This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 02/17/2023 at 06:55:05 (UTC).

Barrie Cropper vs. Ford Motor Company

Case Summary

On 03/24/2010 Barrie Cropper filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Ford Motor Company. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Other - Transferred.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2010

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CROPPER, BARRIE

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

ESCONDIDO MOTORS LTD

ROCKWELL AUTOMATION INC

FORD MOTOR COMPANY

UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION

FERRARI NORTH AMERICA INC

Cross Defendants

LJ MILEY COMPANY

AUTO FRICTION CORPORATION

BRANSBESTOS BRAKE LINING COMPANY

JOHNS-MANSVILLE COPORATION

ROCKWELL AUTOMATION INC

FORD MOTOR COMPANY

MAREMONT CORPORATION

GATKE CORPORATION

UNDERWRITERS LABORATORIES INC

CHRYSLER CORPORATION; FKA : DAIMLER CHRYSLER CORPORATION

SCANDURA INC

UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION

WHEELING BRAKE BLOCK MANUFACTURING COMPANY

SILVER LINE PRODUCTS INC

GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION

AMERICAN CONFERENCE OF GOVERNMENTAL INDUSTRIAL HYGENISTS INC

HK PORTER INC

FERRARI NORTH AMERICA INC

21 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DONADIO, DAVID R

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

BARCELOS-PETTIT, CARLA M

ANDERSON, KNIGHT

BROSAMLE, ANTHONY D

ROMANO, JULIA E

SAYERS, WILLIAM J

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

ANDERSON, KNIGHT

BROSAMLE, ANTHONY D

ROMANO, JULIA E

SAYERS, WILLIAM J

Other Attorneys

SWENSON, JOHN P

WU, DANIEL H

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 06/01/2010 08:30:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing SD

OSC - Failure to File Certificate of Service scheduled for 07/09/2010 at 02:15:00 PM at Central in C-73 Steven R. Denton.

Notice to Filing Party SD

Request for Out of State Commission (LETTER ROGATORY TO TAKE OUT OF STATE DEPO) submitted by Cropper, Barrie; Cropper, Dorothy rejected on 06/14/2010.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 06/15/2010 08:30:00 AM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Demurrer / Motion to Strike heard 06/25/2010 10:30:00 AM.

Notice to Filing Party SD

Objections (OBJECTIONS TO PLTF PROPOSED ORDER OVERRULING AND DENYING DEFT MERCEDES BENZ USA LLC DEMURRER AND MOTIN TO STRIKE PLTF COMPLAINT) submitted by Mercedes-Benz USA LLC rejected on 07/06/2010.

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/15/2010 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-73 Steven R. Denton.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 10/15/2010 01:30:00 PM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 11/19/2010 10:30:00 AM.

Minute Order

Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 12/14/2010 08:30:00 AM.

Notice to Filing Party SD

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party submitted by Cropper, Barrie rejected on 02/01/2011. Refers to: Escondido Motors LTD

Notice to Filing Party SD

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party submitted by Cropper, Barrie rejected on 02/02/2011. Refers to: Mercedes-Benz USA LLC

Notice to Filing Party SD

Notice - Other (of Withdrawal of Motion for Summary Judgment) submitted by Ford Motor Company rejected on 02/07/2011.

Case File Contents as of 05/22/17 - volume 9 of 9

Case File Contents as of 05/22/17 - volume 9 of 9

Case File Contents as of 06/15/17 - volume 1 of 9

Case File Contents as of 06/15/17 - volume 1 of 9

Case File Contents as of 06/15/17 - volume 2 of 9

Case File Contents as of 06/15/17 - volume 2 of 9

Case File Contents as of 06/15/17 - volume 3 of 9

Case File Contents as of 06/15/17 - volume 3 of 9

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase File Contents as of 06/15/17 - volume 8 of 9

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase File Contents as of 06/15/17 - volume 7 of 9

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase File Contents as of 06/15/17 - volume 6 of 9

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase File Contents as of 06/15/17 - volume 5 of 9

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase File Contents as of 06/15/17 - volume 4 of 9

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase File Contents as of 06/15/17 - volume 3 of 9

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase File Contents as of 06/15/17 - volume 2 of 9

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase File Contents as of 06/15/17 - volume 1 of 9

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase File Contents as of 05/22/17 - volume 9 of 9

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2011
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal (As to Escondido Motors LTD) filed by Escondido Motors LTD.; Filed By: Escondido Motors LTD (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
114 More Docket Entries
  • 05/05/2010
  • DocketAnswer filed by Union Carbide Corporation.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2010
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed by Cropper, Barrie. Refers to: Ferrari North America Inc; Filed By: Cropper, Barrie (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2010
  • DocketMotion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 06/25/2010 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-73 Steven R. Denton.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2010
  • DocketDemurrer / Motion to Strike scheduled for 06/25/2010 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-73 Steven R. Denton.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2010
  • DocketAnswer filed by Metropollitan Life Insurance Company. Refers to: Cropper, Barrie; Cropper, Dorothy; Filed By: Metropollitan Life Insurance Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2010
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Denton, Steven.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2010
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Cropper, Barrie; Cropper, Dorothy. Refers to: Ford Motor Company; Union Carbide Corporation; Rockwell Automation Inc; Metropollitan Life Insurance Company; Escondido Motors LTD; Ferrari North America Inc; Filed By: Cropper, Barrie (Plaintiff); Cropper, Dorothy (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2010
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Cropper, Barrie; Cropper, Dorothy. Refers to: Ford Motor Company; Union Carbide Corporation; Rockwell Automation Inc; Metropollitan Life Insurance Company; Escondido Motors LTD; Ferrari North America Inc; Filed By: Cropper, Barrie (Plaintiff); Cropper, Dorothy (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2010
  • DocketComplaint filed by Cropper, Barrie; Cropper, Dorothy. Refers to: Ford Motor Company; Union Carbide Corporation; Rockwell Automation Inc; Metropollitan Life Insurance Company; Escondido Motors LTD; Ferrari North America Inc; Mercedes-Benz USA LLC; Filed By: Cropper, Barrie (Plaintiff); Cropper, Dorothy (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2010
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less