This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/27/2022 at 03:14:55 (UTC).

Bates vs Bayda

Case Summary

On 05/26/2020 Bates filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Bayda. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is James A Mangione. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

James A Mangione

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Giordano, Valentina

Bates, Tera

Defendants

Bayda, Ezra

Zen Center of San Diego Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Small, William F III

Defendant Attorneys

Egan, Eugene J

DELORIMIER, PAUL ANTHONY

 

Court Documents

Answer

Answer filed by Bayda, Ezra.

Defendant Zen Center of San Diego, Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint

Answer filed by Zen Center of San Diego Inc.

Complaint

Complaint filed by Bates, Tera; Giordano, Valentina. Refers to: Bayda, Ezra; Zen Center of San Diego Inc

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 05/28/2021 09:00:00 AM.

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Bates, Tera; Giordano, Valentina.

Proof of Service of Stipulation and Order to Continue the Trial and All Related Dates and Deadlines

Proof of Service filed by Bates, Tera; Giordano, Valentina.

Stipulation and Order to Continue the Trial and All Related Dates and Deadlines

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (to Continue Trial, Related Dates and Deadlines, Order signed 1/3) filed by Bates, Tera; Giordano, Valentina; Bayda, Ezra; Zen Center of San Diego Inc.

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from Strauss,Richard to Mangione,James effective 10/30/2021

Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoena for Production of Business Records to Mary Louise Muller

Motion to Quash Subpoena (for production) filed by Bates, Tera.

Declaration of William F. Small in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoenas for Production of Business Records to Mary Louise Muller

Declaration - Other (of William F Small in support of motion to quash deposition subpoena for production) filed by Bates, Tera.

Proposed Order Regarding Plaintiff's Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoena for Production of Business Records to Mary Louise Muller

Proposed Order (granting order on motion to quash deposition subpoena for production) submitted by Bates, Tera received but not filed on 02/26/2021.

Separate Statement in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoena for Production of Business Records to Mary Louise Muller

Statement - Other (separate statement in support of motion to quash deposition subpoena for production) filed by Bates, Tera.

Proof of Service of Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoena for Production of Business Records to Mary Louise Muller

Proof of Service (motion, declaration, statement, proposed order) filed by Bates, Tera.

Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoena for Production of Business Records to Sarah Theismann

Motion to Quash Subpoena filed by Bates, Tera.

Declaration of William F. Small in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoena for Production of Business Records to Sarah Theismann

Declaration - Other filed by Bates, Tera.

Separate Statement in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoena for Production of Business Records to Sarah Theismann

Statement - Other filed by Bates, Tera.

Proposed Order Regarding Plaintiff's Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoena for Production of Business Records to Sarah Theismann

Proposed Order filed by Bates, Tera.

Proof of Service of Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoena for Production of Business Records to Sarah Theismann

Proof of Service filed by Bates, Tera.

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 05/27/2022 at 08:55:00 AM at Central in C-75 James A Mangione was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial scheduled for 06/10/2022 at 08:50:00 AM at Central in C-75 James A Mangione was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Giordano, Valentina .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Bates, Tera .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Zen Center of San Diego Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Bayda, Ezra .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Bates, Tera; Giordano, Valentina.; Filed By: Bates, Tera (Plaintiff); Giordano, Valentina (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 05/27/2022 at 08:55:00 AM at Central in C-75 James A Mangione.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketThe Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) was rescheduled to 05/27/2022 at 08:55:00 AM in C-75 before James A Mangione at Central.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial scheduled for 06/10/2022 at 08:50:00 AM at Central in C-75 James A Mangione.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder - Other (Order Joint Stipulation to Strike Punitive Damage Allegations from Complaint) filed by Zen Center of San Diego Inc.; Filed By: Zen Center of San Diego Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Zen Center of San Diego Inc.; Filed By: Zen Center of San Diego Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation - Other - Fee Due (Joint Stipulation to Strike Punitive Damages Allegations from Complaint) filed by Zen Center of San Diego Inc.; Filed By: Zen Center of San Diego Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/09/2021 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-75 Richard E. L. Strauss.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Strauss, Richard.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Bates, Tera; Giordano, Valentina. Refers to: Bayda, Ezra; Zen Center of San Diego Inc; Filed By: Bates, Tera (Plaintiff); Giordano, Valentina (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Bates, Tera; Giordano, Valentina. Refers to: Bayda, Ezra; Zen Center of San Diego Inc; Filed By: Bates, Tera (Plaintiff); Giordano, Valentina (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Bates, Tera; Giordano, Valentina. Refers to: Bayda, Ezra; Zen Center of San Diego Inc; Filed By: Bates, Tera (Plaintiff); Giordano, Valentina (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less