This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 08:47:19 (UTC).

BAYSIDE OWNERS ASSOCIATION vs. BOSA CALIFORNIA LLC

Case Summary

On 03/20/2015 BAYSIDE OWNERS ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against BOSA CALIFORNIA LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RONALD L. STYN. The case status is Other - Stayed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2015

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

RONALD L. STYN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BAYSIDE OWNERS ASSOCIATION

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

ALEXANDER BOOME CONSULTING ENGINEERS INC

B T M HVAC INC

BOSA CALIFORNIA LLC

Bosa Development California II Inc

Bosa Development California Inc

CM Firestop Inc

HMT ELECTRIC INC

HORIZON PAINTING CO. INC

NEWWAY STRUCTURES INC

ALEXANDER BOOME CONSULTING ENGINEERING LTD

QUANEX BUILDING PRODUCTS CORPORATION

QUADRA PACIFIC CONSULTANTS LTD

STARLINE WINDOWS LTD; FKA : STARLINE ARCHITECTURAL WINDOWS LTD

RAYPAK INC

VICTAULIC COMPANY

STARLINE WINDOWS INC

VITRUM GLASS INDUSTRIES INC

TRUSEAL TECHNOLOGIES INC

THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY

52 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Epsten, Jon H; RAUCH, ANNE L; Wright, Jillian M

10200 Willow Creek Road #100

San Diego, CA 92131

EPSTEN, JON H

Attorney at EPSTEN GRINNELL & HOWELL APC

Willow Creek Rd

San Diego, CA 92131

RAUCH, ANNE L

Attorney at EPSTEN GRINNELL & HOWELL APC

Willow Creek Rd

San Diego, CA 92131

WRIGHT, JILLIAN M

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

BOND, CARY R

501 West Broadway # 1660

San Diego, CA 92101

MACDONALD, MATTHEW

355 S Grand Ave

Los Angeles, CA 90071

BERN, MARTIN D

Attorney at MUNGER TOLLES & OLSON LLP

Jpmorgan Chase Building, 560 Mission St 27Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

KITCHEN, CYNTHIA A.

515 S Figueroa St

Los Angeles, CA 90071

QUALLS, KENNETH L

250 W 1St St #222

Claremont, CA 91711

WAIT, THOMAS BRIAN

250 W 1St St #222

Claremont, CA 91711

RESURRECCION, TREVOR O

BERNSTEIN, ROBERT G

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

701 B Street 1900

San Diego, CA 92101

Other Attorneys

MCCASKILL, SCOTT

Attorney at COAST LAW GROUP LLP

1140 S Coast Hwy 101

Encinitas, CA 92024

KOURETCHIAN, SEYAMACK

1140 S Coast Hwy 101

Encinitas, CA 92024

VRANJES, MARK

550 W C St #1100

San Diego, CA 92101

BOHM, JAMES G

Attorney at BOHM WILDISH & MATSEN LLP

695 Town Center Dr Suite 700

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

AMUNDSON, STEVEN G.

402 West Broadway Suite 1140

San Diego, CA 92101

THURTLE ANDERSON, DEVON M.

BRANNEN, JENIFER J

23212 Mill Creek Dr

Laguna Hills, CA 92653

PONS-BUNNEY, JACQUELINE

20 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 06/11/2019 08:30:00 AM.

Reply in Support of Defendants Quanex Building Products Corporation and Truseal Technologies, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment, or, in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication

Reply filed by QUANEX BUILDING PRODUCTS CORPORATION; Truseal Technologies Inc.

Answer

Answer (to First Amended Cross-Complaint) filed by WILLIAM KELLY & SONS CALIFORNIA INC.

Recommendation and Order of Discovery Referee

Recommendation and Order of Discovery Referee submitted by BOSA CALIFORNIA LLC received but not filed on 09/10/2018.

Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

Notice of Change in Handling Attorney filed by THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by BOSA CALIFORNIA LLC.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by BOSA CALIFORNIA LLC.

Reply

Reply filed by BAYSIDE OWNERS ASSOCIATION.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Bosa Development California II Inc.

Amended Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by BAYSIDE OWNERS ASSOCIATION.

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail filed by BOSA CALIFORNIA LLC.

Declaration of Andre C. Robin ISO BOSA Defendant's Demurrer To MWI, Inc.'s Cross-Complaint

Declaration - Other (Declaration of Andre C. Robin ISO BOSA Defendant's Demurrer To MWI, Inc.'s Cross-Complaint) filed by BOSA CALIFORNIA LLC.

Amended Answer

Answer filed by Ferguson Enterprises Inc.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by HORIZON PAINTING CO. INC.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 07/28/2017 10:30:00 AM.

Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney filed by STAR TEAM INSTALLATIONS INC.

Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - The Sherwin-Williams Company

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by BAYSIDE OWNERS ASSOCIATION. Refers to: THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt re Bosa Development California II, Inc.

