This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/28/2021 at 03:45:58 (UTC).

Bayside Palms Investors LLC vs Franco

Case Summary

On 10/29/2020 Bayside Palms Investors LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Franco. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Randa Trapp and Carolyn Caietti. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judges

Randa Trapp

Carolyn Caietti

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Bayside Palms Investors LLC; DBA : Bayside Palms Mobile Village

Respondents

Franco, David ; AKA : Franco, David Martin

Navarro, Jasmine ; AKA : Franco, Jasmine

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BEAM, GREGORY B

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 02/05/2021 09:30:00 AM.

Supplemental Declaration of Gregory B. Beam in Support of Petitioner's Motion for Award of Attorney's Fees and Costs

Declaration - Other filed by Bayside Palms Investors LLC.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 02/11/2021 10:30:00 AM.

Order Granting Petitioner's Motion for Award of Attorney's Fees and Costs

Order - Other (Granting Motion for Attorneys Fees and Costs) filed by Bayside Palms Investors LLC.

[Proposed] Judgment

Judgment filed by Bayside Palms Investors LLC. Refers to: Franco, David; Navarro, Jasmine

Notice of Entry of Judgment

Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by Bayside Palms Investors LLC.

Proof of Service - Jasmine Franco

Proof of Service filed by Bayside Palms Investors LLC.

Proof of Service - David Franco

Proof of Service filed by Bayside Palms Investors LLC.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 01/22/2021 10:30:00 AM.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from Trapp,Randa to Caietti,Carolyn effective 11/27/2020

Motion for Attorney Fees

Motion for Attorney Fees filed by Bayside Palms Investors LLC.

Declaration in Support of Motion for Attorney Fees

Declaration - Other (of Gregory B Beam in support of motion for attorney fees) filed by Bayside Palms Investors LLC.

Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

Memorandum of Costs (Summary) filed by Bayside Palms Investors LLC.

Proposed Order

Proposed Order (granting order on motion for attorney fees) submitted by Bayside Palms Investors LLC received but not filed on 12/15/2020.

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing filed by Bayside Palms Investors LLC.

Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service filed by Bayside Palms Investors LLC. Refers to: Franco, David

Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service filed by Bayside Palms Investors LLC. Refers to: Navarro, Jasmine

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment filed by Bayside Palms Investors LLC. Filed By: Bayside Palms Investors LLC (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketJudgment was entered as follows: Judgment entered for Bayside Palms Investors LLC and against Franco, David ;Navarro, Jasmine for $ 0.00, punitive damages: $ 0.00, attorney fees: $ 6920.00, interest: $ 0.00, prejudgment costs: $ 540.81, other costs: $ 0.00, amount payable to court: $ .00, for a grand total of $ 7460.81.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder - Other (Granting Motion for Attorneys Fees and Costs) filed by Bayside Palms Investors LLC. Filed By: Bayside Palms Investors LLC (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment filed by Bayside Palms Investors LLC. Refers to: Franco, David; Navarro, Jasmine Filed By: Bayside Palms Investors LLC (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 02/11/2021 10:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketTentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other filed by Bayside Palms Investors LLC. Filed By: Bayside Palms Investors LLC (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 02/05/2021 09:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketEx Parte scheduled for 02/05/2021 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-70 Carolyn Caietti.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketMotion Hearing (Civil) continued pursuant to party's motion to 02/11/2021 at 10:30AM before Judge Carolyn Caietti.

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing filed by Bayside Palms Investors LLC. Filed By: Bayside Palms Investors LLC (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Personal Service filed by Bayside Palms Investors LLC. Refers to: Franco, David Filed By: Bayside Palms Investors LLC (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Personal Service filed by Bayside Palms Investors LLC. Refers to: Navarro, Jasmine Filed By: Bayside Palms Investors LLC (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketHearing on Petition scheduled for 11/13/2020 at 11:00:00 AM at Central in C-70 Randa Trapp.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition - Other (for permanent injunction pursuant to civil code 798.88) filed by Bayside Palms Investors LLC. Refers to: Franco, David; Navarro, Jasmine Filed By: Bayside Palms Investors LLC (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Bayside Palms Investors LLC. Refers to: Franco, David; Navarro, Jasmine Filed By: Bayside Palms Investors LLC (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other filed by Bayside Palms Investors LLC. Refers to: Franco, David; Navarro, Jasmine Filed By: Bayside Palms Investors LLC (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other filed by Bayside Palms Investors LLC. Refers to: Franco, David; Navarro, Jasmine Filed By: Bayside Palms Investors LLC (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Trapp, Randa.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BEAM GREGORY BRUCE