This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/26/2021 at 04:48:19 (UTC).

Benham VS Waste Management of California Inc

Case Summary

On 08/03/2020 Benham filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Waste Management of California Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard E. L. Strauss and James A Mangione. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judges

Richard E. L. Strauss

James A Mangione

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BENHAM, LORETTA ANN

BENHAM, GERALD THOMAS

Defendants

Waste Management of California Inc; DBA : Waste Management of San Diego

County of San Diego

Huguet, Rolando Sanchez

USA WASTE OF CALIFORNIA INC; ESA : Waste Management of California Inc;DBA : Waste Management of San Diego

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Sigelman, Kenneth M.

Attorney at KENNETH M SIGELMAN & ASSOCIATES

1901 First Avenue 2Nd Floor

San Diego, CA 92101-2382

Handel, Susan

1901 First Avenue 2Nd Floor

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorneys

Welsh, Christopher J

1600 Pacific Hwy #355

San Diego, CA 92101

Bordin-Wosk, Joshua

6100 Center Drive Suite 1100

Los Angeles, CA 90045

 

Court Documents

Ex Parte Application (For Extension of Time to Serve Pleading and Order)

Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to Serve Pleading and Orders (Order Signed 3/29/2021) filed by BENHAM, GERALD THOMAS; BENHAM, LORETTA ANN.

Notice of Association of Counsel

Association of Attorney filed by BENHAM, GERALD THOMAS; BENHAM, LORETTA ANN.

Proof of Service of Summons (Waste Mgmt)

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by BENHAM, GERALD THOMAS; BENHAM, LORETTA ANN. Refers to: USA WASTE OF CALIFORNIA INC

Proof of Service of Summons (County)

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by BENHAM, GERALD THOMAS; BENHAM, LORETTA ANN. Refers to: County of San Diego

Proof of Service of Summons (Huguet)

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by BENHAM, GERALD THOMAS; BENHAM, LORETTA ANN. Refers to: Huguet, Rolando

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by BENHAM, GERALD THOMAS; BENHAM, LORETTA ANN.

Proof of Service (CMC Statement)

Proof of Service filed by BENHAM, GERALD THOMAS; BENHAM, LORETTA ANN.

Defendant County of San Diego's Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint

Answer filed by County of San Diego.

Defendant County of San Diego's Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by County of San Diego.

Defendant County of San Diego's Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by County of San Diego.

Defendant County of San Diego Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by County of San Diego.

Notice of Payment of Advance Jury Fee

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by BENHAM, GERALD THOMAS; BENHAM, LORETTA ANN.

Waste Management's Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint

Answer filed by USA WASTE OF CALIFORNIA INC.

Rolando Sanchez Huguet's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint

Answer filed by Huguet, Rolando Sanchez.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 07/16/2021 10:30:00 AM.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Huguet, Rolando Sanchez; USA WASTE OF CALIFORNIA INC.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 07/30/2021 10:30:00 AM.

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from Strauss,Richard to Mangione,James effective 10/30/2021

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-75; Event Type: Civil Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-75; Event Type: Trial Readiness Conference (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-75; Event Type: Discovery Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-75; Event Type: Discovery Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-75; Event Type: Ex Parte

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketDiscovery Hearing scheduled for 02/18/2022 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-75 James A Mangione.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketDiscovery Hearing scheduled for 02/18/2022 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-75 James A Mangione.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketEx Parte scheduled for 11/30/2021 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-75 James A Mangione.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2021
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference (Civil) reassigned to Mangione, James for 02/25/2022 at 08:55:00 AM in C-75 at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial reassigned to Mangione, James for 03/11/2022 at 08:50:00 AM in C-75 at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Application for Extension of Time to Serve Pleading and Orders filed by BENHAM, GERALD THOMAS; BENHAM, LORETTA ANN. Filed By: BENHAM, GERALD THOMAS (Plaintiff); BENHAM, LORETTA ANN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Application for Extension of Time to Serve Pleading and Orders filed by BENHAM, GERALD THOMAS; BENHAM, LORETTA ANN. Filed By: BENHAM, GERALD THOMAS (Plaintiff); BENHAM, LORETTA ANN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/16/2021 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-75 Richard E. L. Strauss.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by BENHAM, GERALD THOMAS; BENHAM, LORETTA ANN. Refers to: USA WASTE OF CALIFORNIA INC; Huguet, Rolando; County of San Diego Filed By: BENHAM, GERALD THOMAS (Plaintiff); BENHAM, LORETTA ANN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by BENHAM, GERALD THOMAS; BENHAM, LORETTA ANN. Refers to: USA WASTE OF CALIFORNIA INC; Huguet, Rolando; County of San Diego Filed By: BENHAM, GERALD THOMAS (Plaintiff); BENHAM, LORETTA ANN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by BENHAM, GERALD THOMAS; BENHAM, LORETTA ANN. Refers to: USA WASTE OF CALIFORNIA INC; Huguet, Rolando; County of San Diego Filed By: BENHAM, GERALD THOMAS (Plaintiff); BENHAM, LORETTA ANN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice - Other filed by BENHAM, GERALD THOMAS; BENHAM, LORETTA ANN. Refers to: USA WASTE OF CALIFORNIA INC; Huguet, Rolando; County of San Diego Filed By: BENHAM, GERALD THOMAS (Plaintiff); BENHAM, LORETTA ANN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Strauss, Richard.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WASTE MANAGEMENT, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where USA WASTE OF CALIFORNIA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Welsh, Christopher J

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BORDIN-WOSK, JOSHUA