This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/22/2019 at 02:02:10 (UTC).

Baroga vs. Best Buy Stores LP

Case Summary

On 11/09/2015 Baroga filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Best Buy Stores LP. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN S. MEYER. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

JOHN S. MEYER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BAROGA, GLENN

MARTINEZ, JOSEPH

SPITZER, JASON

QUAN, LISA

CASTRO, CHRISTINA

HERBERT JR, MICHAEL

MONTES DE OCA, JOSE

YOUN, ANDREW

SEVILLANO, STEVEN

HERNANDEZ, MARIO

EWING, CHRISTINA

TRAN, JENNIFER

CALVETTI, ROB

CUEVAS, ANTHONY

ROUSE, SAHAR

CARBAJAL, CARLOS

KING, KYLE

O'BRIEN, JAY MICHAEL

DEPAOLI, JACOB

Defendant

BEST BUY STORES LP

16 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RIGHETTI, MICHAEL

Attorney at RIGHETTI GLUGOSKI P C

1400 Montgomery St

San Francisco, CA 94133

Defendant Attorneys

ROBERTSON, CHRISTOPHER M.

600 Anton Blvd

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

JARRETT, BRYAN L.

600 Anton Boulevard 1800

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

MILLER, BARBARA J

Attorney at MORGAN LEWIS & BOCKIUS LLP

600 Anton Boulevard 1800

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Proof of Service

[Another document for ROA# 133]

Separate Statement in Support of Motion to Compel Further Depostion Responses from Plaintiff CARLOS CARBAJAL

Statement - Other (Separate Statement in Support of Motion to Compel Further Depostion Responses from Plaintiff CARLOS CARBAJAL) filed by Best Buy Stores LP.

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Best Buy Stores LP.

In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment

Statement of Undisputed Facts (In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment) filed by Best Buy Stores LP.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Compel Deposition of Plaintiff Stephen Bozzo

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Best Buy Stores LP.

Declaration of Bryan Jarrett in Support Motion to Compel Deposition of Plaintiff Rob Calvetti

Declaration - Other (Declaration of Bryan Jarrett in Support Motion to Compel Deposition of Plaintiff Rob Calvetti) filed by Best Buy Stores LP.

Declaration of Bryan Jarrett

[Another document for ROA# 15]

In Support of Defendant Best Buy Stores LPs Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Motion for Summary Adjudication of Plaintiff Carlos Carbajals Claims

Statement of Undisputed Facts (In Support of Defendant Best Buy Stores LPs Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Motion for Summary Adjudication of Plaintiff Carlos Carbajals Claims) filed by Best Buy Stores LP.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Compel Deposition of Jaocb Van Lingen

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Compel Deposition of Jaocb Van Lingen) filed by Best Buy Stores LP.

Notice of Telephonic Appearance

Notice - Other (Telephonic Appearance) filed by Best Buy Stores LP.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Langson, Amanda; Youn, Andrew; De Gracia, Anna; Cuevas, Anthony; Belevich, Anton; Trejo, Benjamin; McCauley, Brian; Carbajal, Carlos; Castro, Christina; Ewing, Christina;OTHERS.

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

[Another document for ROA# 15]

Declaration in Support of Motion to Compel Deposition of Plaintiff Stephen Bozzo

Declaration - Other (Declaration in Support of Motion to Compel Deposition of Plaintiff Stephen Bozzo) filed by Best Buy Stores LP.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Baroga, Glenn. Refers to: Best Buy Stores LP

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Compel Further Depostion Responses from Plaintiff CARLOS CARBAJAL

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Best Buy Stores LP.

Defendant Best Buy Stores, L.P.'s Reply in Support of Motion for a Protective Order and to Compel Further Deposition Responses From Plaintiff Carlos Carbajal

Reply filed by Best Buy Stores LP.

121 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2017
  • Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 07/28/2017 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-61 John S. Meyer was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • Civil Jury Trial scheduled for 08/11/2017 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-61 John S. Meyer was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Baroga, Glenn .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Baroga, Glenn .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Van Lingen, Jacob .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Garoutte, Michael .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Castro, Christina .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Martinez, Joseph .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Quan, Lisa .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Pacheco, Fabiola .

    Read MoreRead Less
200 More Docket Entries
  • 09/19/2016
  • Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to BERGMAN, WILLIAM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed by Baroga, Glenn. Refers to: BERGMAN, WILLIAM Filed By: Baroga, Glenn (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (BEST BUY STORES, L.P.) filed by Baroga, Glenn. Refers to: Best Buy Stores LP Filed By: Baroga, Glenn (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed by Best Buy Stores LP. Filed By: Best Buy Stores LP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/28/2016 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-61 John S. Meyer.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Meyer, John.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Baroga, Glenn. Refers to: Best Buy Stores LP Filed By: Baroga, Glenn (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Baroga, Glenn. Refers to: Best Buy Stores LP Filed By: Baroga, Glenn (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by Baroga, Glenn. Refers to: Best Buy Stores LP Filed By: Baroga, Glenn (Plaintiff); Montes De Oca, Jose (Plaintiff); McCauley, Brian (Plaintiff); Martinez, Joseph (Plaintiff); King, Kyle (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.