This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 01/31/2023 at 07:04:49 (UTC).

Becerril vs Summercrest Apartment Associates LP

Case Summary

On 12/02/2022 Becerril filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Summercrest Apartment Associates LP. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is James A Mangione. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

James A Mangione

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Becerril, Hugo

Becerril, Isaac

Defendants

Alvarez, Edith

Sage Apartment Communities Inc

Summercrest Apartment Associates LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

De Santis, Thomas J

DeSantis, Frank

 

Court Documents

Complaint (Case Initiation)

Complaint filed by Becerril, Hugo; Becerril, Isaac. Refers to: Summercrest Apartment Associates LP; Sage Apartment Communities Inc; Alvarez, Edith

Civil Case Cover Sheet (Cover Sheets)

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Becerril, Hugo; Becerril, Isaac. Refers to: Summercrest Apartment Associates LP; Sage Apartment Communities Inc; Alvarez, Edith

Original Summons (Warrants/Issuance Returns)

Original Summons filed by Becerril, Hugo; Becerril, Isaac. Refers to: Summercrest Apartment Associates LP; Sage Apartment Communities Inc; Alvarez, Edith

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Proof of Service - Case Initiating Document)

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Becerril, Hugo. Refers to: Summercrest Apartment Associates LP

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Proof of Service - Case Initiating Document)

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Becerril, Hugo. Refers to: Sage Apartment Communities Inc

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (Proof of Service - Case Initiating Document)

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Becerril, Isaac; Becerril, Hugo. Refers to: Alvarez, Edith

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2023
  • HearingLocation: C-75; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Becerril, Isaac; Becerril, Hugo. Refers to: Alvarez, Edith; Filed By: Becerril, Isaac (Plaintiff); Becerril, Hugo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Becerril, Hugo. Refers to: Sage Apartment Communities Inc; Filed By: Becerril, Hugo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Becerril, Hugo. Refers to: Summercrest Apartment Associates LP; Filed By: Becerril, Hugo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/23/2023 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-75 James A Mangione.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Mangione, James.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Becerril, Hugo; Becerril, Isaac. Refers to: Summercrest Apartment Associates LP; Sage Apartment Communities Inc; Alvarez, Edith; Filed By: Becerril, Hugo (Plaintiff); Becerril, Isaac (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Becerril, Hugo; Becerril, Isaac. Refers to: Summercrest Apartment Associates LP; Sage Apartment Communities Inc; Alvarez, Edith; Filed By: Becerril, Hugo (Plaintiff); Becerril, Isaac (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Becerril, Hugo; Becerril, Isaac. Refers to: Summercrest Apartment Associates LP; Sage Apartment Communities Inc; Alvarez, Edith; Filed By: Becerril, Hugo (Plaintiff); Becerril, Isaac (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less