This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 01/10/2023 at 05:22:54 (UTC).

Bobadilla vs Departmen of Health Care Services

Case Summary

On 03/22/2022 Bobadilla filed an Other lawsuit against Departmen of Health Care Services. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is John S. Meyer. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

John S. Meyer

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Bobadilla, Pedro

Respondent

Department of Health Care Services

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Drelich, Matan

 

Court Documents

Petition - Other

Petition - Other filed by Bobadilla, Pedro. Refers to: Department of Health Care Services

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Bobadilla, Pedro. Refers to: Department of Health Care Services

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

[Another document for ROA# 5]

Petition - Other

[Another document for ROA# 5]

Civil Case Cover Sheet

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Bobadilla, Pedro.

Minute Order

Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

Minute Order

Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

Notice of Dismissal SD

Notice of Dismissal SD generated.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Dismissal SD generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMiscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketCourt ordered entire action dismissed without prejudice.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMiscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Bobadilla, Pedro.; Filed By: Bobadilla, Pedro (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-filing transaction partially accepted.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 5]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 5]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Meyer, John.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Bobadilla, Pedro. Refers to: Department of Health Care Services; Filed By: Bobadilla, Pedro (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition - Other filed by Bobadilla, Pedro. Refers to: Department of Health Care Services; Filed By: Bobadilla, Pedro (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less