Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/12/2021 at 08:23:44 (UTC).

B&B Lamplighter Oceanside Mobile Home Park, LLC vs. Anderson

Case Summary

On 01/12/2021 B B Lamplighter Oceanside Mobile Home Park, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Anderson. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************T-NC

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

B&B Lamplighter Oceanside Mobile Home Park, LLC, a California limited liability company; DBA : Lamplighter Oceanside

Respondent

Anderson, Kalani

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BEAM, GREGORY B

 

Court Documents

Notice of Continued Hearing on Petition for Permanent Injunction

Notice - Other (Notice of Continued Hearing on Petition) filed by B&B Lamplighter Oceanside Mobile Home Park, LLC, a California limited liability company.

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing filed by B&B Lamplighter Oceanside Mobile Home Park, LLC, a California limited liability company.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by B&B Lamplighter Oceanside Mobile Home Park, LLC, a California limited liability company.

Proposed Order

Proposed Order (3/12/21) submitted by B&B Lamplighter Oceanside Mobile Home Park, LLC, a California limited liability company received but not filed on 02/16/2021.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other filed by Anderson, Kalani.

Order on Court Fee Waiver

Order on Court Fee Waiver (GRANTED) filed by Anderson, Kalani.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 03/12/2021 01:30:00 PM.

Petition for Permanent Injunction

Petition - Other filed by B&B Lamplighter Oceanside Mobile Home Park, LLC, a California limited liability company. Refers to: Anderson, Kalani

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by B&B Lamplighter Oceanside Mobile Home Park, LLC, a California limited liability company. Refers to: Anderson, Kalani

Declaration of Terri Novy in Support of Petition for Permanent Injunction

Declaration - Other filed by B&B Lamplighter Oceanside Mobile Home Park, LLC, a California limited liability company. Refers to: Anderson, Kalani

Declaration of Gregory B. Beam in Support of Petition for Permanent Injunction

Declaration - Other filed by B&B Lamplighter Oceanside Mobile Home Park, LLC, a California limited liability company. Refers to: Anderson, Kalani

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2021
  • HearingLocation: N-03; Event Type: Civil Court Trial - Petition - Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice - Other (Notice of Continued Hearing on Petition) filed by B&B Lamplighter Oceanside Mobile Home Park, LLC, a California limited liability company. Filed By: B&B Lamplighter Oceanside Mobile Home Park, LLC, a California limited liability company (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (GRANTED) filed by Anderson, Kalani. Filed By: Anderson, Kalani (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Court Trial scheduled for 04/29/2021 at 01:30PM in Department N-03.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 03/12/2021 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketTentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees filed by Anderson, Kalani. Filed By: Anderson, Kalani (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other filed by Anderson, Kalani. Filed By: Anderson, Kalani (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order (3/12/21) submitted by B&B Lamplighter Oceanside Mobile Home Park, LLC, a California limited liability company received but not filed on 02/16/2021. Filed By: B&B Lamplighter Oceanside Mobile Home Park, LLC, a California limited liability company (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing filed by B&B Lamplighter Oceanside Mobile Home Park, LLC, a California limited liability company. Filed By: B&B Lamplighter Oceanside Mobile Home Park, LLC, a California limited liability company (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by B&B Lamplighter Oceanside Mobile Home Park, LLC, a California limited liability company. Filed By: B&B Lamplighter Oceanside Mobile Home Park, LLC, a California limited liability company (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketMotion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 03/12/2021 at 01:30:00 PM at North County in N-03 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition - Other filed by B&B Lamplighter Oceanside Mobile Home Park, LLC, a California limited liability company. Refers to: Anderson, Kalani Filed By: B&B Lamplighter Oceanside Mobile Home Park, LLC, a California limited liability company (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by B&B Lamplighter Oceanside Mobile Home Park, LLC, a California limited liability company. Refers to: Anderson, Kalani Filed By: B&B Lamplighter Oceanside Mobile Home Park, LLC, a California limited liability company (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by B&B Lamplighter Oceanside Mobile Home Park, LLC, a California limited liability company. Refers to: Anderson, Kalani Filed By: B&B Lamplighter Oceanside Mobile Home Park, LLC, a California limited liability company (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other filed by B&B Lamplighter Oceanside Mobile Home Park, LLC, a California limited liability company. Refers to: Anderson, Kalani Filed By: B&B Lamplighter Oceanside Mobile Home Park, LLC, a California limited liability company (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other filed by B&B Lamplighter Oceanside Mobile Home Park, LLC, a California limited liability company. Refers to: Anderson, Kalani Filed By: B&B Lamplighter Oceanside Mobile Home Park, LLC, a California limited liability company (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department N-03.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BEAM GREGORY BRUCE