Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/14/2020 at 08:35:13 (UTC).

Blatt VS FAJAY

Case Summary

On 01/15/2020 Blatt filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against FAJAY. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Blatt, Chris

Defendant

FAJAY, MARCHELLO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kopp, John W

 

Court Documents

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Blatt, Chris. Refers to: FAJAY, MARCHELLO

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Blatt, Chris. Refers to: FAJAY, MARCHELLO

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Blatt, Chris. Refers to: FAJAY, MARCHELLO

Notice that you have been sued SD

Case initiation form printed.

Writ of Execution for Possession of the Premises

Writ of Execution for Possession of the Premises submitted by Blatt, Chris received but not filed on 01/28/2020.

Proof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Blatt, Chris. Refers to: FAJAY, MARCHELLO

Proof of Service of 10-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by Blatt, Chris.

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default (Including Unknown Occupants) filed by Blatt, Chris. Refers to: FAJAY, MARCHELLO

Judgment by Default by Clerk for Possession Only

Judgment by Default by Clerk for Possession Only (Including Unknown Occupants) filed by Blatt, Chris. Refers to: FAJAY, MARCHELLO

Writ of Possession Returned - Wholly Satisfied

Writ of Possession Returned - Wholly Satisfied filed by Blatt, Chris.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned - Wholly Satisfied filed by Blatt, Chris. Filed By: Blatt, Chris (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Clerk for Possession Only (Including Unknown Occupants) filed by Blatt, Chris. Refers to: FAJAY, MARCHELLO Filed By: Blatt, Chris (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketJudgment entered for Blatt, Chris and against FAJAY, MARCHELLO for a grand total of $ 0.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketWrit of Possession issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution for Possession of the Premises submitted by Blatt, Chris received but not filed on 01/28/2020. Filed By: Blatt, Chris (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Blatt, Chris. Refers to: FAJAY, MARCHELLO Filed By: Blatt, Chris (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by Blatt, Chris. Filed By: Blatt, Chris (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default (Including Unknown Occupants) filed by Blatt, Chris. Refers to: FAJAY, MARCHELLO Filed By: Blatt, Chris (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketThe default filed by Blatt, Chris was entered as to FAJAY, MARCHELLO on Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 . Override feature used.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Blatt, Chris. Refers to: FAJAY, MARCHELLO Filed By: Blatt, Chris (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Blatt, Chris. Refers to: FAJAY, MARCHELLO Filed By: Blatt, Chris (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Blatt, Chris. Refers to: FAJAY, MARCHELLO Filed By: Blatt, Chris (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department C-60.

    Read MoreRead Less