This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 02/20/2023 at 07:06:13 (UTC).

BHAKTA VS HAIGHT BROWN & BONESTEEL LLP

Case Summary

On 12/22/2022 BHAKTA filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against HAIGHT BROWN BONESTEEL LLP. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Keri Katz. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Keri Katz

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BHAKTA, DENNY

FUSION HOSPITALITY CORPORATION

FUSION HOTEL MANAGEMENT LLC

Defendants

HAIGHT BROWN & BONESTEEL LLP

POKALA LAW APC

POKALA, KALYAN D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hovore, F Thomas

Attorney at HOVORE LAW

3500 W Olive Avenue 300

Burbank, CA 91505

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by BHAKTA, DENNY; FUSION HOTEL MANAGEMENT LLC; FUSION HOSPITALITY CORPORATION. Refers to: POKALA, KALYAN; HAIGHT BROWN & BONESTEEL LLP; POKALA LAW APC

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by BHAKTA, DENNY; FUSION HOTEL MANAGEMENT LLC; FUSION HOSPITALITY CORPORATION. Refers to: POKALA, KALYAN; HAIGHT BROWN & BONESTEEL LLP; POKALA LAW APC

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 5]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 5]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Complaint

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Civil Case Cover Sheet

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

Notice of Lien

Notice of Lien filed by MP1959 Investment LLC; Patel, Mukesh.

Notice of Lien

Notice of Lien filed by V&C Investment LLC; Patel, Vishal.

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by BHAKTA, DENNY; FUSION HOSPITALITY CORPORATION; FUSION HOTEL MANAGEMENT LLC.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2023
  • HearingLocation: C-74; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by BHAKTA, DENNY; FUSION HOSPITALITY CORPORATION; FUSION HOTEL MANAGEMENT LLC.; Filed By: BHAKTA, DENNY (Plaintiff); FUSION HOSPITALITY CORPORATION (Plaintiff); FUSION HOTEL MANAGEMENT LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Lien filed by V&C Investment LLC; Patel, Vishal.; Filed By: V&C Investment LLC (Interested Party); Patel, Vishal (Interested Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Lien filed by MP1959 Investment LLC; Patel, Mukesh.; Filed By: MP1959 Investment LLC (Interested Party); Patel, Mukesh (Interested Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-filing transaction partially accepted.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 6]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 6]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/26/2023 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-74 Keri Katz.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Katz, Keri.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by BHAKTA, DENNY; FUSION HOTEL MANAGEMENT LLC; FUSION HOSPITALITY CORPORATION. Refers to: POKALA, KALYAN; HAIGHT BROWN & BONESTEEL LLP; POKALA LAW APC; Filed By: BHAKTA, DENNY (Plaintiff); FUSION HOTEL MANAGEMENT LLC (Plaintiff); FUSION HOSPITALITY CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by BHAKTA, DENNY; FUSION HOTEL MANAGEMENT LLC; FUSION HOSPITALITY CORPORATION. Refers to: POKALA, KALYAN; HAIGHT BROWN & BONESTEEL LLP; POKALA LAW APC; Filed By: BHAKTA, DENNY (Plaintiff); FUSION HOTEL MANAGEMENT LLC (Plaintiff); FUSION HOSPITALITY CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less