This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/16/2018 at 23:24:57 (UTC).

Barry Allred vs. Frito-Lay North America Inc [EFILED]

Case Summary

On 05/11/2017 Barry Allred filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Frito-Lay North America Inc EFILED. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JUDITH F. HAYES. The case status is Other - Transferred.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

JUDITH F. HAYES

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ALLRED, BARRY

ALLRED, MANDY C

Defendants

FRITO-LAY NORTH AMERICA INC

FRITO-LAY INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ELLIOT, DAVID

3200 Fourth Avenue 207

San Diego, CA 92103

BELSEY, ADAM

651 Arroyo Dr

San Diego, CA 92103

Defendant Attorney

TULUMELLO, ANDREW S

1050 Connecticut Ave Nw

Washington, DC 20036

 

Court Documents

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Allred, Barry; Allred, Mandy C. Refers to: Frito-Lay North America Inc

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Allred, Barry; Allred, Mandy C. Refers to: Frito-Lay Inc

Notice of Appearance

Notice - Other (of Appearance of Adam Belsey as Counsel of Record for Plaintifs barry Allred and Mandy C Allred) filed by Allred, Barry; Allred, Mandy C.

Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal

Notice of Removal to Federal Court filed by Frito-Lay Inc; Frito-Lay North America Inc.

Complaint

Complaint filed by Allred, Barry; Allred, Mandy C. Refers to: Frito-Lay North America Inc; Frito-Lay Inc

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Allred, Barry; Allred, Mandy C. Refers to: Frito-Lay North America Inc; Frito-Lay Inc

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Complaint

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Civil Case Cover Sheet

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Allred, Barry; Allred, Mandy C. Refers to: Frito-Lay North America Inc; Frito-Lay Inc

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2017
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/08/2017 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-68 Judith F. Hayes was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Removal to Federal Court filed by Frito-Lay Inc; Frito-Lay North America Inc. Filed By: Frito-Lay Inc (Defendant); Frito-Lay North America Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice - Other (of Appearance of Adam Belsey as Counsel of Record for Plaintifs barry Allred and Mandy C Allred) filed by Allred, Barry; Allred, Mandy C. Filed By: Allred, Barry (Plaintiff); Allred, Mandy C (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Allred, Barry; Allred, Mandy C. Refers to: Frito-Lay Inc Filed By: Allred, Barry (Plaintiff); Allred, Mandy C (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Allred, Barry; Allred, Mandy C. Refers to: Frito-Lay North America Inc Filed By: Allred, Barry (Plaintiff); Allred, Mandy C (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Allred, Barry; Allred, Mandy C. Refers to: Frito-Lay North America Inc; Frito-Lay Inc Filed By: Allred, Barry (Plaintiff); Allred, Mandy C (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • E-filing transaction partially accepted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • [Another document for ROA# 6]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • [Another document for ROA# 6]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/08/2017 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-68 Judith F. Hayes.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Hayes, Judith.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Allred, Barry; Allred, Mandy C. Refers to: Frito-Lay North America Inc; Frito-Lay Inc Filed By: Allred, Barry (Plaintiff); Allred, Mandy C (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by Allred, Barry; Allred, Mandy C. Refers to: Frito-Lay North America Inc; Frito-Lay Inc Filed By: Allred, Barry (Plaintiff); Allred, Mandy C (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Frito-Lay North America, Inc., is a litigant

Latest cases where FRITO-LAY INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant