This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/31/2021 at 08:10:23 (UTC).

Bazaz vs Toyota Motor Sales USA Inc

Case Summary

On 06/02/2021 Bazaz filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Toyota Motor Sales USA Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Katherine Bacal. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Katherine Bacal

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bazaz, Kurdin

Defendant

Toyota Motor Sales USA Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Scott, Christian S

Attorney at SCOTT LAW GROUP PC

Defendant Attorney

Murphy, Thomas M.

 

Court Documents

Answer to Complaint

Answer filed by Toyota Motor Sales USA Inc.

Demand for Jury Trial

Demand for Jury Trial filed by Toyota Motor Sales USA Inc.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Bazaz, Kurdin. Refers to: Toyota Motor Sales USA Inc

Complaint

Complaint filed by Bazaz, Kurdin. Refers to: Toyota Motor Sales USA Inc

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Bazaz, Kurdin. Refers to: Toyota Motor Sales USA Inc

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Bazaz, Kurdin. Refers to: Toyota Motor Sales USA Inc

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-69; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Toyota Motor Sales USA Inc. Filed By: Toyota Motor Sales USA Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial filed by Toyota Motor Sales USA Inc. Filed By: Toyota Motor Sales USA Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Bazaz, Kurdin. Refers to: Toyota Motor Sales USA Inc Filed By: Bazaz, Kurdin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/05/2021 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-69 Katherine Bacal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Bazaz, Kurdin. Refers to: Toyota Motor Sales USA Inc Filed By: Bazaz, Kurdin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Bazaz, Kurdin. Refers to: Toyota Motor Sales USA Inc Filed By: Bazaz, Kurdin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Bazaz, Kurdin. Refers to: Toyota Motor Sales USA Inc Filed By: Bazaz, Kurdin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Bacal, Katherine.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Toyota Motor Sales U S A Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MURPHY THOMAS MATTHEW