING LLP

18201 Von Karman Avenue 1100

Irvine, CA 92612

Vranjes, Mark

Other Attorneys

Vahidi, Steven S

HANNAH, RANDAL P

Tisi, Steven A

 

Court Documents

Notice of Lodgment

Notice of Lodgment (of federal and out of state authorities in support of motion for summary judgment) filed by Margaret Bobertz as Trustee of the Charles R Bobert & Margaret Bobertz Trust.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

[Another document for ROA# 443]

THE VONS COMPANIES, INCS SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DISCOVERY IN DISPUTE IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF, JOHN BOESGAARD, TO SIT FOR DEPOSITION AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

Statement - Other (OF DISCOVERY IN DISPUTE IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO COMPEL) filed by The Vons Companies Inc.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by The Vons Companies Inc.

DEFENDANTS THE VONS COMPANIES, INC AND ALBERTSONS, LLCS REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

Reply to Opposition - Other filed by Albertsons LLC; The Vons Companies Inc.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Boesgaard, John; Boesgaard, Maureen.

Notice to Filing Party SD

Amendment to Complaint submitted by Boesgaard, John rejected on 08/20/2018.

Proposed Order

Proposed Order (on motion for determination of good faith settlement) submitted by Schwartz, Lawrence D received but not filed on 08/05/2019.

Reply

Reply (Plaintiff's reply to defendant's offered joint stipulation pursuant to CCP437 c(t)) filed by Boesgaard, John; Boesgaard, Maureen.

Amendment to Complaint/Cross-Complaint naming Doe

Amendment to Complaint/Cross-Complaint naming Doe (DOE 28) filed by Boesgaard, John. Refers to: Hopkins, Timothy

Notice of Lodgment

Notice of Lodgment (in support of motion for summary judgment) filed by Margaret Bobertz as Trustee of the Charles R Bobert & Margaret Bobertz Trust.

Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations

Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations (Determination of Good Faith Settlement) filed by Margaret Bobertz as Trustee of the Charles R Bobert & Margaret Bobertz Trust.

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

Order - Other

Order for Determination of Good Faith Settlement submitted by RG Investment Real Estate Services Inc received but not filed on 08/29/2019.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 07/02/2019 08:30:00 AM.

Answer

Answer filed by RG Investment Real Estate Services, Inc..

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

Answer

Answer filed by Sanghavi, Arun; Sanghavi, Nayana.

351 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2020
  • Motion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 05/29/2020 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-65 Ronald F. Frazier.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication filed by Tavlaridis Family Trust. Filed By: Tavlaridis Family Trust (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Lodgment (in support of motion for summary judgment) filed by Tavlaridis Family Trust. Filed By: Tavlaridis Family Trust (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Lodgment (of federal and out of state authorities in support of motion for summary judgment) filed by Tavlaridis Family Trust. Filed By: Tavlaridis Family Trust (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication filed by Margaret Bobertz as Trustee of the Charles R Bobert & Margaret Bobertz Trust. Filed By: Margaret Bobertz as Trustee of the Charles R Bobert & Margaret Bobertz Trust (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Lodgment (in support of motion for summary judgment) filed by Margaret Bobertz as Trustee of the Charles R Bobert & Margaret Bobertz Trust. Filed By: Margaret Bobertz as Trustee of the Charles R Bobert & Margaret Bobertz Trust (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Lodgment (of federal and out of state authorities in support of motion for summary judgment) filed by Margaret Bobertz as Trustee of the Charles R Bobert & Margaret Bobertz Trust. Filed By: Margaret Bobertz as Trustee of the Charles R Bobert & Margaret Bobertz Trust (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication filed by Yardage Town Inc. Filed By: Yardage Town Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Lodgment (in support of motion for summary judgment) filed by Yardage Town Inc. Filed By: Yardage Town Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Lodgment (of federal and out of state authorities in support of motion for summary judgment) filed by Yardage Town Inc. Filed By: Yardage Town Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
467 More Docket Entries
  • 08/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Boesgaard, John; Boesgaard, Maureen. Filed By: Boesgaard, John (Plaintiff); Boesgaard, Maureen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed by Boesgaard, John. Filed By: Boesgaard, John (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended Complaint (1ST) filed by Boesgaard, John; Boesgaard, Maureen. Refers to: Trendy Department Store; Kim, Tae; Tae Hong and Jong AE Kim Revocable Living Trust; Kim, Jong; The Vons Companies Inc; RG Investment Real Estate Services Inc; Kim Tae Hong and Joeng AE Revocable Living Trust; Vons Vista Center; Tavlaridis Family Trust; 2010 1 CRE CA Retail LLC; Brooks Family Trust; Goldman, Dean; Wells Fargo Bank NA; Schwartz, Lawrence; Alpha Sky Investment LLC; Autozone Parts Inc; Margaret Bobertz as Trustee of the Charles R Bobert & Margaret Bobertz Trust; Albertsons LLC; Yardage Town Inc; Kirk Gordon Howard and Diana Lee Howard as Trustees of the Kirk Gordon Howard and Linda Lee Howard 2004 Revocable Trust; Harbor Freight Tools USA Inc; Sanghavi, Arun; Sanghavi, Nayana; Hopkins, Timothy; Hopkins, Graciela Filed By: Boesgaard, John (Plaintiff); Boesgaard, Maureen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by Boesgaard, John; Boesgaard, Maureen. Refers to: Trendy Department Store; Tae Hong and Jong AE Kim Revocable Living Trust; Kim, Tae; Kim, Jong Filed By: Boesgaard, John (Plaintiff); Boesgaard, Maureen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Boesgaard, John; Boesgaard, Maureen. Refers to: Trendy Department Store; Tae Hong and Jong AE Kim Revocable Living Trust; Kim, Tae; Kim, Jong Filed By: Boesgaard, John (Plaintiff); Boesgaard, Maureen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Boesgaard, John; Boesgaard, Maureen. Refers to: Trendy Department Store; Tae Hong and Jong AE Kim Revocable Living Trust; Kim, Tae; Kim, Jong Filed By: Boesgaard, John (Plaintiff); Boesgaard, Maureen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Stern, Jacqueline.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/12/2016 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-27 Jacqueline M. Stern.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.