This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 09/15/2018 at 10:26:33 (UTC).

Boes vs. Sun Vapers Inc

Case Summary

On 05/17/2016 Boes filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Sun Vapers Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD E. L. STRAUSS. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

RICHARD E. L. STRAUSS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BOES, THOMAS

SHERMAN, NYEISHA

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

VADOR VAPOR LLC

SUN VAPERS INC

LG CHEM LTD

MANSOUR, DORED; DBA : WEST COAST HOOKAH AND GLASS;ESA : WEST COAST HOOKAH AND GLASS

GLASS TECH WHOLESALE INC; DBA : GT VAPE

PEN PERFECTION LLC

EVVA COMPANY INC

GLASS TECH WHOLESALE

GLASS TECH WHOLESALES INC; DBA : GT VAPE

GO GREEN TRADING INC

VAPIN AMERICA

LA VAPORZ

Cross Defendants, Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

MANSOUR, DORED; DBA : WEST COAST HOOKAH AND GLASS;ESA : WEST COAST HOOKAH AND GLASS

GLASS TECH WHOLESALES INC; DBA : GT VAPE

GLASS TECH WHOLESALE INC; DBA : GT VAPE

7 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BENTLEY, GREGORY LAWRENCE

Attorney at SHERNOFF BIDART ECHEVERRIA BENTLEY LLP

600 S Indian Hill Blvd

Claremont, CA 91711

ECHEVERRIA, RICARDO

600 S Indian Hill Blvd

Claremont, CA 91711

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

GUY, DOUGLAS D

Attorney at GATES GONTER GUY PROUDFOOT & MUENCH LLP

15373 Innovation Drive 170

San Diego, CA 92128

INGOLD, TREVOR J

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

633 W 5Th St #4000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

CANNON, ANTHONY

Attorney at CANNON & NELMS PC

160 South Old Springs Road 200

Anaheim, CA 92808

MARTHA, RICHARD H

Attorney at HORTON OBERRECHT KIRKPATRICK & MARTHA

225 Broadway 2200

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed by Boes, Thomas; Sherman, Nyeisha. Refers to: Glass Tech Wholesale Inc

Notice of Change of Firm Name

Notice of Change of Firm Name filed by Vador Vapor LLC.

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed by Mansour, Dored.

Notice to Filing Party SD

Notice of Conditional Settlement submitted by Boes, Thomas; Sherman, Nyeisha rejected on 08/02/2018.

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed by Boes, Thomas; Sherman, Nyeisha. Refers to: Vador Vapor LLC

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Boes, Thomas; Sherman, Nyeisha.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (VADOR VAPOR LLC) filed by Boes, Thomas. Refers to: Vador Vapor LLC

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Sun Vapers Inc) filed by Boes, Thomas. Refers to: Sun Vapers Inc

Motion to Strike

Motion to Strike (portions of plaintiffs complaint) filed by Vador Vapor LLC.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (VADOR VAPOR LLC) filed by Boes, Thomas. Refers to: Vador Vapor LLC

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Sun Vapers Inc) filed by Boes, Thomas. Refers to: Sun Vapers Inc

Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney filed by Boes, Thomas.

Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney filed by Sherman, Nyeisha.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Boes, Thomas; Sherman, Nyeisha.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Vador Vapor LLC.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Vador Vapor LLC.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Sun Vapers Inc.

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail filed by Sun Vapers Inc.

93 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2018
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 09/28/2018 at 08:55:00 AM at Central in C-75 Richard E. L. Strauss was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial scheduled for 10/12/2018 at 08:50:00 AM at Central in C-75 Richard E. L. Strauss was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • DocketCross-Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to LG Chem Ltd.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • DocketCross-Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Mansour, Dored.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • DocketCross-Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Vador Vapor LLC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • DocketCross-Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Glass Tech Wholesales Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • DocketCross-Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Glass Tech Wholesale Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • DocketAmended Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Sherman, Nyeisha .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • DocketAmended Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Boes, Thomas .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • DocketAmended Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to LG Chem Ltd.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
136 More Docket Entries
  • 06/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Sun Vapers Inc) filed by Boes, Thomas. Refers to: Sun Vapers Inc Filed By: Boes, Thomas (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (VADOR VAPOR LLC) filed by Boes, Thomas. Refers to: Vador Vapor LLC Filed By: Boes, Thomas (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Boes, Thomas; Sherman, Nyeisha. Filed By: Boes, Thomas (Plaintiff); Sherman, Nyeisha (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/04/2016 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-75 Richard E. L. Strauss.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Strauss, Richard.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Boes, Thomas; Sherman, Nyeisha. Refers to: Sun Vapers Inc; Vador Vapor LLC Filed By: Boes, Thomas (Plaintiff); Sherman, Nyeisha (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Boes, Thomas; Sherman, Nyeisha. Refers to: Sun Vapers Inc; Vador Vapor LLC Filed By: Boes, Thomas (Plaintiff); Sherman, Nyeisha (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Boes, Thomas; Sherman, Nyeisha. Refers to: Sun Vapers Inc; Vador Vapor LLC Filed By: Boes, Thomas (Plaintiff); Sherman, Nyeisha (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less