This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/14/2020 at 08:04:52 (UTC).

Benjamin vs Virgen

Case Summary

On 02/14/2020 Benjamin filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Virgen. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Joel R. Wohlfeil. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Joel R. Wohlfeil

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Benjamin, William M

Defendant

Virgen, Isabel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Benjamin, Andrew J

 

Court Documents

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (Stipulation & order for conditional dismissal) filed by Virgen, Isabel; Benjamin, William M.

Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal filed by Benjamin, William M. Refers to: Virgen, Isabel

Notice to Filing Party SD

Stipulation - Other (settlement/dismissal) submitted by Benjamin, William M rejected on 03/09/2020.

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Benjamin, William M. Refers to: Virgen, Isabel

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Benjamin, William M. Refers to: Virgen, Isabel

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Benjamin, William M. Refers to: Virgen, Isabel

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/24/2020 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal filed by Benjamin, William M. Refers to: Virgen, Isabel Filed By: Benjamin, William M (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketComplaint Demanding Less than $10,000 dismissed without prejudice as to Virgen, Isabel .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketComplaint Demanding Less than $10,000 dismissed without prejudice as to Benjamin, William M .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation - Other - Fee Due (Stipulation & order for conditional dismissal) filed by Virgen, Isabel; Benjamin, William M. Filed By: Virgen, Isabel (Defendant); Benjamin, William M (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation - Other (settlement/dismissal) submitted by Benjamin, William M rejected on 03/09/2020. Filed By: Benjamin, William M (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Benjamin, William M. Refers to: Virgen, Isabel Filed By: Benjamin, William M (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Benjamin, William M. Refers to: Virgen, Isabel Filed By: Benjamin, William M (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Benjamin, William M. Refers to: Virgen, Isabel Filed By: Benjamin, William M (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Wohlfeil, Joel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/24/2020 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less