**********************-CTL
03/24/2010
Other - Transferred
Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability
San Diego, California
CROPPER, BARRIE
ESCONDIDO MOTORS LTD
ROCKWELL AUTOMATION INC
FORD MOTOR COMPANY
UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION
FERRARI NORTH AMERICA INC
LJ MILEY COMPANY
AUTO FRICTION CORPORATION
BRANSBESTOS BRAKE LINING COMPANY
JOHNS-MANSVILLE COPORATION
ROCKWELL AUTOMATION INC
FORD MOTOR COMPANY
MAREMONT CORPORATION
GATKE CORPORATION
UNDERWRITERS LABORATORIES INC
CHRYSLER CORPORATION; FKA : DAIMLER CHRYSLER CORPORATION
SCANDURA INC
UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION
WHEELING BRAKE BLOCK MANUFACTURING COMPANY
SILVER LINE PRODUCTS INC
GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION
AMERICAN CONFERENCE OF GOVERNMENTAL INDUSTRIAL HYGENISTS INC
HK PORTER INC
FERRARI NORTH AMERICA INC
DONADIO, DAVID R
BARCELOS-PETTIT, CARLA M
ANDERSON, KNIGHT
BROSAMLE, ANTHONY D
ROMANO, JULIA E
SAYERS, WILLIAM J
ANDERSON, KNIGHT
BROSAMLE, ANTHONY D
ROMANO, JULIA E
SAYERS, WILLIAM J
SWENSON, JOHN P
WU, DANIEL H
Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 06/01/2010 08:30:00 AM.
OSC - Failure to File Certificate of Service scheduled for 07/09/2010 at 02:15:00 PM at Central in C-73 Steven R. Denton.
Request for Out of State Commission (LETTER ROGATORY TO TAKE OUT OF STATE DEPO) submitted by Cropper, Barrie; Cropper, Dorothy rejected on 06/14/2010.
Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 06/15/2010 08:30:00 AM.
Minutes finalized for Demurrer / Motion to Strike heard 06/25/2010 10:30:00 AM.
Objections (OBJECTIONS TO PLTF PROPOSED ORDER OVERRULING AND DENYING DEFT MERCEDES BENZ USA LLC DEMURRER AND MOTIN TO STRIKE PLTF COMPLAINT) submitted by Mercedes-Benz USA LLC rejected on 07/06/2010.
Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/15/2010 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-73 Steven R. Denton.
Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 10/15/2010 01:30:00 PM.
Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 11/19/2010 10:30:00 AM.
Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.
Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 12/14/2010 08:30:00 AM.
Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party submitted by Cropper, Barrie rejected on 02/01/2011. Refers to: Escondido Motors LTD
Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party submitted by Cropper, Barrie rejected on 02/02/2011. Refers to: Mercedes-Benz USA LLC
Notice - Other (of Withdrawal of Motion for Summary Judgment) submitted by Ford Motor Company rejected on 02/07/2011.
Case File Contents as of 05/22/17 - volume 9 of 9
Case File Contents as of 06/15/17 - volume 1 of 9
Case File Contents as of 06/15/17 - volume 2 of 9
Case File Contents as of 06/15/17 - volume 3 of 9
DocketCase File Contents as of 06/15/17 - volume 8 of 9
[-] Read LessDocketCase File Contents as of 06/15/17 - volume 7 of 9
[-] Read LessDocketCase File Contents as of 06/15/17 - volume 6 of 9
[-] Read LessDocketCase File Contents as of 06/15/17 - volume 5 of 9
[-] Read LessDocketCase File Contents as of 06/15/17 - volume 4 of 9
[-] Read LessDocketCase File Contents as of 06/15/17 - volume 3 of 9
[-] Read LessDocketCase File Contents as of 06/15/17 - volume 2 of 9
[-] Read LessDocketCase File Contents as of 06/15/17 - volume 1 of 9
[-] Read LessDocketCase File Contents as of 05/22/17 - volume 9 of 9
[-] Read LessDocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal (As to Escondido Motors LTD) filed by Escondido Motors LTD.; Filed By: Escondido Motors LTD (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketAnswer filed by Union Carbide Corporation.
[-] Read LessDocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed by Cropper, Barrie. Refers to: Ferrari North America Inc; Filed By: Cropper, Barrie (Plaintiff)
[-] Read LessDocketMotion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 06/25/2010 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-73 Steven R. Denton.
[-] Read LessDocketDemurrer / Motion to Strike scheduled for 06/25/2010 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-73 Steven R. Denton.
[-] Read LessDocketAnswer filed by Metropollitan Life Insurance Company. Refers to: Cropper, Barrie; Cropper, Dorothy; Filed By: Metropollitan Life Insurance Company (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Denton, Steven.
[-] Read LessDocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Cropper, Barrie; Cropper, Dorothy. Refers to: Ford Motor Company; Union Carbide Corporation; Rockwell Automation Inc; Metropollitan Life Insurance Company; Escondido Motors LTD; Ferrari North America Inc; Filed By: Cropper, Barrie (Plaintiff); Cropper, Dorothy (Plaintiff)
[-] Read LessDocketOriginal Summons filed by Cropper, Barrie; Cropper, Dorothy. Refers to: Ford Motor Company; Union Carbide Corporation; Rockwell Automation Inc; Metropollitan Life Insurance Company; Escondido Motors LTD; Ferrari North America Inc; Filed By: Cropper, Barrie (Plaintiff); Cropper, Dorothy (Plaintiff)
[-] Read LessDocketComplaint filed by Cropper, Barrie; Cropper, Dorothy. Refers to: Ford Motor Company; Union Carbide Corporation; Rockwell Automation Inc; Metropollitan Life Insurance Company; Escondido Motors LTD; Ferrari North America Inc; Mercedes-Benz USA LLC; Filed By: Cropper, Barrie (Plaintiff); Cropper, Dorothy (Plaintiff)
[-] Read LessDocketSummons issued.
[-] Read Less