This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/06/2022 at 11:45:40 (UTC).

BARONA BAND OF MISSION INDIANS VS LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/19/2021 BARONA BAND OF MISSION INDIANS filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Keri Katz. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Keri Katz

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BARONA TRIBAL GAMING AUTHORITY; DBA : BARONA RESORT AND CASINO

BARONA BAND OF MISSION INDIANS

Defendants

EVANSTON INSURANCE COMPANY

Endurance Worldwide Insurance Ltd

ARCH SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

XL INSURANCE AMERICA INC

Aspen Specialty Insurance Company

Homeland Insurance Company of New York

ALLIED WORLD NATIONAL ASSURANCE COMPANY

Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company

LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY

Underwriters at Lloyds London including Syndicate Numbers AGR 3268 APL 1969 ASC 1414 ATL 1861 AUL 1274 AUW 0609 BRT 2987 BRT 2988 CHN 2015 CNP 4444 KLN 510 MSP 318 Neon Worldwide Property Consortium QBE 1886 TAL 1183 TMK 1880 and XLC 2003

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

O'Hanlon, Matthew B

 

Court Documents

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by BARONA BAND OF MISSION INDIANS; BARONA TRIBAL GAMING AUTHORITY. Refers to: LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY; Underwriters at Lloyds London including Syndicate Numbers AGR 3268 APL 1969 ASC 1414 ATL 1861 AUL 1274 AUW 0609 BRT 2987 BRT 2988 CHN 2015 CNP 4444 KLN 510 MSP 318 Neon Worldwide Property Consortium QBE 1886 TAL 1183 TMK 1880 and XLC 2003; Aspen Specialty Insurance Company; Homeland Insurance Company of New York; Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company; Endurance Worldwide Insurance Ltd; ARCH SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY; EVANSTON INSURANCE COMPANY; ALLIED WORLD NATIONAL ASSURANCE COMPANY; XL INSURANCE AMERICA INC

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by BARONA BAND OF MISSION INDIANS; BARONA TRIBAL GAMING AUTHORITY. Refers to: LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY; Underwriters at Lloyds London including Syndicate Numbers AGR 3268 APL 1969 ASC 1414 ATL 1861 AUL 1274 AUW 0609 BRT 2987 BRT 2988 CHN 2015 CNP 4444 KLN 510 MSP 318 Neon Worldwide Property Consortium QBE 1886 TAL 1183 TMK 1880 and XLC 2003; Aspen Specialty Insurance Company; Homeland Insurance Company of New York; Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company; Endurance Worldwide Insurance Ltd; ARCH SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY; EVANSTON INSURANCE COMPANY; ALLIED WORLD NATIONAL ASSURANCE COMPANY; XL INSURANCE AMERICA INC

Complaint

Complaint filed by BARONA BAND OF MISSION INDIANS; BARONA TRIBAL GAMING AUTHORITY. Refers to: LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY; Underwriters at Lloyds London including Syndicate Numbers AGR 3268 APL 1969 ASC 1414 ATL 1861 AUL 1274 AUW 0609 BRT 2987 BRT 2988 CHN 2015 CNP 4444 KLN 510 MSP 318 Neon Worldwide Property Consortium QBE 1886 TAL 1183 TMK 1880 and XLC 2003; Aspen Specialty Insurance Company; Homeland Insurance Company of New York; Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company; Endurance Worldwide Insurance Ltd; ARCH SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY; EVANSTON INSURANCE COMPANY; ALLIED WORLD NATIONAL ASSURANCE COMPANY; XL INSURANCE AMERICA INC

Request for Dismissal (Judgment/Dismissal)

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by BARONA BAND OF MISSION INDIANS; BARONA TRIBAL GAMING AUTHORITY.

