This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 01/22/2022 at 03:13:17 (UTC).

Bernardo Hieghts Healthcare Inc vs. Nina Patterson

Case Summary

On 01/08/2018 Bernardo Hieghts Healthcare Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Nina Patterson. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BERNARDO HIEGHTS HEALTHCARE INC; DBA : CARMEL MOUNTAIN REHABILITATION AND HEALTHCARE CENTER

Defendant

PATTERSON, NINA ; AKA : PATTERSON, NINA JANE;AKA : PATTERSON, NINA J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHEPHARD, ROBERT

Attorney at ENSIGN SERVICES INC

27101 Puerta Real Suite 450

Mission Viejo, CA 92691

 

Court Documents

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Case initiation form printed.

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Bernardo Hieghts Healthcare Inc. Refers to: Patterson, Nina

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Bernardo Hieghts Healthcare Inc. Refers to: Patterson, Nina

Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000

Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by Bernardo Hieghts Healthcare Inc. Refers to: Patterson, Nina

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from C-27 to 903 effective 01/13/2018.

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default filed by Bernardo Hieghts Healthcare Inc. Refers to: Patterson, Nina

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (As To Nina Patterson AKA Nina Jane Patterson AKA Nina J Patterson) filed by Bernardo Hieghts Healthcare Inc. Refers to: Patterson, Nina

Proof of Service

Proof of Service (Notice of Case Reassignment) filed by Bernardo Hieghts Healthcare Inc. Refers to: Patterson, Nina

Notice to Filing Party SD

Judgment by Default by Court submitted by Bernardo Hieghts Healthcare Inc rejected on 04/30/2018.

Application for Entry of Judgment

Application for Entry of Judgment (with Dismissal of Does and Supporting Declarations) filed by Bernardo Hieghts Healthcare Inc. Refers to: Patterson, Nina

Judgment by Default by Court

Judgment by Default by Court filed by Bernardo Hieghts Healthcare Inc. Refers to: Patterson, Nina

Notice to Filing Party SD

Judgment by Default by Court (submitted 07/26/18) submitted by Bernardo Hieghts Healthcare Inc rejected on 09/24/2018. Refers to: Patterson, Nina

Application for Entry of Judgment

Application for Entry of Judgment (with dismissal of does and supporting declarations) filed by Bernardo Hieghts Healthcare Inc. Refers to: Patterson, Nina

Abstract of Judgment

Abstract of Judgment issued.

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court filed by Bernardo Hieghts Healthcare Inc. Refers to: Patterson, Nina Filed By: Bernardo Hieghts Healthcare Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • DocketJudgment was entered as follows: Judgment entered for Bernardo Hieghts Healthcare Inc and against Patterson, Nina for $ 14550.00, punitive damages: $ 0.00, attorney fees: $ 0.00, interest: $ 0.00, prejudgment costs: $ 435.00, other costs: $ 0.00, amount payable to court: $ .00, for a grand total of $ 14985.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court (submitted 07/26/18) submitted by Bernardo Hieghts Healthcare Inc rejected on 09/24/2018. Refers to: Patterson, Nina Filed By: Bernardo Hieghts Healthcare Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication for Entry of Judgment (with dismissal of does and supporting declarations) filed by Bernardo Hieghts Healthcare Inc. Refers to: Patterson, Nina Filed By: Bernardo Hieghts Healthcare Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court submitted by Bernardo Hieghts Healthcare Inc rejected on 04/30/2018. Filed By: Bernardo Hieghts Healthcare Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication for Entry of Judgment (with Dismissal of Does and Supporting Declarations) filed by Bernardo Hieghts Healthcare Inc. Refers to: Patterson, Nina Filed By: Bernardo Hieghts Healthcare Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default filed by Bernardo Hieghts Healthcare Inc. Refers to: Patterson, Nina Filed By: Bernardo Hieghts Healthcare Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • DocketDefault entered as to Patterson, Nina on Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by Bernardo Hieghts Healthcare Inc .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service (Notice of Case Reassignment) filed by Bernardo Hieghts Healthcare Inc. Refers to: Patterson, Nina Filed By: Bernardo Hieghts Healthcare Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (As To Nina Patterson AKA Nina Jane Patterson AKA Nina J Patterson) filed by Bernardo Hieghts Healthcare Inc. Refers to: Patterson, Nina Filed By: Bernardo Hieghts Healthcare Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase reassigned from C-27 to 903 effective 01/13/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by Bernardo Hieghts Healthcare Inc. Refers to: Patterson, Nina Filed By: Bernardo Hieghts Healthcare Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Bernardo Hieghts Healthcare Inc. Refers to: Patterson, Nina Filed By: Bernardo Hieghts Healthcare Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Bernardo Hieghts Healthcare Inc. Refers to: Patterson, Nina Filed By: Bernardo Hieghts Healthcare Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Department C-27.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bernardo Heights Healthcare Inc; DBA : Carmel Mountain Rehabilitation and Healthcare Center is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shephard, Robert