This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/19/2021 at 05:13:54 (UTC).

Black vs Flatiron Construction Corporation

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 Black filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Flatiron Construction Corporation. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy Taylor. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Timothy Taylor

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Black, Steve

Defendants

Stacy and Witbeck Inc

Flatiron-Skanska-Stacy and Witbeck

Skanska USA Civil West California District Inc; ESA : Skanska USA Building Inc

Flatiron West Inc; ESA : Flatiron Construction Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Neal, Todd

525 B Street 2200

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorneys

McDermott, Sam

Attorney at WOOD SMITH HENNING & BERMAN LLP

6A Liberty Street 200

Aliso Viejo, CA 92656

Lockard, Stephen

6A Liberty Street 200

Aliso Viejo, CA 92656

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Black, Steve.

Amended Answer

Amended Answer (First) filed by Flatiron West Inc; FLATIRON-SKANSKA-STACY and WITBECK; Skanska USA Civil West California District Inc; Stacy and Witbeck Inc.

Notice of Errata

Notice of Errata (Regarding Legal Name of Defendant Flatiron West, Inc.) filed by Flatiron West Inc; FLATIRON-SKANSKA-STACY and WITBECK; Skanska USA Civil West California District Inc; Stacy and Witbeck Inc.

Notice of Errata

Notice of Errata (Regarding Legal Name of Defendant Flatiron-Skanska-Stacy and Witbeck, A Joint Venture) filed by Flatiron West Inc; FLATIRON-SKANSKA-STACY and WITBECK; Skanska USA Civil West California District Inc; Stacy and Witbeck Inc.

Notice of Errata

Notice of Errata (Regarding Legal Name of Defendant Skanska USA Civil West California District, Inc.) filed by Flatiron West Inc; FLATIRON-SKANSKA-STACY and WITBECK; Skanska USA Civil West California District Inc; Stacy and Witbeck Inc.

Plaintiff's Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Black, Steve.

Plaintiff's Notice of Payment of Advance Jury Fee

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Black, Steve.

Case Management Statement (Case Management)

Case Management Statement filed by Flatiron West Inc; Skanska USA Civil West California District Inc; Stacy and Witbeck Inc; Flatiron-Skanska-Stacy and Witbeck.

Case Management Order (Order)

Case Management Statement filed by Skanska USA Civil West California District Inc; Stacy and Witbeck Inc; Flatiron-Skanska-Stacy and Witbeck; FLATIRON-SKANSKA-STACY and WITBECK.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 10/30/2020 09:15:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit (Notices)

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Flatiron West Inc; Skanska USA Civil West California District Inc; Stacy and Witbeck Inc; Flatiron-Skanska-Stacy and Witbeck.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference rescheduled to 10/30/2020 at 09:15:00 AM in C-72 before Timothy Taylor at Central.

Defendants Flatiron Construction Corporation Skanska Usa Building Inc Stacy And Witbeck Inc And Flatiron Skanska Stacys Answer And Affirmative Defenses To Plaintiffs Complaint

Answer filed by Flatiron Construction Corporation; Skanska USA Building Inc; Stacy and Witbeck Inc; FLATIRON-SKANSKA-STACY.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Flatiron-Skanska-Stacy and Witbeck, a Joint Venture)

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Black, Steve. Refers to: Flatiron-Skanska-Stacy and Witbeck

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMiscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial scheduled for 07/09/2021 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-72 Timothy Taylor was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 06/25/2021 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-72 Timothy Taylor was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Black, Steve. Filed By: Black, Steve (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to FLATIRON-SKANSKA-STACY and WITBECK.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Flatiron West Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Skanska USA Civil West California District Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Stacy and Witbeck Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Flatiron-Skanska-Stacy and Witbeck.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Black, Steve. Refers to: Flatiron West Inc Filed By: Black, Steve (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Black, Steve. Refers to: Skanska USA Civil West California District Inc Filed By: Black, Steve (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Black, Steve. Refers to: Stacy and Witbeck Inc Filed By: Black, Steve (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/26/2020 at 09:15:00 AM at Central in C-72 Timothy Taylor.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Black, Steve. Refers to: Flatiron West Inc; Skanska USA Civil West California District Inc; Stacy and Witbeck Inc; Flatiron-Skanska-Stacy and Witbeck; FLATIRON-SKANSKA-STACY and WITBECK Filed By: Black, Steve (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Black, Steve. Refers to: Flatiron West Inc; Skanska USA Civil West California District Inc; Stacy and Witbeck Inc; Flatiron-Skanska-Stacy and Witbeck Filed By: Black, Steve (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Black, Steve. Refers to: Flatiron West Inc; Skanska USA Civil West California District Inc; Stacy and Witbeck Inc; Flatiron-Skanska-Stacy and Witbeck Filed By: Black, Steve (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Taylor, Timothy.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STACY & WITBECK HERZOG is a litigant

Latest cases where SKANSKA USA CIVIL WEST CALIFORNIA DISTRICT INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where FLATIRON WEST INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCDERMOTT SAM L