This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/16/2018 at 08:51:00 (UTC).

BARRETT vs MERLIN ENTERTAINMENTS GROUP

Case Summary

On 03/01/2017 BARRETT filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MERLIN ENTERTAINMENTS GROUP. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TIMOTHY M. CASSERLY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************O-NC

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

TIMOTHY M. CASSERLY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Guardian Ad Litems

BARRETT, THOMAS ROSTON

BROWN, BROOKANNE

BROWN, STEVE

BROWN, MICHAEL

BROWN, BARRETT

Defendants

MERLIN ENTERTAINMENTS GROUP

LEGOLAND CALIFORNIA RESORT

MERLIN ENTERTAINMENTS GROUP US LLC

THE LEGO GOUP

GERSTLAUER AMUSEMENT RIDES GMBH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Guardian Ad Litem Attorney

KLEIN, CANDICE S

Attorney at PANISH SHEA & BOYLE LLP

11111 Santa Monica Boulevard 700

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Defendant Attorneys

LEWIS, ROSEMARIE S

626 Wilshire Boulevard 975

Los Angeles, CA 90017

BISHARAT, NABIL A

Attorney at REED SMITH LLP

355 South Grand Avenue 2900

Los Angeles, CA 90071

RINGEISEN, WAYNE

225 Fifth Ave

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

WALDOW, ARND VON

225 Fifth Ave

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

 

Court Documents

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by BROWN, BROOKANNE; BROWN, MICHAEL; BROWN, STEVE; BARRETT, THOMAS ROSTON. Refers to: GERSTLAUER AMUSEMENT RIDES GMBH

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by BARRETT, THOMAS ROSTON. Refers to: MERLIN ENTERTAINMENTS GROUP

Answer

Answer filed by GERSTLAUER AMUSEMENT RIDES GMBH. Refers to: BARRETT, THOMAS; BROWN, BROOKANNE; BROWN, STEVE; BROWN, MICHAEL

Motion to Strike

Motion to Strike (7/28/17) filed by MERLIN ENTERTAINMENTS GROUP; MERLIN ENTERTAINMENTS GROUP US LLC; THE LEGO GOUP; LEGOLAND CALIFORNIA RESORT.

Proposed Order

Proposed Order (7/28/17) filed by MERLIN ENTERTAINMENTS GROUP; MERLIN ENTERTAINMENTS GROUP US LLC; THE LEGO GOUP; LEGOLAND CALIFORNIA RESORT.

Joinder to Motion and Supporting Declarations

Joinder to Motion and Supporting Declarations (7/28/17) filed by GERSTLAUER AMUSEMENT RIDES GMBH.

Motion - Other

Motion - Other (Pro Hac Vice 9/8/17) filed by GERSTLAUER AMUSEMENT RIDES GMBH; GERSTLAUER AMUSEMENT RIDES GMBH.

Motion - Other

Motion - Other (Pro Hac Vice 9/8/17) filed by GERSTLAUER AMUSEMENT RIDES GMBH; GERSTLAUER AMUSEMENT RIDES GMBH.

Notice - Other

Notice - Other (Notice of Application of Wayne Ringeisen to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice) filed by GERSTLAUER AMUSEMENT RIDES GMBH.

Notice - Other

Notice - Other (Corrected Notice of Application of Arnd Von Waldow to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice) filed by GERSTLAUER AMUSEMENT RIDES GMBH.

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (stipulation to file first amended complaint) filed by BARRETT, THOMAS ROSTON; BROWN, BROOKANNE; BROWN, MICHAEL; BROWN, STEVE.

Order - Other

Order - Other (order granting stipulation to file first amended complaint) filed by BARRETT, THOMAS ROSTON; BROWN, BROOKANNE; BROWN, MICHAEL; BROWN, STEVE.