 

Docket Entries

08/03/2021

DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/19/2021 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-74 Keri Katz was vacated.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2021

DocketComplaint dismissed without prejudice as to BARONA TRIBAL GAMING AUTHORITY.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2021

DocketComplaint dismissed without prejudice as to BARONA BAND OF MISSION INDIANS.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2021

DocketComplaint dismissed without prejudice as to XL INSURANCE AMERICA INC.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2021

DocketComplaint dismissed without prejudice as to Endurance Worldwide Insurance Ltd.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2021

DocketComplaint dismissed without prejudice as to Underwriters at Lloyds London including Syndicate Numbers AGR 3268 APL 1969 ASC 1414 ATL 1861 AUL 1274 AUW 0609 BRT 2987 BRT 2988 CHN 2015 CNP 4444 KLN 510 MSP 318 Neon Worldwide Property Consortium QBE 1886 TAL 1183 TMK 1880 and XLC 2003.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2021

DocketComplaint dismissed without prejudice as to Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2021

DocketComplaint dismissed without prejudice as to Aspen Specialty Insurance Company.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2021

DocketComplaint dismissed without prejudice as to ALLIED WORLD NATIONAL ASSURANCE COMPANY.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2021

DocketComplaint dismissed without prejudice as to EVANSTON INSURANCE COMPANY.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
08/02/2021

DocketComplaint dismissed without prejudice as to LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2021

DocketComplaint dismissed without prejudice as to Homeland Insurance Company of New York.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2021
View Court Documents

DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by BARONA BAND OF MISSION INDIANS; BARONA TRIBAL GAMING AUTHORITY.; Filed By: BARONA BAND OF MISSION INDIANS (Plaintiff); BARONA TRIBAL GAMING AUTHORITY (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/20/2021
View Court Documents

DocketCase initiation form printed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/20/2021

DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/19/2021 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-74 Keri Katz.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/20/2021

DocketSummons issued.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2021

DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Katz, Keri.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2021
View Court Documents

DocketOriginal Summons filed by BARONA BAND OF MISSION INDIANS; BARONA TRIBAL GAMING AUTHORITY. Refers to: LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY; Underwriters at Lloyds London including Syndicate Numbers AGR 3268 APL 1969 ASC 1414 ATL 1861 AUL 1274 AUW 0609 BRT 2987 BRT 2988 CHN 2015 CNP 4444 KLN 510 MSP 318 Neon Worldwide Property Consortium QBE 1886 TAL 1183 TMK 1880 and XLC 2003; Aspen Specialty Insurance Company; Homeland Insurance Company of New York; Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company; Endurance Worldwide Insurance Ltd; ARCH SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY; EVANSTON INSURANCE COMPANY; ALLIED WORLD NATIONAL ASSURANCE COMPANY; XL INSURANCE AMERICA INC; Filed By: BARONA BAND OF MISSION INDIANS (Plaintiff); BARONA TRIBAL GAMING AUTHORITY (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2021
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by BARONA BAND OF MISSION INDIANS; BARONA TRIBAL GAMING AUTHORITY. Refers to: LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY; Underwriters at Lloyds London including Syndicate Numbers AGR 3268 APL 1969 ASC 1414 ATL 1861 AUL 1274 AUW 0609 BRT 2987 BRT 2988 CHN 2015 CNP 4444 KLN 510 MSP 318 Neon Worldwide Property Consortium QBE 1886 TAL 1183 TMK 1880 and XLC 2003; Aspen Specialty Insurance Company; Homeland Insurance Company of New York; Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company; Endurance Worldwide Insurance Ltd; ARCH SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY; EVANSTON INSURANCE COMPANY; ALLIED WORLD NATIONAL ASSURANCE COMPANY; XL INSURANCE AMERICA INC; Filed By: BARONA BAND OF MISSION INDIANS (Plaintiff); BARONA TRIBAL GAMING AUTHORITY (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2021
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint filed by BARONA BAND OF MISSION INDIANS; BARONA TRIBAL GAMING AUTHORITY. Refers to: LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY; Underwriters at Lloyds London including Syndicate Numbers AGR 3268 APL 1969 ASC 1414 ATL 1861 AUL 1274 AUW 0609 BRT 2987 BRT 2988 CHN 2015 CNP 4444 KLN 510 MSP 318 Neon Worldwide Property Consortium QBE 1886 TAL 1183 TMK 1880 and XLC 2003; Aspen Specialty Insurance Company; Homeland Insurance Company of New York; Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company; Endurance Worldwide Insurance Ltd; ARCH SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY; EVANSTON INSURANCE COMPANY; ALLIED WORLD NATIONAL ASSURANCE COMPANY; XL INSURANCE AMERICA INC; Filed By: BARONA BAND OF MISSION INDIANS (Plaintiff); BARONA TRIBAL GAMING AUTHORITY (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less