This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 10/16/2022 at 07:12:46 (UTC).

Begle vs R W Selby & Co Inc

Case Summary

On 05/10/2022 Begle filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against R W Selby Co Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard S. Whitney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Richard S. Whitney

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Begle, Whitney

Defendant

R W Selby & Co Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Vega, Lauren Nicole

Attorney at FERRARO VEGA EMPLOYMENT LAWYERS INC

3160 Camino Del Rio S Unit 308

San Diego, CA 92108

Espinoza, Elida M

3160 Camino Del Rio S Unit 308

San Diego, CA 92108

Ferraro, Nicholas J

3160 Camino Del Rio S Unit 308

San Diego, CA 92108

Defendant Attorneys

Jacobs, Mark J

2050 Main Street 1000

Irvine, CA 92614

Wellman, Andrew S.

2050 Main Street 1000

Irvine, CA 92614

 

Court Documents

Representative Action Complaint

Complaint filed by Begle, Whitney. Refers to: R W Selby & Co Inc

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Begle, Whitney. Refers to: R W Selby & Co Inc

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Begle, Whitney. Refers to: R W Selby & Co Inc

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Proof of Service filed by Begle, Whitney.

Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration

Motion - Other (to Compel Arbitration) filed by R W Selby & Co Inc.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities ISO Motion to Compel Arbitration

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by R W Selby & Co Inc.

OF YEALLA COFIE

Declaration - Other (OF YEALLA COFIE) filed by R W Selby & Co Inc.

OF ANDREW S. WELLMAN

Declaration - Other (OF ANDREW S. WELLMAN) filed by R W Selby & Co Inc.

Proposed Order for Motion to Compel Arbitration

Proposed Order submitted by R W Selby & Co Inc received but not filed on 08/10/2022.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Civil Case Management Conference was rescheduled to 02/24/2023 at 10:30:00 AM in C-68 before Richard S. Whitney at Central.

Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order to Continue CMC

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (Joint Stipulation and Order to Continue Case Management Conference) filed by Begle, Whitney; R W Selby & Co Inc.

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2023
  • HearingLocation: C-68; Event Type: Motion Hearing (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • HearingLocation: C-68; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/24/2023 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-68 Richard S. Whitney.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketThe Civil Case Management Conference was rescheduled to 02/24/2023 at 10:30:00 AM in C-68 before Richard S. Whitney at Central.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation - Other - Fee Due (Joint Stipulation and Order to Continue Case Management Conference) filed by Begle, Whitney; R W Selby & Co Inc.; Filed By: Begle, Whitney (Plaintiff); R W Selby & Co Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketMotion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 02/24/2023 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-68 Richard S. Whitney.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order submitted by R W Selby & Co Inc received but not filed on 08/10/2022.; Filed By: R W Selby & Co Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (OF ANDREW S. WELLMAN) filed by R W Selby & Co Inc.; Filed By: R W Selby & Co Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (OF YEALLA COFIE) filed by R W Selby & Co Inc.; Filed By: R W Selby & Co Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Points and Authorities filed by R W Selby & Co Inc.; Filed By: R W Selby & Co Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion - Other (to Compel Arbitration) filed by R W Selby & Co Inc.; Filed By: R W Selby & Co Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Begle, Whitney.; Filed By: Begle, Whitney (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/21/2022 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-68 Richard S. Whitney.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Whitney, Richard.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Begle, Whitney. Refers to: R W Selby & Co Inc; Filed By: Begle, Whitney (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Begle, Whitney. Refers to: R W Selby & Co Inc; Filed By: Begle, Whitney (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Begle, Whitney. Refers to: R W Selby & Co Inc; Filed By: Begle, Whitney (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where R.W. SELBY & CO. INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WELLMAN, ANDREW S.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JACOBS MARK JARROD