This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/06/2018 at 17:28:02 (UTC).

Berube vs Union Bank NA

Case Summary

On 01/10/2014 Berube filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Union Bank NA. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOEL M. PRESSMAN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

JOEL M. PRESSMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Berube, Louis H

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Union Bank

Union Bank NA

Unionbancal Corporation

Unionbancal Mortgage Corporation

Erb, Robert

Jim Abbott and Associates Inc; DBA : Abbott Realty Group;DBA : ABBOTT REALTY GROUP;AKA : JIM ABBOTT

Taylor, Katie

Triad Properties

JIM ABBOTT AND ASSOCIATES INC; DBA : ABBOTT REALTY GROUP;DBA : ABBOTT REALTY GROUP;AKA : JIM ABBOTT AND ASSOCIATES INC

TAYLOR PLACE REAL ESTATE INC; DBA : TRIAD PROPERTIES;ESA : TRIAD PROPERTIES

TAYLOR, CATHERINE ; AKA : TAYLOR, KATIE;ESA : TAYLOR, KATIE

Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Abbott Realty Group

Erb, Robert

JIM ABBOTT AND ASSOCIATES INC; DBA : ABBOTT REALTY GROUP;DBA : ABBOTT REALTY GROUP;AKA : JIM ABBOTT AND ASSOCIATES INC

TAYLOR, CATHERINE ; AKA : TAYLOR, KATIE;ESA : TAYLOR, KATIE

TAYLOR PLACE REAL ESTATE INC; DBA : TRIAD PROPERTIES;ESA : TRIAD PROPERTIES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bacal, Dan

275 E Douglas Ave #114

El Cajon, CA 92020

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Zappaterreno, Cassandra J.

515 S Figueroa St #1515

Los Angeles, CA 90071

TUCKER, WILLIAM J

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF WILLIAM J TUCKER

10555 Spruce Grove Ave

San Diego, CA 92131

Griffith, Michael W

VRANJES, MARK

Attorney at GRIMM VRANJES & GREER LLP

P O Box 129012

San Diego, CA 92101

MARTIN, MICHAEL B

Attorney at GRIMM VRANJES & GREER LLP

3250 Grey Hawk Ct

Carlsbad, CA 92010

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Berube, Louis H. Refers to: Union Bank NA; Union Bank; Unionbancal Corporation; Unionbancal Mortgage Corporation

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Jim Abbott and Associates Inc.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Jim Abbott and Associates Inc.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Robert Erb) filed by Union Bank NA. Refers to: Erb, Robert

Cross-Complaint

Cross-Complaint filed by Union Bank NA. Refers to: Abbott Realty Group; Jim Abbott and Associates Inc; Erb, Robert

Answer

Answer filed by Taylor Place Real Estate Inc.

Answer

Answer (to Cross-Complaint) filed by Erb, Robert. Refers to: Berube, Louis

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Taylor, Catherine; Taylor Place Real Estate Inc.

Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action (As to Cross-Complaint only filed by Union Bank NA) filed by Union Bank NA.

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail filed by Erb, Robert.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Union Bank NA. Refers to: Abbott Realty Group

Answer

Answer filed by Jim Abbott and Associates Inc.

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/21/2014 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-66 Joel M. Pressman.

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed by Jim Abbott and Associates Inc. Refers to: Erb, Robert

Notice of Continued Case Management Conference

Notice - Other (Notice of Continued Case Management Conference) filed by Taylor, Catherine; Taylor Place Real Estate Inc.

Answer

Answer filed by Union Bank NA.

Original Summons

Original Summons (on cross-complaint) filed by Erb, Robert. Refers to: Taylor Place Real Estate Inc; Taylor, Catherine

Amendment to Complaint/Cross-Complaint naming Doe

Amendment to Complaint/Cross-Complaint naming Doe (Doe IV) filed by Berube, Louis H. Refers to: Taylor Place Real Estate Inc

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2015
  • Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 10/09/2015 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-66 Joel M. Pressman was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Civil Jury Trial scheduled for 10/23/2015 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-66 Joel M. Pressman was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Erb, Robert .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Taylor Place Real Estate Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Taylor, Catherine .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal (Cross-Complaint with prejudice) filed by Erb, Robert. Filed By: Erb, Robert (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2015
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Jim Abbott and Associates Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2015
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Taylor, Catherine .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2015
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Taylor Place Real Estate Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action (As to Cross-complaint filed by Jim Abbott and Associates Inc only) filed by Jim Abbott and Associates Inc. Filed By: Jim Abbott and Associates Inc (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
72 More Docket Entries
  • 03/28/2014
  • Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Union Bank.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed by Berube, Louis H. Refers to: Union Bank; Unionbancal Corporation; Unionbancal Mortgage Corporation Filed By: Berube, Louis H (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed by Union Bank NA. Filed By: Union Bank NA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/21/2014 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-66 Joel M. Pressman.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2014
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Pressman, Joel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2014
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Berube, Louis H. Refers to: Union Bank NA; Union Bank; Unionbancal Corporation; Unionbancal Mortgage Corporation Filed By: Berube, Louis H (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Berube, Louis H. Refers to: Union Bank NA; Union Bank; Unionbancal Corporation; Unionbancal Mortgage Corporation Filed By: Berube, Louis H (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by Berube, Louis H. Refers to: Union Bank NA; Union Bank; Unionbancal Corporation; Unionbancal Mortgage Corporation; Erb, Robert; Jim Abbott and Associates Inc; Taylor Place Real Estate Inc Filed By: Berube, Louis H (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.