Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 02/08/2021 at 07:02:58 (UTC).

BEACON COVE ASSOCIATES LTD VS HARTZOG

Case Summary

On 01/15/2020 BEACON COVE ASSOCIATES LTD filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against HARTZOG. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Beacon Cove Associates Ltd

Defendant

HARTZOG, ASHLEY N

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Heinz, Jean M

 

Court Documents

Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied

Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed by Beacon Cove Associates Ltd.

Application for Entry of Judgment

Application for Entry of Judgment (with Supporting Declarations and Dismissal of DOES 1 - X) filed by Beacon Cove Associates Ltd. Refers to: HARTZOG, ASHLEY

Plaintiff's Mandatory Cover Sheet and Supplemental Allegations-Unlawful Detainer

Plaintiff's Mandatory Cover Sheet and Supplemental Allegations-Unlawful Detainer (with Proof of Service) filed by Beacon Cove Associates Ltd. Refers to: HARTZOG, ASHLEY

Judgment by Default by Court

Judgment by Default by Court filed by Beacon Cove Associates Ltd. Refers to: HARTZOG, ASHLEY

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Beacon Cove Associates Ltd. Refers to: HARTZOG, ASHLEY

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Beacon Cove Associates Ltd. Refers to: HARTZOG, ASHLEY

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Beacon Cove Associates Ltd. Refers to: HARTZOG, ASHLEY

Notice that you have been sued SD

Case initiation form printed.

Application for Order to Serve Summons by Posting and Mailing

Application for Order to Serve Summons by Posting and Mailing (ORDER SIGNED 1-29-2020) filed by Beacon Cove Associates Ltd. Refers to: HARTZOG, ASHLEY

Proof of service by Posting(UD)

Proof of service by Posting(UD) (Ashley N Hartzog) filed by Beacon Cove Associates Ltd. Refers to: HARTZOG, ASHLEY

Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants

Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by Beacon Cove Associates Ltd.

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default (Unknown Occupants Included) filed by Beacon Cove Associates Ltd.

Judgment by Default by Clerk for Possession Only

Judgment by Default by Clerk for Possession Only (Unknown Occupants Included) filed by Beacon Cove Associates Ltd. Refers to: HARTZOG, ASHLEY

Writ of Possession issued.

Writ of Possession issued.

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication for Entry of Judgment (with Supporting Declarations and Dismissal of DOES 1 - X) filed by Beacon Cove Associates Ltd. Refers to: HARTZOG, ASHLEY Filed By: Beacon Cove Associates Ltd (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketJudgment entered for Beacon Cove Associates Ltd and against HARTZOG, ASHLEY N for a grand total of $ 9145.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court filed by Beacon Cove Associates Ltd. Refers to: HARTZOG, ASHLEY Filed By: Beacon Cove Associates Ltd (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPlaintiff's Mandatory Cover Sheet and Supplemental Allegations-Unlawful Detainer (with Proof of Service) filed by Beacon Cove Associates Ltd. Refers to: HARTZOG, ASHLEY Filed By: Beacon Cove Associates Ltd (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed by Beacon Cove Associates Ltd. Filed By: Beacon Cove Associates Ltd (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Clerk for Possession Only (Unknown Occupants Included) filed by Beacon Cove Associates Ltd. Refers to: HARTZOG, ASHLEY Filed By: Beacon Cove Associates Ltd (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketJudgment entered for Beacon Cove Associates Ltd and against HARTZOG, ASHLEY N for a grand total of $ 0.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of service by Posting(UD) (Ashley N Hartzog) filed by Beacon Cove Associates Ltd. Refers to: HARTZOG, ASHLEY Filed By: Beacon Cove Associates Ltd (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by Beacon Cove Associates Ltd. Filed By: Beacon Cove Associates Ltd (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default (Unknown Occupants Included) filed by Beacon Cove Associates Ltd. Filed By: Beacon Cove Associates Ltd (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketDefault entered as to HARTZOG, ASHLEY N on Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Beacon Cove Associates Ltd .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication for Order to Serve Summons by Posting and Mailing (ORDER SIGNED 1-29-2020) filed by Beacon Cove Associates Ltd. Refers to: HARTZOG, ASHLEY Filed By: Beacon Cove Associates Ltd (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Beacon Cove Associates Ltd. Refers to: HARTZOG, ASHLEY Filed By: Beacon Cove Associates Ltd (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Beacon Cove Associates Ltd. Refers to: HARTZOG, ASHLEY Filed By: Beacon Cove Associates Ltd (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Beacon Cove Associates Ltd. Refers to: HARTZOG, ASHLEY Filed By: Beacon Cove Associates Ltd (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department C-60.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Heinz, Jean M