This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 10/30/2022 at 12:10:52 (UTC).

Billauer vs Escobar-Eck

Case Summary

On 02/16/2021 Billauer filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against Escobar-Eck. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kenneth J Medel. The case status is Pending - Appeal.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Appeal

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kenneth J Medel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff, Appellant and Cross Defendant

Billauer, Joshua

Cross Plaintiff, Respondent and Defendant

Escobar-Eck, Olga Marcela

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Appellant and Cross Defendant Attorney

Briggs, Cory J

Attorney at BRIGGS LAW CORPORATION

99 E C Street 111

Upland, CA 91786

Cross Plaintiff, Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Rozmus, Tamara Leetham

McCaskill, Scott

Attorney at GORDON REES SCULLY MANSUKHANI LLP

101 W Broadway 2000

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by Billauer, Joshua. Refers to: Escobar-Eck, Olga

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 10/14/2022 08:30:00 AM.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Billauer, Joshua.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Escobar-Eck, Olga Marcela.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Escobar-Eck, Olga Marcela.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Escobar-Eck, Olga Marcela.

Notice - Other

Notice - Other (of Name Change for Cross-Complaint's Counsel) filed by Escobar-Eck, Olga Marcela.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Escobar-Eck, Olga Marcela.

Proposed Order Granting Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatories, Set Two

Proposed Order submitted by Escobar-Eck, Olga Marcela received but not filed on 08/11/2022.

Separate Statement In Support of Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatories, Set Two

Separate Statement filed by Escobar-Eck, Olga Marcela.

Memorandum of Points nd Authorities In Support of Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatories, Set Two

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Escobar-Eck, Olga Marcela.

Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Plaintiff's Further Responses to Request for Production, Set Two

Motion to Compel Discovery filed by Escobar-Eck, Olga Marcela.

Declaration of Scott McCaskill In Support of Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatories, Set Two

Declaration - Other (of Scott McCaskill) filed by Escobar-Eck, Olga Marcela.

Proposed Order Granting Motion to Compel Further Responses to Request for Production of Documents, Set Two

Proposed Order submitted by Escobar-Eck, Olga Marcela received but not filed on 08/11/2022.

Separate Statement In Support of Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Further Responses to Request for Production of Documents, Set Two

Separate Statement filed by Escobar-Eck, Olga Marcela.

Memorandum of Points nd Authorities In Support of Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Further Responses to Request for Production of Documents, Set Two

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Escobar-Eck, Olga Marcela.

of Scott McCaskill

Declaration - Other (of Scott McCaskill) filed by Escobar-Eck, Olga Marcela.

Notice of Moton and Motion to Compel Further Responses Special Interrogatories, Set Two

Motion to Compel Discovery filed by Escobar-Eck, Olga Marcela.

131 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2023
  • HearingLocation: C-66; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • HearingLocation: C-66; Event Type: Discovery Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • HearingLocation: C-66; Event Type: Discovery Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 10/14/2022 08:30:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference continued pursuant to party's motion to 01/20/2023 at 09:30AM before Judge Kenneth J Medel.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Billauer, Joshua.; Filed By: Billauer, Joshua (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Escobar-Eck, Olga Marcela.; Filed By: Escobar-Eck, Olga Marcela (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Escobar-Eck, Olga Marcela.; Filed By: Escobar-Eck, Olga Marcela (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Escobar-Eck, Olga Marcela.; Filed By: Escobar-Eck, Olga Marcela (Cross - Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice - Other (of Name Change for Cross-Complaint's Counsel) filed by Escobar-Eck, Olga Marcela.; Filed By: Escobar-Eck, Olga Marcela (Cross - Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
160 More Docket Entries
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Meet and Confer filed by Escobar-Eck, Olga Marcela.; Filed By: Escobar-Eck, Olga Marcela (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail - Petition filed by Billauer, Joshua. Refers to: Escobar-Eck, Olga; Filed By: Billauer, Joshua (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Due Diligence filed by Billauer, Joshua. Refers to: Escobar-Eck, Olga; Filed By: Billauer, Joshua (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/10/2021 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-66 Kenneth J Medel.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Medel, Kenneth.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Billauer, Joshua. Refers to: Escobar-Eck, Olga; Filed By: Billauer, Joshua (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Billauer, Joshua. Refers to: Escobar-Eck, Olga; Filed By: Billauer, Joshua (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Billauer, Joshua. Refers to: Escobar-Eck, Olga; Filed By: Billauer, Joshua (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less