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by BAYSIDE OWNERS ASSOCIATION. Refers to: Bosa Development California II Inc

429 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2019
  • Returned Mail (NOTICE OF OSC-NON SANCTION AND STATUS CONFERENCE) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego. Refers to: CM Firestop Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • Summary Judgment / Summary Adjudication (Civil) scheduled for 09/13/2019 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-74 Ronald L. Styn was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 07/26/2019 10:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • Status Conference (Civil) continued pursuant to Court's motion to 09/13/2019 at 08:30AM before Judge Ronald L. Styn.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • OSC - Non-Sanction continued pursuant to Court's motion to 09/13/2019 at 08:30AM before Judge Ronald L. Styn.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Modo Building Systems Inc. Filed By: Modo Building Systems Inc (Cross - Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Appointing an Elisor (ORDER SIGNED 7/24/19) filed by MWI Inc. Filed By: MWI Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 07/17/2019 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
534 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2015
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/28/2015 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-62 Ronald L. Styn.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2015
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Styn, Ronald.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2015
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by BAYSIDE OWNERS ASSOCIATION. Refers to: BOSA CALIFORNIA LLC; Bosa Development California Inc; Bosa Development California II Inc; ALEXANDER BOOME CONSULTING ENGINEERS INC; B T M HVAC INC; CM Firestop Inc; HMT ELECTRIC INC; HORIZON PAINTING CO. INC; NEWWAY STRUCTURES INC; PETER ROSS CA INC; MMM GROUP LIMITED; QUANEX BUILDING PRODUCTS CORPORATION; RAYPAK INC; STAR TEAM INSTALLATIONS INC; STARLINE WINDOWS LTD; STARLINE WINDOWS INC; THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY; VICTAULIC COMPANY; VITRUM GLASS INDUSTRIES INC; VITRUM INDUSTRIES LTD; WILLIAM KELLY & SONS CALIFORNIA INC Filed By: BAYSIDE OWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Merit filed by BAYSIDE OWNERS ASSOCIATION. Refers to: BOSA CALIFORNIA LLC; Bosa Development California Inc; Bosa Development California II Inc; ALEXANDER BOOME CONSULTING ENGINEERS INC; B T M HVAC INC; CM Firestop Inc; HMT ELECTRIC INC; HORIZON PAINTING CO. INC; NEWWAY STRUCTURES INC; PETER ROSS CA INC; MMM GROUP LIMITED; QUANEX BUILDING PRODUCTS CORPORATION; RAYPAK INC; STAR TEAM INSTALLATIONS INC; STARLINE WINDOWS LTD; STARLINE WINDOWS INC; THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY; VICTAULIC COMPANY; VITRUM GLASS INDUSTRIES INC; VITRUM INDUSTRIES LTD; WILLIAM KELLY & SONS CALIFORNIA INC Filed By: BAYSIDE OWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by BAYSIDE OWNERS ASSOCIATION. Refers to: BOSA CALIFORNIA LLC; Bosa Development California Inc; Bosa Development California II Inc; ALEXANDER BOOME CONSULTING ENGINEERS INC; B T M HVAC INC; CM Firestop Inc; HMT ELECTRIC INC; HORIZON PAINTING CO. INC; NEWWAY STRUCTURES INC; PETER ROSS CA INC; MMM GROUP LIMITED; QUANEX BUILDING PRODUCTS CORPORATION; RAYPAK INC; STAR TEAM INSTALLATIONS INC; STARLINE WINDOWS LTD; STARLINE WINDOWS INC; THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY; VICTAULIC COMPANY; VITRUM GLASS INDUSTRIES INC; VITRUM INDUSTRIES LTD; WILLIAM KELLY & SONS CALIFORNIA INC Filed By: BAYSIDE OWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by BAYSIDE OWNERS ASSOCIATION. Refers to: BOSA CALIFORNIA LLC; Bosa Development California Inc; Bosa Development California II Inc; ALEXANDER BOOME CONSULTING ENGINEERS INC; B T M HVAC INC; CM Firestop Inc; HMT ELECTRIC INC; HORIZON PAINTING CO. INC; NEWWAY STRUCTURES INC; PETER ROSS CA INC; MMM GROUP LIMITED; QUANEX BUILDING PRODUCTS CORPORATION; RAYPAK INC; STAR TEAM INSTALLATIONS INC; STARLINE WINDOWS LTD; STARLINE WINDOWS INC; THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY; VICTAULIC COMPANY; VITRUM GLASS INDUSTRIES INC; VITRUM INDUSTRIES LTD; WILLIAM KELLY & SONS CALIFORNIA INC Filed By: BAYSIDE OWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by BAYSIDE OWNERS ASSOCIATION. Refers to: BOSA CALIFORNIA LLC; Bosa Development California Inc; Bosa Development California II Inc; ALEXANDER BOOME CONSULTING ENGINEERS INC; B T M HVAC INC; CM Firestop Inc; HMT ELECTRIC INC; HORIZON PAINTING CO. INC; NEWWAY STRUCTURES INC; PETER ROSS CA INC; MMM GROUP LIMITED; QUANEX BUILDING PRODUCTS CORPORATION; RAYPAK INC; STAR TEAM INSTALLATIONS INC; STARLINE WINDOWS LTD; STARLINE WINDOWS INC; THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY; VICTAULIC COMPANY; VITRUM GLASS INDUSTRIES INC; VITRUM INDUSTRIES LTD; WILLIAM KELLY & SONS CALIFORNIA INC; Alexander Boome Consulting Engineering LTD; Truseal Technologies Inc; ECCO Manufacturing; MWI Inc Filed By: BAYSIDE OWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Horizons Painting (208) is a litigant

Latest cases where TRUSEAL TECHNOLOGIES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where NEWWAY STRUCTURES INC; ESA : NEWAY STRUCTURES INC is a litigant

Latest cases where CM Firestop Inc is a litigant