This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/12/2018 at 13:30:13 (UTC).

Black vs. Nelson

Case Summary

On 08/18/2015 Black filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Nelson. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOEL R. WOHLFEIL. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

JOEL R. WOHLFEIL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

Black, Jerry Beck

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Affinito, Vincent Michael

Hertz Vehicles LLC

Moore, Ernest James

Nelson, Brooke Emily

Nelson, Glenn

Nulman, Anatoly

Plaintiffs, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Black, Jerry Beck

Affinito, Vincent Michael

Hertz Vehicles LLC

Moore, Ernest James

Nelson, Brooke Emily

Nelson, Glenn

Nulman, Anatoly

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

Copley, Rocky K

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF ROCKY K COPLEY

2100 W Broadway

San Diego, CA 92101

Cross Defendant, Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

DI MASCIO, DENISE M.

Attorney at HARTSUYKER STRATMAN & WILLIAMS ABREGO

3111 Camino Del Rio N #700

San Diego, CA 92108

FELDNER, J LYNN

Attorney at MURCHISON & CUMMING LLP

750 B Street 2550

San Diego, CA 92101

CASE, ANTHONY T

Attorney at FARMER CASE & FEDOR

1100 W Broadway

San Diego, CA 92101

WINET, RANDALL L

Attorney at WINET PATRICK GAYER CREIGHTON & HANES

1215 W Vista Way

Vista, CA 92083-6227

Plaintiff, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Copley, Rocky K

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF ROCKY K COPLEY

2100 W Broadway

San Diego, CA 92101

DI MASCIO, DENISE M.

Attorney at HARTSUYKER STRATMAN & WILLIAMS ABREGO

3111 Camino Del Rio N #700

San Diego, CA 92108

FELDNER, J LYNN

Attorney at MURCHISON & CUMMING LLP

750 B Street 2550

San Diego, CA 92101

CASE, ANTHONY T

Attorney at FARMER CASE & FEDOR

1100 W Broadway

San Diego, CA 92101

WINET, RANDALL L

Attorney at WINET PATRICK GAYER CREIGHTON & HANES

1215 W Vista Way

Vista, CA 92083-6227

 

Court Documents

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Black, Jerry Beck. Refers to: Moore, Ernest

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit (Notice of Payment of Advance Jury Fee) filed by Hertz Vehicles LLC; Nulman, Anatoly.

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt (Hertz Vehicles, LLC) filed by Black, Jerry Beck. Refers to: Hertz Vehicles LLC

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Black, Jerry Beck. Refers to: Nelson, Brooke; Nelson, Glenn; Nulman, Anatoly; Hertz Vehicles LLC; Affinito, Vincent; Moore, Ernest

Answer

Answer (TO CROSS-COMPLAINT OF ERNEST MOORE) filed by Black, Jerry Beck. Refers to: Moore, Ernest

Answer

Answer (to x-complaint w/proof of service) filed by Nelson, Brooke Emily.

Answer

Answer (with proof of service) filed by Affinito, Vincent Michael.

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Cause of Actions

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Cause of Actions (NOT ENTERED - Clerk Cannot Enter Dismissal with Conditions) filed by Affinito, Vincent Michael.

Complaint

Complaint filed by Black, Jerry Beck. Refers to: Nelson, Brooke; Nelson, Glenn; Nulman, Anatoly; Hertz Vehicles LLC; Affinito, Vincent; Moore, Ernest

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party (as to XC filed by Brooke Nelson and Glenn Nelson on 9/15/16) filed by Nelson, Brooke Emily; Nelson, Glenn.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 02/26/2016 01:30:00 PM.

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from Judge Prager, Ronald S. to Joel Wohlfeil effective 08/28/2015

Correspondence

Correspondence (submitted by CT Corp) filed by Black, Jerry Beck.

Answer

Answer (with proof of service) filed by Moore, Ernest James.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Affinito, Vincent Michael.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service (Served Cross-Complaint) filed by Moore, Ernest James.

Answer

Answer filed by Nelson, Brooke Emily; Nelson, Glenn.

Answer

Answer (to Cross-Complaint with Proof of Service) filed by Nelson, Brooke Emily; Nelson, Glenn.

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2016
  • Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 11/17/2016 at 10:45:00 AM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • Civil Jury Trial scheduled for 12/02/2016 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Moore, Ernest James .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Nelson, Glenn .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Nelson, Brooke Emily .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Hertz Vehicles LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Nulman, Anatoly .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed by Hertz Vehicles LLC; Nulman, Anatoly. Filed By: Hertz Vehicles LLC (Cross - Complainant); Nulman, Anatoly (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Moore, Ernest James .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Nelson, Glenn .

    Read MoreRead Less
74 More Docket Entries
  • 08/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case reassigned from Judge Prager, Ronald S. to Joel Wohlfeil effective 08/28/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/04/2016 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-70 Randa Trapp was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Peremptory Challenge (Order Signed by Judge R. Trapp) filed by Black, Jerry Beck. Filed By: Black, Jerry Beck (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2015
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/04/2016 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-70 Randa Trapp.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2015
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Trapp, Randa.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2015
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Black, Jerry Beck. Refers to: Nelson, Brooke; Nelson, Glenn; Nulman, Anatoly; Hertz Vehicles LLC; Affinito, Vincent; Moore, Ernest Filed By: Black, Jerry Beck (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Black, Jerry Beck. Refers to: Nelson, Brooke; Nelson, Glenn; Nulman, Anatoly; Hertz Vehicles LLC; Affinito, Vincent; Moore, Ernest Filed By: Black, Jerry Beck (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by Black, Jerry Beck. Refers to: Nelson, Brooke; Nelson, Glenn; Nulman, Anatoly; Hertz Vehicles LLC; Affinito, Vincent; Moore, Ernest Filed By: Black, Jerry Beck (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.