This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 06/08/2022 at 01:41:49 (UTC).

Barraza vs Sycuan Band of the Kumeyaay Nation

Case Summary

On 05/11/2022 Barraza filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Sycuan Band of the Kumeyaay Nation. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Eddie C Sturgeon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Eddie C Sturgeon

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Barraza, Juan Ignacio

Samaniego, Antonia

Defendants

James, Javien

Sycuan Band of the Kumeyaay Nation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

McCann, Shawn J

9701 Wilshire Blvd 12Th Floor

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by Barraza, Juan Ignacio; Samaniego, Antonia. Refers to: Sycuan Band of the Kumeyaay Nation; James, Javien

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Barraza, Juan Ignacio; Samaniego, Antonia. Refers to: Sycuan Band of the Kumeyaay Nation; James, Javien

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Barraza, Juan Ignacio; Samaniego, Antonia. Refers to: Sycuan Band of the Kumeyaay Nation; James, Javien

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Barraza, Juan Ignacio; Samaniego, Antonia. Refers to: Sycuan Band of the Kumeyaay Nation; James, Javien

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 8]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 8]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Barraza, Juan Ignacio.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2023
  • HearingLocation: C-67; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Barraza, Juan Ignacio.; Filed By: Barraza, Juan Ignacio (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/31/2023 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-67 Eddie C Sturgeon.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Sturgeon, Eddie.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Barraza, Juan Ignacio; Samaniego, Antonia. Refers to: Sycuan Band of the Kumeyaay Nation; James, Javien; Filed By: Barraza, Juan Ignacio (Plaintiff); Samaniego, Antonia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Barraza, Juan Ignacio; Samaniego, Antonia. Refers to: Sycuan Band of the Kumeyaay Nation; James, Javien; Filed By: Barraza, Juan Ignacio (Plaintiff); Samaniego, Antonia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Barraza, Juan Ignacio; Samaniego, Antonia. Refers to: Sycuan Band of the Kumeyaay Nation; James, Javien; Filed By: Barraza, Juan Ignacio (Plaintiff); Samaniego, Antonia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Barraza, Juan Ignacio; Samaniego, Antonia. Refers to: Sycuan Band of the Kumeyaay Nation; James, Javien; Filed By: Barraza, Juan Ignacio (Plaintiff); Samaniego, Antonia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SYCUAN BAND OF THE KUMEYAAY NATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCCANN, SHAWN J.