Amended Complaint

Amended Complaint (***1st Amended***) filed by BARRETT, THOMAS ROSTON; BROWN, BROOKANNE; BROWN, MICHAEL; BROWN, STEVE; Brown, Barrett. Refers to: GERSTLAUER AMUSEMENT RIDES GMBH; LEGOLAND CALIFORNIA RESORT; MERLIN ENTERTAINMENTS GROUP; MERLIN ENTERTAINMENTS GROUP US LLC; THE LEGO GOUP

Notice - Other

Notice - Other filed by MERLIN ENTERTAINMENTS GROUP; MERLIN ENTERTAINMENTS GROUP US LLC; THE LEGO GOUP; LEGOLAND CALIFORNIA RESORT.

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Brown, Barrett. Refers to: GERSTLAUER AMUSEMENT RIDES GMBH

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement (8/11/17) filed by MERLIN ENTERTAINMENTS GROUP; MERLIN ENTERTAINMENTS GROUP US LLC; THE LEGO GOUP; LEGOLAND CALIFORNIA RESORT.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by GERSTLAUER AMUSEMENT RIDES GMBH.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Brown, Barrett.

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2018
  • Discovery Hearing scheduled for 04/13/2018 at 01:30:00 PM at North County in N-31 Timothy M. Casserly was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (Stipulation and Protective Order) filed by GERSTLAUER AMUSEMENT RIDES GMBH. Filed By: GERSTLAUER AMUSEMENT RIDES GMBH (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Discovery Hearing heard 03/23/2018 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • Discovery Hearing continued pursuant to Court's motion to 04/13/2018 at 01:30PM before Judge Timothy M. Casserly.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Cynthia Vega #6640) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • Tentative Ruling for Discovery Hearing published.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • Discovery Hearing scheduled for 03/23/2018 at 01:30:00 PM at North County in N-31 Timothy M. Casserly.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • The Discovery Hearing was rescheduled to 03/23/2018 at 01:30:00 PM in N-31 before Timothy M. Casserly at North County.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • Tentative Ruling for Discovery Hearing published.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Reply to Opposition of Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations (03/09/18) filed by GERSTLAUER AMUSEMENT RIDES GMBH. Filed By: GERSTLAUER AMUSEMENT RIDES GMBH (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 04/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by BARRETT, THOMAS ROSTON. Refers to: MERLIN ENTERTAINMENTS GROUP Filed By: BARRETT, THOMAS ROSTON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by BROWN, BROOKANNE; BROWN, MICHAEL; BROWN, STEVE; BARRETT, THOMAS ROSTON. Refers to: GERSTLAUER AMUSEMENT RIDES GMBH Filed By: BROWN, BROOKANNE (Plaintiff); BROWN, MICHAEL (Plaintiff); BROWN, STEVE (Plaintiff); BARRETT, THOMAS ROSTON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Application and Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem (GRANTED) filed by BARRETT, THOMAS ROSTON. Filed By: BARRETT, THOMAS ROSTON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/11/2017 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-31 Timothy M. Casserly.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Casserly, Timothy.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by BARRETT, THOMAS ROSTON; BROWN, BROOKANNE; BROWN, STEVE; BROWN, MICHAEL. Refers to: MERLIN ENTERTAINMENTS GROUP; MERLIN ENTERTAINMENTS GROUP US LLC; THE LEGO GOUP; LEGOLAND CALIFORNIA RESORT; GERSTLAUER AMUSEMENT RIDES GMBH Filed By: BARRETT, THOMAS ROSTON (Plaintiff); BROWN, BROOKANNE (Plaintiff); BROWN, STEVE (Plaintiff); BROWN, MICHAEL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • Complaint filed by BARRETT, THOMAS ROSTON; BROWN, BROOKANNE; BROWN, STEVE; BROWN, MICHAEL. Refers to: MERLIN ENTERTAINMENTS GROUP; MERLIN ENTERTAINMENTS GROUP US LLC; THE LEGO GOUP; LEGOLAND CALIFORNIA RESORT; GERSTLAUER AMUSEMENT RIDES GMBH Filed By: BARRETT, THOMAS ROSTON (Plaintiff); BROWN, BROOKANNE (Plaintiff); BROWN, STEVE (Plaintiff); BROWN, MICHAEL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • [A document for ROA# 1]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LEGOLAND CALIFORNIA RESORT is a litigant

Latest cases where Merlin Entertainments Group US Holding Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NABIL A. BISHARAT